Clayborne v. Minnesota Department of Corrections, The et al
Plaintiff: Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Corrections, The, Brian Collins, Kristina Rish, John Klar, Mike Lott, David W. Evans, Spencer Lekander, Thomas Fishback, Ethan Bjorklund, Thomas Herman, Marc Magnusen, Matthew Noland, Darrel M. Berry, Edward Stone, John Does and Crystal Hansen
Case Number: 0:2023cv03612
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey M Bryan
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Filing 31 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan, this case is reassigned to him. Judge Eric C. Tostrud is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-3612 JMB/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. . Note: any current hearings or conferences before the district judge in this case are canceled unless otherwise indicated by the new DJ courtroom deputy. (kt)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Extend the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Collins shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before 2/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/29/2023. (EPD)
December 28, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian Collins re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #26 Declaration in Support, #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Amended Complaint , #22 Notice of Appearance, #28 Proposed Order to Judge, #27 Meet and Confer Statement (Olander, Carole)
December 28, 2023 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Brian Collins.(Olander, Carole)
December 28, 2023 Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Brian Collins.(Olander, Carole)
December 28, 2023 Filing 26 Declaration of Katie Olander in Support of #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Brian Collins.(Olander, Carole)
December 28, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Brian Collins. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olander, Carole)
December 28, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Brian Collins. (Olander, Carole)
December 28, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Jonassen on behalf of Brian Collins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jonassen, Kevin)
December 28, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole C. Olander on behalf of Brian Collins. (Olander, Carole)
December 19, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Darrel M. Berry served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Ethan Bjorklund served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Brian Collins served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; David W. Evans served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Thomas Fishback served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Crystal Hansen served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Thomas Herman served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; John Klar served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Spencer Lekander served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Mike Lott served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Marc Magnusen served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Matthew Noland served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Kristina Rish served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024; Edward Stone served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024. (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/4/2024 (ACH).
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Motion for Preliminary Injunction #18 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 12/15/2023. (RMM)
December 14, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne.(ACH) Document QC'd on 1/4/2024 (ACH).
December 14, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/4/2024 (ACH).
December 6, 2023 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Darrel M. Berry, John Does, Crystal Hansen, Marc Magnusen, Matthew Noland, Edward Stone. (ACH) cc: Clayborne w/Info Sheet #2. Modified text on 12/6/2023 (ACH).
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Ethan Bjorklund, Brian Collins, David W. Evans, Thomas Fishback, Thomas Herman, John Klar, Spencer Lekander, Mike Lott, Minnesota Department of Corrections, The, Kristina Rish. (ACH) cc: Clayborne w/Info Sheet #2. Modified text on 12/6/2023 (ACH).
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. Filer requests summons issued. (ACH) Modified text on 12/6/2023 (ACH). Document QC'd on 1/4/2024 (ACH).
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER: Plaintiff Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne has filed a second Motion for Preliminary Injunction, which the Court construes as a motion for an ex parte temporary restraining order because process has not been served. ECF No. 12. Evidently, Mr. Clayborne filed this signed Motion to correct the lack of a signature on his first Motion. See ECF Nos. 5, 9, and 12. However, as explained in the Order denying Mr. Claybornes first Motion [ECF No. 9], leaving aside the absence of a signature, Mr. Clayborne has failed to show immediate and irreparable injury will result absent the requested ex parte temporary restraining order. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED THAT the Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 12] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 12/4/2023. (RMM)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne in SUPPORT OF #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(ACH) Document QC'd on 12/29/2023 (CLK).
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. (ACH) Document QC'd on 12/29/2023 (CLK).
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief (TRO) and Protective Order #5 is DENIED. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 12/4/2023. (RMM)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Darrel M. Berry, John Does, Thomas Herman, Marc Magnusen, Matthew Noland, Edward Stone. (kt)cc: Clayborne at St. Paul Intake counter with Service Information sheet. (kt)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ethan Bjorklund, Brian Collins, David W. Evans, Thomas Fishback, John Klar, Spencer Lekander, Mike Lott, Minnesota Department of Corrections, The, Kristina Rish. (kt)cc: Clayborne at St. Paul Intake counter with Service Information sheet.
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED// AFFIDAVIT of Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne in SUPPORT OF #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(ACH) Modified text on 12/4/2023 (ACH).
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED//EXHIBIT Signed Copy of Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne.(ACH) Modified text on 12/4/2023 (ACH).
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne.(MMG) Document QC'd on 12/29/2023 (CLK).
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. (MMG) Document QC'd on 12/29/2023 (CLK).
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000557 in the amount of $402.00 issued to Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. (JGK)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/28/2023. (EB)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK) Document QC'd on 12/13/2023 (JME).
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darrel M. Berry, Ethan Bjorklund, Brian Collins, John Does, David W. Evans, Thomas Fishback, Thomas Herman, John Klar, Spencer Lekander, Mike Lott, Marc Magnusen, Minnesota Department of Corrections, The, Matthew Noland, Kristina Rish, Edward Stone filed by Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/13/2023 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayborne v. Minnesota Department of Corrections, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Rodney Richard Clayborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Corrections, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Collins
Represented By: Carole C. Olander
Represented By: Kevin Jonassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Rish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Klar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Lekander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Fishback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Bjorklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Magnusen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel M. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?