Tillman v. Capital One Auto Finance et al
Plaintiff: Delaneo-Nathaniel Tillman, Sr.
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Volkswagen Group for Audi, Capital One Auto Finance and JPMorgan Chase
Case Number: 0:2024cv00916
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2024 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Volkswagen Group for Audi re #28 Reply Amended (Flanagan, Ian)
May 7, 2024 Filing 28 REPLY re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice filed by Volkswagen Group for Audi. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Flanagan, Ian)
April 24, 2024 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice filed by Delaneo-Nathaniel Tillman, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(CLK) Document QC'd on 5/8/2024 (CLK).
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ian Patrick Flanagan for Volkswagen Group for Audi. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/8/2024. (jam)
April 5, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ian P. Flanagan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10954873 filed by Volkswagen Group for Audi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Educate, Michael)
April 4, 2024 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JPMorgan Chase re #23 Reply (Suresh, Anju)
April 4, 2024 Filing 23 REPLY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by JPMorgan Chase.(Suresh, Anju)
April 3, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Educate on behalf of Volkswagen Group for Audi. (Educate, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Volkswagen Group for Audi.(Educate, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice filed by Volkswagen Group for Audi.(Educate, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Volkswagen Group for Audi. (Educate, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice : Date and time to be determined. (Educate, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Filing 17 EXHIBIT Index re #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Volkswagen Group for Audi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Declaration of Antonio Elias, #2 Exhibit(s) 1 to Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Mailing to Defendant)(Educate, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice filed by Volkswagen Group for Audi. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Educate, Michael)
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice filed by Volkswagen Group for Audi. (Educate, Michael)
March 21, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE by Delaneo-Nathaniel Tillman, Sr re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion. (CLK) Document QC'd on 4/1/2024 (BTX).
March 21, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Delaneo-Nathaniel Tillman, Sr.(CLK) Document QC'd on 4/1/2024 (BTX).
March 14, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JPMorgan Chase re #10 Affidavit of Service, #11 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Suresh, Anju)
March 14, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Suresh, Anju)
March 14, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JPMorgan Chase re #6 Meet and Confer Statement, #8 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #4 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Suresh, Anju)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Jerry W. Blackwell, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-916 DWF/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 3/13/2024 and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/14/2024.(CLK)
March 13, 2024 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A's Motion to Dismiss #5 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Suresh, Anju)
March 13, 2024 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by JPMorgan Chase. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Suresh, Anju)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by JPMorgan Chase.(Suresh, Anju)
March 13, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by JPMorgan Chase. (Suresh, Anju)
March 13, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for JPMorgan Chase. (Suresh, Anju)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JPMorgan Chase re #1 Notice of Removal, (Suresh, Anju)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-916 (JWB/DTS).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-cv-24-2929 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10902027) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Suresh, Anju)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Capital One Auto Finance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaneo-Nathaniel Tillman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Anju Suresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group for Audi
Represented By: Ian Patrick Flanagan
Represented By: Michael Educate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase
Represented By: Anju Suresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?