United Healthcare Services, Inc. v. AmerisourceBergen Corporation et al
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Oncology Supply Company, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated d/b/a Oncology Supply Pharmacy Services, ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC doing business as Oncology Supply Company and Medical Initiatives, Incorporated doing business as Oncology Supply Pharmacy Services
Case Number: 0:2023cv02890
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated. (Kelley, Brett)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants shall have until and including December 4, 2023, to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/19/2023. (TMA)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott D. Stein for ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, and Medical Initiatives, Incorporated.; granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin M. Mundel for ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation,AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, and Medical Initiatives, Incorporated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/19/2023. (jam)
October 18, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin M. Mundel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10606706 filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated. (Kelley, Brett)
October 18, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott D. Stein. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10606702 filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated. (Kelley, Brett)
October 18, 2023 Filing 21 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Scott D. Stein, Benjamin M. Munde and Madeleine Joseph as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
October 17, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett D. Kelley, Douglas A. Kelley and Perry F. Sekus on behalf of All Defendants. (Kelley, Brett) Modified text on 10/18/2023 (MMP).
October 17, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated.(Kelley, Brett)
October 17, 2023 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated.(Kelley, Brett)
October 17, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated.(Kelley, Brett)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Date and time to be determined. (Kelley, Brett)
October 17, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated. (Kelley, Brett)
October 10, 2023 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Ulrich, Tyler)
October 2, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Medical Initiatives, Incorporated served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (Saxena, Surya)
October 2, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (Saxena, Surya)
October 2, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (Saxena, Surya)
October 2, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (Saxena, Surya)
October 2, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. AmerisourceBergen Corporation served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (Saxena, Surya)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tyler Evan Ulrich for United Healthcare Services, Inc.; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Hamish P.M. Hume for United Healthcare Services, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/21/2023. (jam)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jerry W. Blackwell recused. Case reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-2890 (DWF/ECW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 9/20/2023.(MKB)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hamish Hume. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10546461 filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Saxena, Surya)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tyler Ulrich. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10546437 filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Saxena, Surya)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Tyler Ulrich, Hamish Hume as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated. (MKB)
September 20, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-2890 (JWB/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Oncology Supply Company, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Medical Initiatives, Incorporated d/b/a Oncology Supply Pharmacy Services (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10545637) filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Saxena, Surya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Healthcare Services, Inc. v. AmerisourceBergen Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Surya Saxena
Represented By: Hamish P.M. Hume
Represented By: Erin Emory
Represented By: Tyler Evan Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Represented By: Douglas A Kelley
Represented By: Brett D. Kelley
Represented By: Perry Sekus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Brett D. Kelley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Represented By: Douglas A Kelley
Represented By: Perry Sekus
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Specialty Group, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Represented By: Brett D. Kelley
Represented By: Douglas A Kelley
Represented By: Perry Sekus
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Oncology Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Initiatives, Incorporated d/b/a Oncology Supply Pharmacy Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASD Specialty Healthcare, LLC doing business as Oncology Supply Company
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Brett D. Kelley
Represented By: Douglas A Kelley
Represented By: Perry Sekus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Initiatives, Incorporated doing business as Oncology Supply Pharmacy Services
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Represented By: Brett D. Kelley
Represented By: Douglas A Kelley
Represented By: Perry Sekus
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?