Meyer v. Welsch et al
Plaintiff: Scott Meyer
Defendant: Olmsted County Court, Hans Holland, "Kim", John/Jane Doe, "Gayla", Heidi Welsch and John Doe
Case Number: 0:2024cv00073
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 48 SEALED EXHIBIT exhibit 23 placeholder re #46 Exhibit,,, #45 Proposed Order to Judge, #47 Exhibit,, #41 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time , #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time, #42 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings draft 2nd amended complaint filed by scott meyer.(Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 47 EXHIBIT exhibit 29 re #46 Exhibit,,, #45 Proposed Order to Judge, #41 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time , #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time, #42 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings draft 2nd amended complaint filed by Scott Meyer.(Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 46 EXHIBIT exhibit 1 re #45 Proposed Order to Judge, #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time, #41 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time , #42 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings draft 2nd amended complaint filed by Scott Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s))(Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 45 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #41 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time , #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time, #42 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings draft 2nd amended complaint filed by Scott Meyer.(Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 44 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #42 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings draft 2nd amended complaint, #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time, #41 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time : Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 43 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #41 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #40 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #42 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 42 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings draft 2nd amended complaint filed by Scott Meyer. (Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 41 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time filed by Scott Meyer. (Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 40 First MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings motion for leave to amend complaint for a 2nd time filed by Scott Meyer. (Meyer, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #38 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's request to be excused from re-filing exhibits is denied. Any amended pleading must be complete in itself and must not incorporate by reference any prior pleading. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/8/2024.(TJS)
March 8, 2024 Filing 38 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Scott Meyer John F., Docherty, US Magistrate Judge. (Meyer, Scott)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER in Response to #25 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/6/2024. (ATB)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO HEIDI WELSCH AND COUNTY OF OLMSTED ONLY Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/5/2024.(las)
March 5, 2024 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Scott Meyer re #31 Proposed Order to Judge, #1 Complaint,,,, #33 Proposed Order to Judge, #26 Proposed Order to Judge, #30 Proposed Order to Judge, #27 Meet and Confer Statement (Meyer, Scott)
March 5, 2024 Filing 34 EXHIBIT - corrected first pg of 2nd amended complaint re: #31 Proposed Order to Judge, #1 Complaint,,,, #33 Proposed Order to Judge, #26 Proposed Order to Judge, #32 Corrected MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings corrected to add missing page filed by Scott Meyer. (Meyer, Scott) Modified text on 3/5/2024 (MMP).
March 5, 2024 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #32 Corrected MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings corrected to add missing page filed by Scott Meyer.(Meyer, Scott)
March 5, 2024 Filing 32 EXHIBIT - corrected to add missing page re: #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings and #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer. (Meyer, Scott) Modified text on 3/5/2024 (MMP).
March 4, 2024 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(Meyer, Scott)
March 4, 2024 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #29 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Giesen, John)
March 4, 2024 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Olmsted County and Heidi Welsch by Heidi Welsch. Jointly Signed by Scott Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Giesen, John)
March 4, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Giesen on behalf of Heidi Welsch. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Giesen, John)
March 4, 2024 Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(Meyer, Scott)
March 4, 2024 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement #7 statement of claim, #2 Supplement memorandum of points, law, and authoritites)(Meyer, Scott)
March 2, 2024 Filing 25 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Scott Meyer . (Meyer, Scott)
February 28, 2024 Filing 24 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Scott Howard Meyer is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Scott Howard Meyer has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (KMO)
February 26, 2024 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Meyer re #18 Exhibit, #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #14 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #15 Memorandum, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #16 Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LTT)
February 26, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Meyer re #18 Exhibit, #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #14 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #15 Memorandum, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #16 Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LTT)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text-Only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. This matter is before the Court on the Plaintiff's Motion to Allow a 2nd Amendment to the Complaint (Dkt. No. #13 ). The Motion does not comply with D. Minn. Local Rules 7.1 and 15.1 in several respects. Therefore, by 5:00 p.m. on March 1, 2024, Mr. Meyer is directed to call chambers and schedule a hearing on the motion, meet and confer with opposing counsel in a good-faith effort to resolve the issues raised by the motion and file a meet-and confer statement, notice of hearing, a proposed order (a Word version of which must be emailed to chambers), and a version of his proposed amended complaint that shows--through redlining, underlining, strikeouts, or other similarly effective typographic methods--how the proposed complaint differs from the currently effective complaint (Dkt. No. #8 ). See D. Minn. LR 15.1(b)(2). If Mr. Meyer does not complete the following tasks by the due date, the Court will deny the motion without prejudice for failure to follow the Local Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/23/2024.(ATB)
February 22, 2024 Filing 20 EXHIBIT 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(LTT)
February 22, 2024 Filing 19 EXHIBIT 5: MEMORANDUM OF LAW, POINTS, AUTHORITIES re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(LTT)
February 22, 2024 Filing 18 EXHIBIT 4: STATEMENT OF THE CLIENT re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(LTT) Modified text on 2/22/2024 (LTT).
February 22, 2024 Filing 17 EXHIBIT: PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(LTT) Modified text on 2/22/2024 (LTT).
February 22, 2024 Filing 16 EXHIBIT (COPY OF LETTER FROM MN ATTORNEY GENERAL KEITH ELLISON) re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(LTT) Modified text on 2/22/2024 (LTT).
February 22, 2024 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW, POINTS, AND AUTHORITIES re #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(LTT)
February 22, 2024 Filing 14 EXHIBIT re #13 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #12 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Meyer.(LTT)
February 22, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION PLAINTIFF MEYER REQUESTS TO LEAVE TO AMEND, A 2ND TIME, HIS COMPLAINT RE: CASE # 24-CV-00073-DWF/JFD filed by Scott Meyer. (LTT)
February 22, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION TO ALLOW A 2ND AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Scott Meyer. (LTT)
February 12, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Scott Meyer. John Doe served on 2/7/2024, answer due 4/8/2024; Heidi Welsch served on 2/7/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LTT) Document QCd and modified file date on 3/7/2024 (MMG).
February 1, 2024 Filing 10 LETTER from the Clerk's Office to Scott Meyer. (LTT)
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John Doe and Heidi Welsch. (LTT)
January 30, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heidi Welsch, John Doe. filed by Scott Meyer. (LTT) Document QC'd on 2/14/2024 (JME).
January 26, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION: NEF regenerated for #1 Complaint as civil cover sheet was scanned and attached. (JME)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to "Gayla", "Kim", John/Jane Doe, Hans Holland, Olmsted County Court. (kt) cc: Meyer with Service Information Sheet. (kt)
January 17, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to "Gayla", "Kim", John/Jane Doe, Hans Holland, Olmsted County Court. (kt)cc: Meyer with Service Information Sheet. (kt)
January 16, 2024 Filing 4 RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000587 in the amount of $405.00 issued to Scott Meyer. (JGK)
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Scott Meyer (JGK)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint, filed by Scott Meyer.(JGK)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against "Gayla", "Kim", John/Jane Doe, Hans Holland, Olmsted County Court filed by Scott Meyer. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10, #12 Exhibit(s) 11, #13 Exhibit(s) 12, #14 Exhibit(s) 13, #15 Exhibit(s) 14, #16 Exhibit(s) 15, #17 Exhibit(s) 16, #18 Exhibit(s) 17, #19 Exhibit(s) 18, #20 Exhibit(s) 19, #21 Exhibit(s) 20, #22 Exhibit(s) 21, #23 Exhibit(s) 22, #24 Exhibit(s) 24, #25 Exhibit(s) 25, #26 Exhibit(s) 26, #27 Envelope, #28 Envelope) (JGK) Modified text on 1/11/2024 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Welsch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olmsted County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Kim"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Gayla"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Welsch
Represented By: Gregory J Griffiths
Represented By: John Thomas Giesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?