Sagataw et al v. Frey
Plaintiff: Cheryl Sagataw, DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms and Roberta Strong
Defendant: Mayor Jacob Frey
Case Number: 0:2024cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Sharda Enslin in Opposition to #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Enslin, Sharda)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Enrique Velazquez in Opposition to #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Enslin, Sharda)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECLARATION of Ashley Jensen in Opposition to #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Enslin, Sharda)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECLARATION of Donna Neste in Opposition to #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey.(Enslin, Sharda)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECLARATION of John Richard in Opposition to #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey.(Enslin, Sharda)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECLARATION of Barb Mellen in Opposition to #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey.(Enslin, Sharda)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Enslin, Sharda)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint filed by Jacob Frey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 Second Declaration of Enrique Velazquez) (Sarff, Kristin)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (Text-Only) BRIEFING ORDER re: Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #31 . Defendant's Opposition brief is due on or before 3/1/2024. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. Ordered by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/21/2024.(RMM)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Second Declaration of Christin Crabtree in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Declaration of Jamie Bachaus in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Declaration of Lyle Thunder Hawk in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Declaration of Andrew Fahlstrom in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Declaration of Franklin Eagle Tail in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Second Declaration of Nicole Perez in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Second Declaration of Aaron Johnson in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Declaration of Roberta Strong in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Declaration of Isabel Diez in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Second Declaration of DeAnthony Barnes in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Declaration of Travis Neloms in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Declaration of Imogen Page in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Declaration of Veronica Tiger in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Declaration of Janet Marie Court in Support of #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong.(Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION re #31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong. Jointly Signed by Jacob Frey. (Kelley, Kira)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Travis Neloms, Cheryl Sagataw, Roberta Strong. (Kelley, Kira)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw. No summons requested. (Kelley, Kira)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order / Preliminary Injunction held on 1/3/2024 before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (77 pages). Court Reporter: Tim Willette. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 1/30/2024. Redaction Request due 2/13/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2024. (TJW)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Enrique Velazquez by Jacob Frey . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Enslin, Sharda)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jacob Frey. (Enslin, Sharda)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CHANGE for #22 Transcript Request: Delivery method changed from Daily to 30-day per discussion with ordering party. (TJW)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST. (Enslin, Sharda)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMG)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Tim Willette. (JGK)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction #4 is denied for the reasons stated on the record at the January 3, 2024 hearing. SO ORDERED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 1/3/2024.(RMM)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 1/3/2024: Oral Arguments Motion Hearing.Court Reporter: Tim WilletteSt. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom 7ATime: 2:03 PM - 3:36 PM3:53 PM - 4:16 PMTotal Time: 1 Hour 56 MinutesAPPEARANCES:For Plaintiff(s): Kira KelleyFor Defendant(s): Sharda Enslin, Heather Robertson, Kristen Sarf and Haynes Hanson PROCEEDINGS: Hearing on: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cheryl Sagataw, DeAnthony Barnes. The motion was moved, argued and denied for the reasons stated on the record. No Order to follow. (RMM)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw.(Kelley, Kira)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharda R Enslin on behalf of Jacob Frey. (Enslin, Sharda)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Enrique Velazquez in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Enslin, Sharda)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Jacob Frey. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Enslin, Sharda)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #12 Summons Returned Executed (Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Kelley, Kira) Modified text on 1/3/2024 (kt).
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-only) BRIEFING ORDER re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Any memorandum and materials Defendant may file in response to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order are due on or before January 3, 2024 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiffs are ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this briefing order expeditiously. Ordered by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 1/2/2024.(RMM)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw. Jacob Frey served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. (Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Declaration of CHRISTIN CRABTREE in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw.(Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Declaration of CLAIRE NICOLE GLENN in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw.(Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Declaration of AARON JOHNSON in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw.(Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Declaration of NICOLE PEREZ in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw.(Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Declaration of CHERYL SAGATAW in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw.(Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Declaration of DEANTHONY BARNES in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw.(Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DeAnthony Barnes, Cheryl Sagataw. (Kelley, Kira)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jacob Frey. (MKB)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-1 (ECT/TNL).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10744656) filed by DeAnthony Barnes. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kelley, Kira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sagataw et al v. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Sagataw
Represented By: Kira Aakre Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAnthony Barnes
Represented By: Kira Aakre Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Neloms
Represented By: Kira Aakre Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Strong
Represented By: Kira Aakre Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Jacob Frey
Represented By: Kristin R. Sarff
Represented By: Sharda R Enslin
Represented By: Heather Passe Robertson
Represented By: J. Haynes Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?