Boulanger v. Holets
Plaintiff: Eugene Lionel Boulanger
Defendant: Jonathan Holets
Case Number: 0:2023cv03696
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 28 FILING NEW CIVIL CASE FEE ADJUSTMENT PAID in the amount of $3, receipt number AMNDC-10792140. (Campanario, Nick)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 BRIEFING ORDER. See Order for briefing deadlines on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/19/2024. (BJP)
January 17, 2024 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Holets re #25 Statement of Case, #24 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Campanario, Nick)
January 17, 2024 Filing 25 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Jonathan Holets. (Campanario, Nick)
January 17, 2024 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Jonathan Holets. Jointly Signed by Eugene L. Boulanger.(Campanario, Nick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Holets re #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #17 Declaration in Support, #18 Proposed Order to Judge (Campanario, Nick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Holets re #15 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Campanario, Nick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Eugene Lionel Boulanger re #20 Defendant's Defenses #1-3, #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ABR) Document QC'd on 1/18/2024 (MKB).
January 16, 2024 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report Defendant's Defenses #1-3. re #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Eugene Lionel Boulanger. (ABR) Document QC'd on 1/18/2024 (MKB).
January 16, 2024 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Eugene Lionel Boulanger.(ABR) Document QC'd on 1/18/2024 (MKB).
January 16, 2024 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jonathan Holets.(Campanario, Nick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 Declaration of Nick D. Campanario in Support of #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jonathan Holets. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Campanario, Nick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jonathan Holets. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Campanario, Nick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Date and time to be determined. (Campanario, Nick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jonathan Holets. (Campanario, Nick)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 The Case for Aggressive Civility, #2 Consent Form)(JLB)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Eugene Lionel Boulanger re #11 Exhibit, #10 Response. (ABR) Document QC'd on 12/20/2023 (MKB).
December 18, 2023 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #10 Response filed by Eugene Lionel Boulanger.(ABR) Document QC'd on 12/20/2023 (MKB).
December 18, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Eugene Lionel Boulanger.(ABR) Document QC'd on 12/20/2023 (MKB).
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER TO THE COURT from Eugene Lionel Boulanger. (ABR) Document QC'd on 12/15/23 by MMP. Modified text on 12/15/2023 (MMP).
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Holets re #7 Answer to Complaint (Campanario, Nick)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jonathan Holets. (Campanario, Nick)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER that #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Defendant Jonathan Holets is/are not properly before this court and therefore denied without prejudice. In order to be considered, any motion previously filed in state court must be refiled in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this District. Orders entered by the state court prior to removal remain in effect. Approved by the Court on 12/4/2023. (ABR)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE re #4 Motion to Dismiss/General is a copy of a document filed in St. Louis County District Court. (ABR)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jonathan Holets. (ABR)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Holets re #1 Notice of Removal,, and Certificate re Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Campanario, Nick)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (5th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 23-cv-3696 (KMM/LIB).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota District Court for the Sixth Judicial District, case number Case No. 69DU-CV-23-2226 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10691425) filed by Jonathan Holets. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Campanario, Nick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boulanger v. Holets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Lionel Boulanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Holets
Represented By: Nick D Campanario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?