Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Defendant: ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2024cv00774
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE by Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC Change in Firm Name (Hanson, Andre)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nathan Romo for Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/26/2024. (jam)
April 25, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathan Romo. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11006047 filed by Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Hanson, Andre)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on #26 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall have until May 17, 2024, to respond to Defendant's Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/23/2024. (HAM)
April 22, 2024 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 Stipulation. (Perloff, Saul)
April 22, 2024 Filing 26 STIPULATION re #23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Counterclaims by Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Jointly Signed by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Perloff, Saul)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
April 16, 2024 Filing 24 DECLARATION of James Wilcox by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Warning Letter Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Acella EIR, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Acella Cook Declaration, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Naturally Derived for Hypothyroidism, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Information for Patients, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - Find a Pharmacy for NP Thyroid, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - Prescription Drug Price Check Visory Health, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - Prescription Drug Price Check Visory Health, #9 Exhibit(s) 9 - 1835-v1 NP Thyroid Pharmacy Ordering Info Sheet ML, #10 Exhibit(s) 10 - Frequently Asked Questions_NP Thyroid, #11 Exhibit(s) 11 - NP Thyroid, #12 Exhibit(s) 12 - Important Product Updates NP Thyroid, #13 Exhibit(s) 13 - Cigna_Formulary_Clinical_Update_April_2022, #14 Exhibit(s) 14 - Express Scripts)(Sieben, Amy)
April 16, 2024 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. filed by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sieben, Amy)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on #20 Stipulation. Defendant ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall have until April 16, 2024, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/11/2024. (HAM)
April 10, 2024 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Stipulation. (Sieben, Amy)
April 10, 2024 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Sieben, Amy)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Maxwell Christian Ruocco for ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Thomas Wilcox for ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott Lloyd Smith for ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/25/2024. (jam)
March 22, 2024 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sieben, Amy)
March 22, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney S. Lloyd Smith. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10924052 filed by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sieben, Amy)
March 22, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James T. Wilcox. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10924043 filed by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sieben, Amy)
March 22, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maxwell C. Ruocco. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10924030 filed by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sieben, Amy)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Defendant shall have until April 11, 2024, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/21/2024. (HAM)
March 21, 2024 Filing 13 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing S. Lloyd Smith as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Sieben, Amy)
March 21, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Sieben, Amy)
March 21, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy M Sieben on behalf of ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sieben, Amy)
March 18, 2024 (Text-Only) 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as Addressed/Insufficient Address. Mail sent to: Saul Perloff 300 West 6th Street Suite 2250 Austin, TX 78701 No forwarding address available. Mail not re-sent. Attempts Made: None (BTX)
March 18, 2024 (Text-Only) 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as Addressed/Insufficient Address. Mail sent to: Nathan Romo 300 West 6th Street Suite 2250 Austin, TX 78701 No forwarding address available. Mail not re-sent. Attempts Made: None (BTX) Modified text on 3/19/2024 (BTX). Document QC'd on 3/22/2024 (CLK).
March 14, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. (Hanson, Andre)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Saul H Perloff for Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/8/2024. (jam)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Saul Perloff. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10890863 filed by Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Hanson, Andre)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT DUE TO CASE ASSIGNMENT ERROR. This case is reassigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-774 (DSD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (BTX)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Saul Perloff, Nathan Romo as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (BTX) cc: Nathan Romo, Saul Perloff Modified text on 3/7/2024 (BTX).
March 7, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (BTX)
March 7, 2024 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-774 (ECT/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Hanson, Andre)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10887165) filed by Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hanson, Andre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acella Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Andre T Hanson
Represented By: Nathan Romo
Represented By: Saul H Perloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Amy M Sieben
Represented By: James Thomas Wilcox
Represented By: Maxwell Christian Ruocco
Represented By: Scott Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?