S. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: T. S.
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. formerly known as Wyndham Worldwide Corporation doing business as Super 8 Hotel and Sarah Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation and Sarah Hospitality, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2023cv02530
Filed: August 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1595 Civil Remedies: Human Trafficking
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Tawfic, Kacie)
November 14, 2023 Filing 26 (Text-Only) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (CLG)
November 13, 2023 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Motion to Dismiss/General. (MacDonald, Erica)
November 13, 2023 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (MacDonald, Erica)
November 13, 2023 Filing 23 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #20 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc..(MacDonald, Erica)
November 13, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(MacDonald, Erica)
November 13, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (MacDonald, Erica)
November 13, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (MacDonald, Erica)
October 31, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. S.. Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc., served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Montpetit, Jeffrey) Modified text on 10/31/2023 (MMP).
October 31, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. S.. Sarah Hospitality, Inc., served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (Montpetit, Jeffrey) Modified text on 10/31/2023 (MMP).
October 30, 2023 Filing 17 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David S. Sager and Christopher B. Donovan as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kacie Jo Phillips Tawfic on behalf of Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Tawfic, Kacie)
October 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica H MacDonald on behalf of Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (MacDonald, Erica)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. response due 11/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/27/2023.(TMA) Modified text on 10/27/2023 (TMA).
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Tawfic, Kacie)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION (Joint) to Extend Defendant Wyndham Hotels & Resorts' Time to Answer Complaint by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. Jointly Signed by T.S.. (Tawfic, Kacie)
October 17, 2023 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Sarah Hospitality, Inc.. (Morris, Christopher)
October 17, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Sarah Hospitality, Inc.. (Morris, Christopher)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Darren Brown for T. S.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Matheny for T. S.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Annie McAdams for T. S. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/10/2023. (jam)
September 26, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Annie McAdams. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10559400 filed by T. S.. (Montpetit, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Matheny. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10559389 filed by T. S.. (Montpetit, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darren L. Brown. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10559334 filed by T. S.. (Montpetit, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sarah Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (MKB)
August 17, 2023 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Darren L. Brown, Mathew Matheny, Annie McAdams as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
August 17, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (MKB)
August 17, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-2530 (PJS/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
August 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10479542) filed by T. S.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Montpetit, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. formerly known as Wyndham Worldwide Corporation doing business as Super 8 Hotel and Sarah Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Erica H MacDonald
Represented By: Kacie Jo Phillips Tawfic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Worldwide Corporation
Represented By: Erica H MacDonald
Represented By: Kacie Jo Phillips Tawfic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Peggah Navab
Represented By: Christopher R Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. S.
Represented By: Jeffrey M Montpetit
Represented By: Matthew Matheny
Represented By: Annie McAdams
Represented By: Darren Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?