Davison v. Binford et al
Plaintiff: Margarita Davison
Defendant: Exavir Binford, City of St. Paul, Exavir Dwayne Binford, Jr. and St. Paul, the City of
Case Number: 0:2024cv00145
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jerry W Blackwell
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 16 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by St. Paul, the City of re #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by St. Paul, the City of.(Lathrop, Sara)
March 8, 2024 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by St. Paul, the City of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service on Exavir Dwayne Binford)(Lathrop, Sara)
March 8, 2024 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by St. Paul, the City of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service on Exavir Dwayne Binford)(Lathrop, Sara)
March 8, 2024 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by St. Paul, the City of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lathrop, Sara)
March 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service on Exavir Dwayne Binford)(Lathrop, Sara)
March 8, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by St. Paul, the City of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service on Exavir Dwayne Binford)(Lathrop, Sara)
February 6, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margarita Davison. St. Paul, the City of served on 1/17/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. (Marshall, Andrew)
February 6, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margarita Davison. Exavir Dwayne Binford, Jr served on 1/24/2024, answer due 2/14/2024. (Marshall, Andrew)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #5 Stipulation. St. Paul, the City of response due 3/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/30/2024.(TMA)
January 30, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by St. Paul, the City of re #6 Proposed Order to Judge (Lathrop, Sara)
January 30, 2024 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Lathrop, Sara)
January 30, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time for City of St. Paul to Respond by St. Paul, the City of. Jointly Signed by Margarita Davison. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Lathrop, Sara)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by St. Paul, the City of re #3 Declaration, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Lathrop, Sara)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Sara Lathrop re #1 Notice of Removal,, by St. Paul, the City of . (Lathrop, Sara)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-145 JWB/ECW.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kt)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-cv-24-355 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10783373) filed by City of St. Paul. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Binford Summons, #3 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILE SEPARATELY Declaration of Sara J. Lathrop, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lathrop, Sara) Modified text on 1/19/2024 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davison v. Binford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Davison
Represented By: Andrew L Marshall
Represented By: Bryce Daniel Riddle
Represented By: Kyle Stephen Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exavir Binford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Paul
Represented By: Sara J Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exavir Dwayne Binford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul, the City of
Represented By: Megan D Hafner
Represented By: Sara J Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?