Harvey v. U.S. Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jerome Harvey
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, Ginnie Mae, Citibank, National Association (Trustee) and Bank of New York Mellon Transferring Agent
Case Number: 0:2024cv01173
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
2 Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) Order: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b), for good cause shown, and in light of the Court's Order regarding service #14 , the Court GRANTS Ginnie Mae's #15 Second Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Ginne Mae shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before July 29, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 5/21/2024. (JC)
May 20, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ginnie Mae re #16 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #15 Request (non-motion) (Hoskins, Adam)
May 20, 2024 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Second Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond #15 Request (non-motion). (Hoskins, Adam)
May 20, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ginnie Mae. (Hoskins, Adam)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 5/8/2024. (JC)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORRECTED ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-1173 PJS/DJF. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/6/2024.(kt)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-1173 ECT/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/6/2024.(LTT) Modified text on 5/7/2024 (kt).
May 3, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Jerome Harvey re #9 BILL OF EQUITY & BILL OF EXONERATION, #10 AFFIDAVIT OF EQUITABLE INTERESTS & NOTICE OF CONFLICT & VARIANCE OF LAW, #7 DEMAND DefendantS to Compel Discovery & Respond to Interrogatories, Estoppel on Sheriff's Sale Failure to Respond, Adverse Claim, #8 Exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ABR)DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/6/24. (kt)
May 3, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF EQUITABLE INTERESTS & NOTICE OF CONFLICT & VARIANCE OF LAW by Michael Jerome Harvey. (ABR) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/6/24. (kt)
May 3, 2024 Filing 9 BILL OF EQUITY & BILL OF EXONERATION by Michael Jerome Harvey. (ABR) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/6/24. (kt)
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 EXHIBIT A-E re #7 DEMAND Defendants to Compel Discovery & Respond to Interrogatories, Estoppel on Sheriff's Sale Failure to Respond, Adverse Claim filed by Michael Jerome Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(ABR) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/6/24. (kt)
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 DEMAND Defendants to Compel Discovery & Respond to Interrogatories, Estoppel on Sheriff's Sale Failure to Respond, Adverse Claim filed by Michael Jerome Harvey. (ABR) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/6/24. (kt)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER in Response to #3 Request (non-motion). Ginnie Mae answer due 6/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/9/2024. (TJB)
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ginnie Mae re #4 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #3 Request (non-motion) (Hoskins, Adam)
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Request (non-motion). (Hoskins, Adam)
April 9, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ginnie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoskins, Adam)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-1173 PJS/DTS.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-CV-24-3232 filed by Ginnie Mae. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hoskins, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. U.S. Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jerome Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginnie Mae
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, National Association (Trustee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Transferring Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?