Stearns Bank National Association v. J&E Business Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stearns Bank National Association
Defendant: J&E Business Consulting, LLC, LP Capital Partners, Inc., Paul Paredes and Edward Fay
Case Number: 0:2023cv02051
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2023 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by J&E Business Consulting, LLC, Paul Paredes.(Thom, Aaron)
August 28, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by J&E Business Consulting, LLC, Paul Paredes. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thom, Aaron)
August 28, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Thom, Aaron)
August 28, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by J&E Business Consulting, LLC, Paul Paredes. (Thom, Aaron)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on #17 Stipulation. J&E Business Consulting, LLC answer due 8/28/2023; Paul Paredes answer due 8/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/18/2023.(JLB)
August 16, 2023 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Stearns Bank National Association. (Ansel, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron R Thom on behalf of J&E Business Consulting, LLC, Paul Paredes. (Thom, Aaron)
August 15, 2023 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Thom, Aaron)
August 15, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by J&E Business Consulting, LLC, Paul Paredes. (Thom, Aaron)
August 14, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Cumming on behalf of Edward Fay, LP Capital Partners, Inc.. (Cumming, William)
August 14, 2023 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for J&E Business Consulting, LLC. (Lindsay, Laura)
August 14, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Edward Fay, LP Capital Partners, Inc..(Lindsay, Laura)
August 14, 2023 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Edward Fay, LP Capital Partners, Inc..(Lindsay, Laura)
August 14, 2023 Filing 12 Declaration of Laura H. Lindsay in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Edward Fay, LP Capital Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Lindsay, Laura)
August 14, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Edward Fay, LP Capital Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lindsay, Laura)
August 14, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Lindsay, Laura)
August 14, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Edward Fay, LP Capital Partners, Inc.. (Lindsay, Laura)
August 7, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Stearns Bank National Association. (Ansel, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2023 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Stearns Bank National Association. (Boyd, Thomas) Modified text on 8/7/2023 (MMP).
July 26, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Stearns Bank National Association Paul Parades (Johnson, Eric)
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Stearns Bank National Association re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued J & E Business Consulting, LLC (Johnson, Eric)
July 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A Ball on behalf of Stearns Bank National Association. (Ball, Stephanie)
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edward Fay, J&E Business Consulting, LLC, LP Capital Partners, Inc., Paul Paredes. (MKB)
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 23-cv-2051 (NEB/LIB).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) Modified text on 7/10/2023 (MKB).
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stearns Bank National Association (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10393705) filed by Stearns Bank National Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stearns Bank National Association v. J&E Business Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stearns Bank National Association
Represented By: Stephanie A Ball
Represented By: Eric S Johnson
Represented By: Andrew J Steil
Represented By: Jeffrey R Ansel
Represented By: Matthew C Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&E Business Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Aaron R Thom
Represented By: Rachel Archambeau
Represented By: Samantha Ellingson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LP Capital Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Laura H. Lindsay
Represented By: William A Cumming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Paredes
Represented By: Aaron R Thom
Represented By: Rachel Archambeau
Represented By: Samantha Ellingson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Fay
Represented By: Laura H. Lindsay
Represented By: William A Cumming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?