Pickle v. Minnesota Association of Townships et al
Plaintiff: Robert J. Pickle
Defendant: Minnesota Association of Townships, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Steven M. Fenske, Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Heather E. Tidmore, Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Lyle A. Stai, Reno C. Wells, Corey M. Hanson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Amanda K. Peterson, Bret P. Holte, Wayne S. Thom and Christina L. Lien
Case Number: 0:2024cv00053
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jerry W Blackwell
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #40 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. Defense counsel's letter request to enlarge the word count limit for their reply memorandum (Doc. No. 40) is DENIED as premature. Defense counsel may renew the request after Plaintiff submits an opposition memorandum. Requests for additional words are generally disfavored. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 3/5/2024.(MSK)
March 4, 2024 Filing 42 LETTER RESPONSE re #40 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. (Pickle, Robert)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kelcy Whitaker for Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge,Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker,Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore and Reno C. Wells. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/29/2024. (KMO)
February 28, 2024 Filing 40 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Moen, Nicole)
February 28, 2024 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells.(Moen, Nicole)
February 28, 2024 Filing 38 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #34 Motion to Dismiss/General, filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells.(Moen, Nicole)
February 28, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell. (Moen, Nicole)
February 28, 2024 Filing 36 Declaration of Nicole M. Moen in Support of #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Moen, Nicole)
February 28, 2024 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Moen, Nicole)
February 28, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells. (Moen, Nicole)
February 28, 2024 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Minnesota Association of Townships. (McNulty, William)
February 28, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Attorney Harrison E. Berg as CO-COUNSEL for Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells. (Berg, Harrison) Modified text on 2/28/2024 (MMP).
February 28, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Attorney William McNulty as CO-COUNSEL for Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells. (Berg, Harrison) Modified text on 2/28/2024 (MMP).
February 28, 2024 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Corey M. Hanson, Bret P. Holte, Christina L. Lien, Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Wayne S. Thom.(Wolf, Andrew)
February 28, 2024 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew A. Wolf in SUPPORT OF #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Corey M. Hanson, Bret P. Holte, Christina L. Lien, Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Wayne S. Thom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Placeholder for Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Certificate of Service of conventionally filed documents)(Wolf, Andrew) PORTABLE MEDIA CONVENTIONALLY FILED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 2/28/24. Modified text on 2/29/2024 (CLK).
February 28, 2024 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Corey M. Hanson, Bret P. Holte, Christina L. Lien, Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Wayne S. Thom. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wolf, Andrew)
February 28, 2024 Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #25 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Corey M. Hanson, Bret P. Holte, Christina L. Lien, Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Wayne S. Thom.(Wolf, Andrew)
February 28, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell. (Wolf, Andrew)
February 28, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Corey M. Hanson, Bret P. Holte, Christina L. Lien, Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Wayne S. Thom. (Wolf, Andrew)
February 27, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelcy L. Whitaker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10868994 filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells. (Moen, Nicole)
February 27, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William J McNulty on behalf of Steven M. Fenske. (McNulty, William)
February 20, 2024 Filing 22 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. ALREADY FILED AT DOC. 17. Summons Returned Unexecuted by Robert J. Pickle as to Steven M. Fenske. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Modified text on 2/20/2024 (JME).
February 9, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert J. Pickle. Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust served on 2/7/2024, answer due 2/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MN Twp News 2012-05.06-1, #2 Exhibit B - Executive Director old job description , #3 Exhibit C - Executive director new job description, #4 Exhibit D - MATIT brd minutes (2023-02-15), #5 Exhibit E - Pickle email (2024-02-06), #6 Exhibit F - Pickle to Reuvers (2024-02-08) (Service via email and link to Google Drive?))(Pickle, Robert) Modified text on 2/9/2024 (ABR).
February 9, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert J. Pickle. Steven M. Fenske served on 2/7/2024, answer due 2/28/2024. (Pickle, Robert)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. All Defendants shall have until February 28, 2024, to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/7/2024. (JLB)
February 7, 2024 Filing 18 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells Letter to Magistrate Judge Brisbois re Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading. (Moen, Nicole)
February 6, 2024 Filing 17 EXHIBIT C Amended Non-Service Affidavit for Steven Michael Fenske #1 re #16 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, filed by Robert J. Pickle.(Pickle, Robert)
February 5, 2024 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Pickle in OPPOSITION TO #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading filed by Robert J. Pickle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Moen Emails, chain # 6 (One last attempt. Part of my legal reasoning) (2023-12-15 to 2024-01-09), #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - Fenske's 7 email receipts (2024-01-16), DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - Fenske Affidavit of Nonservice #1, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Fenske Affidavit of Nonservice #2, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. E - Pickle to Moen et al (4 service-related questions) (2024-01-29), #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. F - Service Costs Thus Far, #7 Exhibit(s) Ex. G - Krueger to NCAT & affected twps (2022-10-19 & 2022-10-20), #8 Exhibit(s) Ex. H - Jan 2024 - Notice of Bylaw Changes for website (1), #9 Exhibit(s) Ex. I - MAT Bylaws - Revised Dec 2023 Proposed with Markup, #10 Exhibit(s) Ex. J - Robert's Rules of Order Revised on quorums, #11 Exhibit(s) Ex. K - Krueger letter & email chain (2023-04-19 to 2023-04-24), #12 Exhibit(s) Ex. L - Moen Emails, chain # 1 (2023-04-27 to 2023-05-08), #13 Exhibit(s) Ex. M - Moen Emails, chain # 2 (2023-05-09 & 2023-05-10), #14 Exhibit(s) Ex. N - Moen Emails, chain # 3 (Re MAT-MATIT Data Requests) (2023-05-18 to 2023-06-06), #15 Exhibit(s) Ex. O - Moen Emails, chain # 4 (2023-06-09 & 2023-06-12), #16 Exhibit(s) Ex. P - Pickle to Moen et al (Outstanding data requests to MATIT and MAT. 1983 claim implications. Old request now made as data request) (2024-07-17), #17 Exhibit(s) Ex. Q - Pickle to Moen et al (Re Journalistic questions for MAT-MATIT on seven topics) (2023-07-19), #18 Exhibit(s) Ex. R - Moen Emails, chain # 5 (2023-07-19 to 2023-08-10), #19 Exhibit(s) Ex. S - Pickle to Moen (Two important data requests. Please read carefully) (2024-12-20), #20 Exhibit(s) Ex. T - Wolf email chain (Re Pickle Federal Lawsuit) (2024-01-31 & 02-01-2024), #21 Exhibit(s) Ex. U - MN Twp Insider 2022 Summ-4-5 (Krueger: has read MAT's newspapers from 70's and 80's), #22 Exhibit(s) Ex. V - MN Twp Insider 2023 Cal-4 (Krueger: read Fricke's prolific writings documented everything))(Pickle, Robert) Modified text on 2/6/2024 (MMP).
February 5, 2024 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading filed by Robert J. Pickle. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pickle, Robert)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells.(Moen, Nicole)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion for Extension of Time (General), filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells.(Moen, Nicole)
February 2, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading : Date and time to be determined. (Moen, Nicole)
February 2, 2024 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells. (Moen, Nicole)
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Wolf on behalf of Corey M. Hanson, Bret P. Holte, Christina L. Lien, Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Wayne S. Thom. (Wolf, Andrew)
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William J McNulty on behalf of Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Association of Townships, Lyle A. Stai, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells. (McNulty, William)
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert J. Pickle. Corey M. Hanson served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024; Frank D. Hard served on 1/22/2024, answer due 2/12/2024; Jeffrey S. Krueger served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024; Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024; Heather E. Tidmore served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024. (Pickle, Robert)
January 25, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert J. Pickle. Gary E. Burdorf served on 1/18/2024, answer due 2/8/2024; Rex A. Edge served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024; Jill K. Hall served on 1/18/2024, answer due 2/8/2024; Bret P. Holte served on 1/18/2024, answer due 2/8/2024; Sandra M. Hooker served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024; Christina L. Lien served on 1/18/2024, answer due 2/8/2024; Minnesota Association of Townships served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024; Amanda K. Peterson served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024; Jonathan O. Peterson served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024; Lyle A. Stai served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024; Wayne S. Thom served on 1/18/2024, answer due 2/8/2024; Reno C. Wells served on 1/18/2024, answer due 2/8/2024. (Pickle, Robert)
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 RECEIPT number 400004448 in the amount of $405.00 issued to Bob Pickle. (CLK) Document QC'd on 2/14/2024 (ABR).
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint,, filed by Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Corey M. Hanson, Frank D. Hard, Bret P. Holte, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Christina L. Lien, Minnesota Association of Townships, Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Lyle A. Stai, Wayne S. Thom, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells filed by Robert J. Pickle. (Pickle, Robert) Modified text on 1/12/2024 (MMP).
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Robert J. Pickle is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Robert J. Pickle has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (KMO)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Corey M. Hanson, Bret P. Holte, Christina L. Lien, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Lyle A. Stai, Wayne S. Thom, Reno C. Wells. (ACH) cc: Pickle w/Info Sheet #2. Modified text on 1/9/2024 (ACH).
January 9, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Frank D. Hard, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Minnesota Associatin of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Minnesota Association of Townships, Heather E. Tidmore. (ACH) cc: Pickle w/Info Sheet #2. Modified text on 1/9/2024 (ACH).
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary E. Burdorf, Rex A. Edge, Steven M. Fenske, Jill K. Hall, Corey M. Hanson, Frank D. Hard, Bret P. Holte, Sandra M. Hooker, Jeffrey S. Krueger, Christina L. Lien, Minnesota Associatin of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust, Minnesota Association of Townships, Amanda K. Peterson, Jonathan O. Peterson, Lyle A. Stai, Wayne S. Thom, Heather E. Tidmore, Reno C. Wells (filing fee $405, receipt number 0000) filed by Robert J. Pickle. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (6th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/17/2024 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickle v. Minnesota Association of Townships et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Pickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Association of Townships
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Krueger
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Fenske
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Association of Townships Insurance and Bond Trust
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Paul D Reuvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather E. Tidmore
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary E. Burdorf
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex A. Edge
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill K. Hall
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank D. Hard
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra M. Hooker
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle A. Stai
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno C. Wells
Represented By: Harrison E Berg
Represented By: Kelcy Whitaker
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: William J McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey M. Hanson
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Paul D Reuvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan O. Peterson
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Paul D Reuvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda K. Peterson
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Paul D Reuvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret P. Holte
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Paul D Reuvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne S. Thom
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Paul D Reuvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina L. Lien
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Paul D Reuvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?