Bott et al v. Gravier et al
Plaintiff: Tim Bott and Joy Bott
Defendant: Robert Gravier, Candy Gravier and Allan Block Corporation
Case Number: 0:2024cv00524
Filed: February 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Madel, Christopher)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allan Block Corporation, Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. filed by Tim Bott, Joy Bott. No summons requested. (Schwiebert, Darren)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #33 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #9 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #22 Declaration in Opposition filed by Allan Block Corporation, Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier.(Paterson, William)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #9 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #22 Declaration in Opposition filed by Allan Block Corporation, Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. (Paterson, William)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for a TRO (Doc. No. Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. No. #5 ) is GRANTED IN PART.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/22/2024. (See Order for Specifics) (las)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Motion Hearing held on 03/15/2024 re First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tim Bott. (Doc. No. #5 ). Matter(s) taken under advisement; written order to issue. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz) (las)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by William R Paterson on behalf of Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. (Paterson, William)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE of Appearance by William R Paterson on behalf of Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. (Paterson, William) Modified text on 3/15/2024 (JME).
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tim Bott, Joy Bott. Allan Block Corporation waiver sent on 2/26/2023, answer due 4/27/2023; Candy Gravier waiver sent on 2/26/2023, answer due 4/27/2023; Robert Gravier waiver sent on 2/26/2023, answer due 4/27/2023. (Schwiebert, Darren)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Second AFFIDAVIT of Tim Bott in SUPPORT OF #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Joy Bott, Tim Bott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit Q)(Schwiebert, Darren)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Darren Schwiebert in SUPPORT OF #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Joy Bott, Tim Bott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit O)(Schwiebert, Darren)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Joy Bott, Tim Bott. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schwiebert, Darren)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Allan Block Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Madel, Christopher)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Allan Block Corporation. (Madel, Christopher)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SEALED DECLARATION of Robert Gravier in Opposition to #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert Gravier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 9-CONFIDENTIAL, #2 Exhibit(s) 16-CONFIDENTIAL)(Dressen, Janel)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Robert Gravier in Opposition to #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 10, #10 Exhibit(s) 11, #11 Exhibit(s) 12, #12 Exhibit(s) 13, #13 Exhibit(s) 14, #14 Exhibit(s) 15, #15 Exhibit(s) 17, #16 Exhibit(s) 18, #17 Exhibit(s) 19, #18 Exhibit(s) 20, #19 Exhibit(s) 21, #20 Exhibit(s) 22)(Dressen, Janel)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Janel M. Dressen in Opposition to #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Dressen, Janel)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dressen, Janel)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER The parties' Stipulation regarding briefing (Doc. No. #17 ) for the pending TRO motion is APPROVED. Defendants response is due March 5, 2024, and Plaintiffs reply is due March 6, 2024. Ordered by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/5/2024.(las)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Joy Bott, Tim Bott With Stipulation of Briefing Schedule. (Schwiebert, Darren)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Briol, Mark)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Robbins on behalf of Allan Block Corporation. (Robbins, Jennifer)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Madel on behalf of Allan Block Corporation. (Madel, Christopher)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Janel M Dressen on behalf of Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. (Dressen, Janel)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron R Thom on behalf of Allan Block Corporation. (Thom, Aaron)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joy Bott, Tim Bott re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #9 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #7 Proposed Order to Judge, #8 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #1 Complaint (Schwiebert, Darren)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First AFFIDAVIT of Mark Briol in SUPPORT OF #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tim Bott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit N)(Briol, Mark)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First AFFIDAVIT of Tim Bott in SUPPORT OF #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tim Bott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J (redacted), #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit L (placeholder, under seal), #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit M)(Briol, Mark)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Date and time to be determined. (Briol, Mark)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tim Bott.(Briol, Mark)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tim Bott. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Briol, Mark)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tim Bott. (Briol, Mark)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENTS FILED IN ERROR/TO BE REFILED - First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tim Bott. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit of Tim Bott with Exhibits A-M, #3 Affidavit of Mark Briol with Exhibit N, #4 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Notice of Hearing)(Briol, Mark) Modified text on 2/22/2024 (las).
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Allan Block Corporation, Candy Gravier, Robert Gravier. (BTX)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 24-cv-524 (DWF/JFD).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX)
February 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10849994) filed by Tim Bott. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Briol, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bott et al v. Gravier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Bott
Represented By: Mark J Briol
Represented By: Scott A Benson
Represented By: Darren B. Schwiebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Bott
Represented By: Darren B. Schwiebert
Represented By: Mark J Briol
Represented By: Scott A Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gravier
Represented By: Kathryn Campbell
Represented By: Cory D Olson
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: William R Paterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Gravier
Represented By: Kathryn Campbell
Represented By: Cory D Olson
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: William R Paterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Block Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Robbins
Represented By: Aaron R Thom
Represented By: Samantha Ellingson
Represented By: William R Paterson
Represented By: Christopher W. Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?