Reger v. Associated Press, The
Plaintiff: Michael Reger
Defendant: Associated Press, The
Case Number: 0:2023cv02983
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Micko
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 24 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RMM)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text-Only) ORDER: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss #15 , the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 11/1/2023.(jme)
November 1, 2023 Filing 22 Amended Declaration of Isabella Salomao Nascimento in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Associated Press, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K)(Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Associated Press, The.(Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 20 Declaration of Isabella Salomao Nascimento in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Associated Press, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K)(Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 19 Declaration of Leita Walker in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Associated Press, The.(Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Associated Press, The. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Associated Press, The.(Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Associated Press, The. (Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Associated Press, The. (Walker, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emmy Parsons for Associated Press, The. Approved by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 10/31/2023. (jam)
October 30, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emmy Parsons. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10628536 filed by Associated Press, The. (Walker, Mary)
October 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Isabella Salomao Nascimento on behalf of Associated Press, The. (Salomao Nascimento, Isabella)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER: Based on the parties' Stipulation #8 , and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have until and including October 31, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 10/6/2023. (jme)
October 5, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Walker, Mary)
October 5, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer Complaint to 10/31/2023 by Associated Press, The. Jointly Signed by Michael Reger and The Associated Press. (Walker, Mary)
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Andreleita Walker on behalf of Associated Press, The. (Walker, Mary)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Reger. Associated Press, The served on 9/27/2023, answer due 10/18/2023. (Berens, Barbara)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Reger. Associated Press, The served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (Berens, Barbara)
September 27, 2023 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Signature Page re #1 Complaint, filed by Michael Reger. (Berens, Barbara)
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Associated Press, The. (CLK)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 23-cv-2983 WMW/DLM.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Associated Press (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10559548) filed by Michael L. Reger. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Berens, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reger v. Associated Press, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reger
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Press, The
Represented By: Emmy Parsons
Represented By: Isabella Salomao Nascimento
Represented By: Mary Andreleita Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?