Innovative Computer Professionals, Inc. v. Outdoors Online, LLC
Plaintiff: Innovative Computer Professionals, Inc. d/b/a Digital Cash Processing and Innovative Computer Professionals, Inc. a Minnesota Corporation doing business as Digital Cash Processing
Defendant: Outdoors Online, LLC d/b/a GunBroker.com and Outdoors Online, LLC doing business as GunBroker.com
Case Number: 0:2024cv00373
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2024 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Outdoors Online, LLC.(Tchida, Bryant)
March 19, 2024 Filing 26 Declaration of Jared Smith in Support of #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Outdoors Online, LLC.(Tchida, Bryant)
March 19, 2024 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Outdoors Online, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tchida, Bryant)
March 19, 2024 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #22 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Outdoors Online, LLC.(Tchida, Bryant)
March 19, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Tchida, Bryant)
March 19, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Outdoors Online, LLC. (Tchida, Bryant)
March 18, 2024 Filing 21 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Outdoors Online, LLC regarding motion to dismiss. (Davis, Madeline)
March 5, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Innovative Computer Professionals, Inc.. No summons requested. (Shiff, Sean)
February 20, 2024 Filing 19 Redacted Document for #1 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Redacted Ex. 3)(Tchida, Bryant)
February 14, 2024 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Outdoors Online, LLC.(Tchida, Bryant)
February 14, 2024 Filing 17 Declaration of Jared Smith in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Outdoors Online, LLC.(Tchida, Bryant)
February 14, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Outdoors Online, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tchida, Bryant)
February 14, 2024 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Outdoors Online, LLC.(Tchida, Bryant)
February 14, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Tchida, Bryant)
February 14, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Outdoors Online, LLC. (Tchida, Bryant)
February 14, 2024 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Outdoors Online, LLC. (Tchida, Bryant)
February 14, 2024 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Innovative Computer Professionals, Inc.. (Shiff, Sean)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Samuel Blatnick for Outdoors Online, LLC.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anne L. Melton for Outdoors Online, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/12/2024. (jam)
February 9, 2024 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Tchida, Bryant)
February 9, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anne Melton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10833903 filed by Outdoors Online, LLC. (Tchida, Bryant)
February 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sam Blatnick. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10833810 filed by Outdoors Online, LLC. (Tchida, Bryant)
February 9, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A Shiff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Shiff, Sean)
February 8, 2024 Filing 5 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-373 DWF/DTS.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline E. Davis on behalf of Outdoors Online, LLC d/b/a GunBroker.com. (Davis, Madeline)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant D Tchida on behalf of Outdoors Online, LLC d/b/a GunBroker.com. (Tchida, Bryant)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Rob Wiley re #1 Notice of Removal, by Outdoors Online, LLC d/b/a GunBroker.com . (Tchida, Bryant)
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-CV-24-1196 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10827395) filed by Outdoors Online, LLC d/b/a GunBroker.com. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2Sealed Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Sealed Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tchida, Bryant) Modified text on 2/20/2024 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Computer Professionals, Inc. v. Outdoors Online, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Computer Professionals, Inc. d/b/a Digital Cash Processing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Computer Professionals, Inc. a Minnesota Corporation doing business as Digital Cash Processing
Represented By: Andrew H Bardwell
Represented By: Samuel Maddox Johnson
Represented By: Sean A Shiff
Represented By: William R Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outdoors Online, LLC d/b/a GunBroker.com
Represented By: Madeline E. Davis
Represented By: Bryant D Tchida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outdoors Online, LLC doing business as GunBroker.com
Represented By: Anne L. Melton
Represented By: Bryant D Tchida
Represented By: Madeline E. Davis
Represented By: Samuel Blatnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?