State of Minnesota v. Azure et al
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Defendant: Evan Azure and Geno LeValdo
Case Number: 0:2023cv03321
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #13 ), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/27/2023.(LNP)
December 26, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo.(Smith, Rob)
December 26, 2023 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo.(Smith, Rob)
December 26, 2023 Filing 17 Declaration of William Bell in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo.(Smith, Rob)
December 26, 2023 Filing 16 Declaration of Evan Azure in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo.(Smith, Rob)
December 26, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Smith, Rob)
December 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Smith, Rob)
December 26, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo. (Smith, Rob)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Jacobsen on behalf of All Defendants. (Jacobsen, Cassandra)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bree R. Black Horse for Evan Azure, and Geno LeValdo.; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark Reeves for Evan Azure, and Geno LeValdo.; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rob Roy Smith for Evan Azure, and Geno LeValdo. Approved by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 11/27/2023. (jam)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rob Roy Smith. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10673558 filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo. (Mogensen, Samuel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark Reeves. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10673534 filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo. (Mogensen, Samuel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bree BlackHorse. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10673494 filed by Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo. (Mogensen, Samuel)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEFING ORDER. See Order for dates and deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 11/21/2023.(CLG)
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H Silton on behalf of All Defendants. (Silton, Steven)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Eric Mogensen on behalf of All Defendants. (Mogensen, Samuel)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Minnesota. Evan Azure served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/27/2023; Geno LeValdo served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Welle, Adam) Modified text on 11/9/2023 (CLK).
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Evan Azure, Geno LeValdo. (MKB)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 23-cv-3321 (PJS/DJF).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10626742) filed by State of Minnesota by its Attorney General, Keith Ellison. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Welle, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Minnesota v. Azure et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Bennett Hartz
Represented By: Adam H Welle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Azure
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Represented By: Cassandra Jacobsen
Represented By: Mark Reeves
Represented By: Rob Roy Smith
Represented By: Samuel Eric Mogensen
Represented By: Steven H Silton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geno LeValdo
Represented By: Cassandra Jacobsen
Represented By: Rob Roy Smith
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Represented By: Mark Reeves
Represented By: Samuel Eric Mogensen
Represented By: Steven H Silton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?