Buan v. Aatru Medical, LLC
Plaintiff: John Buan
Defendant: Aatru Medical, LLC
Case Number: 0:2023cv03357
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jerry W Blackwell
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Filing 15 CORRECTED LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Aatru Medical, LLC re #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Aatru Medical, LLC.(Michelson, Deborah) Modified text on 12/14/2023 (ABR).
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General with Prejudice Counts I-V and VII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aatru Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Michelson, Deborah)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General with Prejudice Counts I-V and VII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by John Buan. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Coan, Kevin)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss #7 , the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, the parties shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/9/2023. (HAM)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General with Prejudice Counts I-V and VII of Plaintiff's Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (Michelson, Deborah)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Aatru Medical, LLC.(Michelson, Deborah)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General with Prejudice Counts I-V and VII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aatru Medical, LLC.(Michelson, Deborah)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General with Prejudice Counts I-V and VII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aatru Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Michelson, Deborah)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/General with Prejudice Counts I-V and VII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aatru Medical, LLC. (Michelson, Deborah)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jerry W. Blackwell recused. Case reassigned to Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-3357 JRT/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 11/2/2023. (ACH)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Deborah Jill Michelson for Aatru Medical, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/2/2023. (jam)
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 23-cv-3357 JWB/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Deborah J. Michelson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10635228 filed by Aatru Medical, LLC. (Schmitt, Joseph)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Aatru Medical, LLC. (Schmitt, Joseph)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10635082) filed by Aatru Medical, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Joseph G. Schmitt, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph G. Schmitt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmitt, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buan v. Aatru Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Buan
Represented By: Kevin R Coan
Represented By: Jessica P. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aatru Medical, LLC
Represented By: Joseph G Schmitt
Represented By: Deborah Jill Michelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?