Koester v. Ortiz et al
Plaintiff: Jay Koester
Defendant: Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa, Travelers, Jonathan Ortiz doing business as Travelers and Robin Ragusa doing business as Travelers
Case Number: 0:2024cv00639
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Filing 15 **TEXT ONLY** NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing re #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion, and #4 Motion to Dismiss/General: The Motion Hearing scheduled for Friday, May 3, 2024, is CANCELLED. The pending Motion will be taken under advisement without a hearing, and an Order will be issued on the papers. Entered April 1, 2024, by The Hon. Susan Richard Nelson. (LLM)
March 26, 2024 Filing 14 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa . (Wolter, Leatha)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss #4 , the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, the parties shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/8/2024. (HAM)
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa re #10 Declaration in Support, #8 Declaration in Support, #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #6 Meet and Confer Statement, #11 Proposed Order to Judge, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Declaration in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Wolter, Leatha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa.(Wolter, Leatha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 10 Declaration of Robin Ragusa in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa.(Wolter, Leatha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 9 Declaration of Jonathan Ortiz in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa.(Wolter, Leatha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 Declaration of Leatha G. Wolter in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2)(Wolter, Leatha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wolter, Leatha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa.(Wolter, Leatha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Wolter, Leatha)
March 7, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa. (Wolter, Leatha)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jonathan Ortiz, Robin Ragusa re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wolter, Leatha)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-639 SRN/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-cv-24-721 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10875033) filed by Travelers, Robin Ragusa, Jonathan Ortiz. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wolter, Leatha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koester v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Ortiz
Represented By: Leatha G Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Ragusa
Represented By: Leatha G Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers
Represented By: Leatha G Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Ortiz doing business as Travelers
Represented By: Leatha G Wolter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Ragusa doing business as Travelers
Represented By: Leatha G Wolter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?