Enriquez v. Rarden
Petitioner: Rosendo Enriquez
Respondent: Jared Rarden
Case Number: 0:2024cv00344
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey M Bryan
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rosendo Enriquez filed by Rosendo Enriquez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BTX)
March 12, 2024 Filing 5 RECEIPT number 400004960 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Rosendo Enriquez. (BTX) Document QC'd on 3/22/2024 (JME).
March 7, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rosendo Enriquez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/7/2024. (EB)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of Jared Rarden. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Rosendo Enriquez (JGK)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rosendo Enriquez. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 2/22/2024 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enriquez v. Rarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosendo Enriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jared Rarden
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?