Allwine v. Bolin
Petitioner: Stephen Allwine
Respondent: William Bolin
Case Number: 0:2024cv00439
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Micko
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2024 Filing 53 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 52 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Envelope)(MMG) Modified text and event on 4/9/2024 (MMG). DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 4/10/24. (kt)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 (Text-Only) ORDER: Before the Court is Respondent's #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioner's filings. Respondent's counsel represents that notices from the Court's electronic filing system have not been reaching them, and therefore requests 30 additional days to file the pending responses. Finding that good cause supports this request, the Court grants Respondent's #49 Motion. Respondent shall have until 5/3/2024 to file a response to Petitioner's filings. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(b) of this District, Petitioner may not file any reply to Respondent's response to his non-dispositive motions, including his #34 Motion to Compel and #35 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing. However, pursuant to the Court's #47 Order, Petitioner is entitled to file an optional reply to Respondent's answer to his petition within 28 days of the date when Respondent's answer is filed. The parties are reminded that thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as expressly authorized by Court order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 3/28/2024. (JLD)
March 27, 2024 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service by William Bolin re #50 Proposed Order to Judge, #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Compel, #35 MOTION For an Evidentiary Hearing re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2024 Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Compel, #35 MOTION For an Evidentiary Hearing re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Bolin.(Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2024 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Compel, #35 MOTION For an Evidentiary Hearing re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Bolin. (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2024 Filing 48 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REFILED, SEE #49 // MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #34 MOTION to Compel, #35 MOTION For an Evidentiary Hearing re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, #3 Exhibit/Exhibit List, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Bolin. (Collins, Patrick) Modified text on 3/27/2024 (ACH).
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Petitioner's #32 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; denying Petitioner's #33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Respondent to file answer within 28 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 3/7/2024. (jme)
March 1, 2024 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick S Collins on behalf of All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Letter to Magistrate Micko, #2 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Mailing)(Collins, Patrick)
February 26, 2024 Filing 45 RECEIPT number 400004801 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Stephen Allwine. (MMG) Document QCd on 3/26/2024 (MMG).
February 26, 2024 Filing 44 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kevin Magnuson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)cc: Kevin Magnuson. (kt)
February 23, 2024 Filing 43 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Bolin Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
February 20, 2024 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Allwine for Exhibit Q re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (MMP) Document QC'd on 3/13/2024 (ACH).
February 20, 2024 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Allwine for Exhibit P re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (MMP) Document QC'd on 3/13/2024 (ACH).
February 20, 2024 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Allwine for Exhibit O re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (MMP) Document QC'd on 3/13/2024 (ACH).
February 20, 2024 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Allwine for Exhibit M re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (MMP) Document QC'd on 3/13/2024 (ACH).
February 20, 2024 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Allwine for Exhibit K re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd on 3/13/2024 (ACH).
February 20, 2024 Filing 37 Certificate of Authorized Prison Official re #32 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Stephen Allwine filed by Stephen Allwine.(MMP) Document QC'd on 3/13/2024 (ACH).
February 13, 2024 Filing 36 LETTER to Plaintiff from The Clerk's Office. (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION For an Evidentiary Hearing re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION to Compel filed by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Stephen Allwine. (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 32 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Stephen Allwine. (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit HH re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) HH)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit GG re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) GG)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit FF re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) FF)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit EE re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EE)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit DD re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) DD)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit CC re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) CC)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit BB re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) BB)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit AA re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) AA)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit Z re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Z)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibits Y re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Y)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit X re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) X)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit W re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) W)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit V re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) V)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit U re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) U)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit T re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) T)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit S re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) S)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit R re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) R)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 14 EXHIBITS O-Q re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit N re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) N)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 12 EXHIBITS K-M re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit J re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) J)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit I re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) I)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 9 EXHIBITS F-H re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit E re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) E)(jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit D re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) D)(jam) Modified text on 2/13/2024 (jam).
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit C re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C)(jam) Modified text on 2/13/2024 (jam).
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit B re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B)(jam) Modified text on 2/13/2024 (jam).
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT for Exhibit A re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Stephen Allwine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(jam) Modified text on 2/13/2024 (jam).
February 12, 2024 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Index re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stephen Allwine. (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Stephen Allwine. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2-15, #4 Appendix 16-21, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Envelope) (jam)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 FILED IN ERROR- WILL REFILE; PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Stephen Allwine. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F-H, #7 Exhibit(s) I, #8 Exhibit(s) J, #9 Exhibit(s) K-M, #10 Exhibit(s) N, #11 Exhibit(s) O-Q, #12 Exhibit(s) R, #13 Exhibit(s) S, #14 Exhibit(s) T, #15 Exhibit(s) U, #16 Exhibit(s) V, #17 Exhibit(s) W, #18 Exhibit(s) X, #19 Exhibit(s) Y, #20 Exhibit(s) Z, #21 Appendix Index, #22 Appendix 1, #23 Appendix 2-15, #24 Appendix 16-21, #25 Cover Letter, #26 Civil Cover Sheet, #27 Envelope, #28 Exhibit(s) Index) (jam) Modified text on 2/13/2024

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allwine v. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Allwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Bolin
Represented By: Thomas R Ragatz
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Represented By: Patrick S Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?