Aho et al v. Cass County et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Aho and Chad Cane
Defendant: Cass County, Sandy Bennett, Jerri Huston, Mark Peterson, Ben Lindstrom, Troy Nelson, Bob Kangas, Scott Wold, Jeff Woodford, Nicole Cayko, Josh Stevenson, Jason Kuboushek, Sheldon Monson, Christopher Nguyen and Anthony Thompson
Case Number: 0:2024cv00153
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jerry W Blackwell
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandy Bennett, Cass County, Nicole Cayko, Jerri Huston, Bob Kangas, Ben Lindstrom, Mark Peterson, Josh Stevenson, Scott Wold, Jeff Woodford re #5 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution (Nierengarten, Kristin)
March 18, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandy Bennett, Cass County, Nicole Cayko, Jerri Huston, Bob Kangas, Ben Lindstrom, Mark Peterson, Josh Stevenson, Scott Wold, Jeff Woodford re #13 Answer to Complaint, #14 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #5 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution (Nierengarten, Kristin)
March 18, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell. (Nierengarten, Kristin)
March 18, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Sandy Bennett, Cass County, Nicole Cayko, Jerri Huston, Bob Kangas, Ben Lindstrom, Mark Peterson, Josh Stevenson, Scott Wold, Jeff Woodford. (Nierengarten, Kristin)
March 13, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheldon Monson, Christopher Nguyen, Anthony Thompson re #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution (Kaisershot, Christopher)
March 13, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheldon Monson, Christopher Nguyen, Anthony Thompson re #7 Answer to Complaint (Kaisershot, Christopher)
March 13, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Kuboushek re #9 Notice of Appearance (Ebert, Dyan)
March 13, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dyan J Ebert on behalf of Jason Kuboushek. (Ebert, Dyan)
March 12, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheldon Monson, Christopher Nguyen, Anthony Thompson re #7 Answer to Complaint (Kaisershot, Christopher)
March 12, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Sheldon Monson, Christopher Nguyen, Anthony Thompson. (Kaisershot, Christopher)
March 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Sheldon Monson, Christopher Nguyen, Anthony Thompson. (Kaisershot, Christopher) Modified text on 3/12/2024 (ACH).
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Sandy Bennett, Cass County, Nicole Cayko, Jerri Huston, Bob Kangas, Ben Lindstrom, Troy Nelson, Mark Peterson, Josh Stevenson, Scott Wold, Jeff Woodford. (Nierengarten, Kristin)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 RECEIPT number 400004523 in the amount of $405.00 issued to Rhonda D Aho. (LTT) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 1/29/24. (kt)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jason Kuboushek, Sheldon Monson, Christopher Nguyen, Josh Stevenson, Anthony Thompson. (ACH) cc: Plaintiffs with Info Sheet #2. Modified text on 1/19/2024 (ACH).
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sandy Bennett, Cass County, Nicole Cayko, Jerri Huston, Bob Kangas, Ben Lindstrom, Troy Nelson, Mark Peterson, Scott Wold, Jeff Woodford. (ACH) cc: Plaintiffs with Info Sheet #2. Modified text on 1/19/2024 (ACH).
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $405, receipt number xx) filed by Chad Cane, Rhonda Aho. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (6th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACH) Document QC'd on 1/22/2024 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aho et al v. Cass County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Aho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Cane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Bennett
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerri Huston
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Peterson
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Lindstrom
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Nelson
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Kangas
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wold
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Woodford
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Cayko
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Stevenson
Represented By: Abigail Rose Kelzer
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kuboushek
Represented By: Dyan J Ebert
Represented By: Elle M Lannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Monson
Represented By: Christopher M. Kaisershot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Nguyen
Represented By: Christopher M. Kaisershot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Thompson
Represented By: Christopher M. Kaisershot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?