Mel Foster Company, Inc. v. Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mel Foster Company, Inc.
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2024cv00503
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Joint Motion for Continuance: The In-Person Motion Hearing has been RESET to Tuesday, May 14, 2024, 9:30 a.m., Courtroom 7B (Saint Paul Courthouse), before The Hon. Susan Richard Nelson. Signed by The Hon. Susan Richard Nelson on 4/8/2024. (LLM)
April 5, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2024 at 09:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Pierce, W.)
April 5, 2024 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Hearing Pending Settlement filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc..(Pierce, W.)
April 5, 2024 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Hearing Pending Settlement filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Pierce, W.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Mel Foster Company, Inc.. (Glazer, Adam)
March 29, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pierce, W.)
March 27, 2024 Filing 20 **TEXT ONLY** NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing from In-Person to Video Conference re: #9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION, and #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : The Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, April 9, 2024, at 11:00 a.m., will no longer be In-Person but via Video Conference (Zoom) (no courtroom), before The Hon. Susan Richard Nelson. This is a change from In-Person to Video Conference ONLY. (LLM)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam J. Glazer for Mel Foster Company, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/25/2024. (jam)
March 22, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam J. Glazer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10924276 filed by Mel Foster Company, Inc.. (Obermueller, Michael)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Esterhay for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc..; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney W. Matthew Pierce for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/21/2024. (jam)
March 20, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney W. Matthew Pierce. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10919915 filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
March 20, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John D. Esterhay. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10919905 filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
March 15, 2024 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mel Foster Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) A Agreement, #3 Exhibit(s) B Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit(s) C Declaration of Michael Swenson)(Obermueller, Michael)
February 23, 2024 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc..(Dufresne, Andrew)
February 23, 2024 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc..(Dufresne, Andrew)
February 23, 2024 Filing 11 Declaration of W. Matthew Pierce in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Dufresne, Andrew)
February 23, 2024 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dufresne, Andrew)
February 23, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Dufresne, Andrew)
February 23, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Matthew Pierce In Support)(Dufresne, Andrew)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/22/2024. (TJB)
February 20, 2024 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Adam J. Glazer, Kelly M. Cronin, John D. Esterhay, W. Matthew Pierce as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. cc: Adam J. Glazer,Kelly M. Cronin, John D. Esterhay, W. Matthew Pierce. (LTT)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-503 SRN/DTS.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Dufresne on behalf of Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th Dist. Hennepin County, case number 27-CV-24-606 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10849369) filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Affidavit of Service and Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) State Court Case Docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dufresne, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mel Foster Company, Inc. v. Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel Foster Company, Inc.
Represented By: Adam J. Glazer
Represented By: Michael E Obermueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Dufresne
Represented By: John Esterhay
Represented By: W. Matthew Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?