Rhodes v. McGee et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Rhodes
Defendant: Michael McGee, Boyd Beccue, William Chandler, Kandiyohi County, Minnesota, Ramsey County, Minnesota, Hennepin County, Minnesota, William Joseph Chandler, Kandiyohi County, Ramsey County and Hennepin County
Case Number: 0:2024cv00104
Filed: January 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Zane Aubert on behalf of Michael McGee. (Aubert, Zane)
March 12, 2024 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin McCarthy on behalf of Michael McGee. (McCarthy, Kevin)
March 12, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Wilk on behalf of Michael McGee. (Wilk, David)
March 12, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Solheim on behalf of Michael McGee. (Solheim, Mark)
March 12, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Michael McGee. (Wilk, David)
March 5, 2024 Filing 37 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #36 Motion for Extension of Time (General) filed by Thomas Rhodes.(Elson, Ben)
March 4, 2024 Filing 36 MOTION to Extend the Time for Service Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) filed by Thomas Rhodes. DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elson, Ben) Modified text on 3/5/2024 (MKB).
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (Text-Only) ORDER on #31 Stipulation. ORDERED the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time, construed as Defendant McGee's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Doc. #31) is, with Plaintiff having consented to the requested extension, GRANTED. Defendant McGee is granted leave to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 13, 2024. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Wimes on 2/29/2024.(TLD)
February 27, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John M Degnan on behalf of Michael McGee. (Degnan, John)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FILED IN ERROR. PROPOSED ORDER WENT TO A JUDGE NO LONGER ASSIGNED TO THIS CASE. ORDER ISSUED IN ERROR. ORDER on #31 Stipulation. Michael McGee response due 3/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/27/2024.(TMA) Modified text on 2/28/2024 (TMA).
February 27, 2024 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #31 Stipulation. (Degnan, John)
February 27, 2024 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Michael McGee. Jointly Signed by Thomas Rhodes. (Degnan, John)
February 8, 2024 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Rhodes. Michael McGee served on 2/7/2024, answer due 2/28/2024. (Phillips, Timothy)
February 7, 2024 Filing 29 Defendant Kandiyohi County's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kandiyohi County. (Bayliss, Kenneth)
February 7, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth H Bayliss, III on behalf of Kandiyohi County. (Bayliss, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR FILING OF JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR RULE 26(f) CONFERENCESCHEDULING CONFERENCE by telephone set for 4/2/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed by Judge Brian C. Wimes on 2/6/2024.(TLD)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED Defendant Hennepin County's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (Doc. #21) is GRANTED. Defendant Hennepin County shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 18, 2024. It is furtherORDERED Defendant Ramsey County's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (Doc. #23) is GRANTED. Defendant Ramsey County shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Brian C. Wimes on 2/6/2024.(TLD)
February 6, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Rhodes. Kandiyohi County served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024. (Phillips, Timothy)
February 2, 2024 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 Stipulation. (Nogosek, Kristine)
February 2, 2024 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Ramsey County to Respond to The Complaint by Ramsey County. Jointly Signed by Thomas Rhodes. (Nogosek, Kristine)
February 2, 2024 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation. (Martenson, Christiana)
February 2, 2024 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Hennepin County to Respond to Complaint by William Joseph Chandler, Hennepin County. Jointly Signed by Thomas Rhodes. (Martenson, Christiana)
February 1, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Keeler, Jr on behalf of William Joseph Chandler, Hennepin County. (Keeler, James)
February 1, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C S McLaren on behalf of William Joseph Chandler, Hennepin County. (McLaren, Sarah)
February 1, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christiana Martenson on behalf of William Joseph Chandler, Hennepin County. (Martenson, Christiana)
February 1, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Scott Plaisance on behalf of Ramsey County. (Plaisance, Kevin)
February 1, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine K Nogosek on behalf of Ramsey County. (Nogosek, Kristine)
January 31, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Rhodes. William Joseph Chandler waiver sent on 1/18/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Phillips, Timothy)
January 30, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Rhodes. Hennepin County served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024. (Phillips, Timothy)
January 30, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Rhodes. Ramsey County served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024. (Phillips, Timothy)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney G. Flint Taylor for Thomas Rhodes. Approved by Judge Brian C. Wimes on 1/25/2024. (jam)
January 23, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney G. Flint Taylor. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10793101 filed by Thomas Rhodes. (Phillips, Timothy)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ben H. Elson for Thomas Rhodes. Approved by Judge Brian C. Wimes on 1/23/2024. (jam)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN CIRCUIT. Case reassigned to Judge Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-104 BCW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Lavenski R. Smith, United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, on 1/19/2024(kt)
January 17, 2024 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright are no longer assigned to this case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-104. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (CLK)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. It is hereby determined that all U.S. District Judges and U.S. Magistrate Judges of the Court are disqualified from presiding over this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 1/17/2024.(CLK)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ben H. Elson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10774703 filed by Thomas Rhodes. (Phillips, Timothy)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Boyd Beccue, William Joseph Chandler, Hennepin County, Kandiyohi County, Michael McGee, Ramsey County. (BTX)
January 16, 2024 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ben H. Elson, G. Flint Taylor, Tayleece Paul as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (BTX)
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-104 (PJS/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX) Modified text on 1/16/2024 (BTX).
January 13, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Thomson on behalf of Thomas Rhodes. (Thomson, Brad)
January 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10773238) filed by Thomas Rhodes. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thomson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. McGee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rhodes
Represented By: Brad Thomson
Represented By: Ben H. Elson
Represented By: G. Flint Taylor
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McGee
Represented By: David M Wilk
Represented By: John M Degnan
Represented By: Kevin McCarthy
Represented By: Mark A Solheim
Represented By: Zane Aubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Beccue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandiyohi County, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey County, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Joseph Chandler
Represented By: Christiana Martenson
Represented By: James W Keeler, Jr
Represented By: Sarah C S McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandiyohi County
Represented By: Kenneth H Bayliss, III
Represented By: Elle M Lannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey County
Represented By: Kevin Scott Plaisance
Represented By: Kristine K Nogosek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County
Represented By: Christiana Martenson
Represented By: James W Keeler, Jr
Represented By: Sarah C S McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?