Rued et al v. Jayswal et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, W.O.R. and Scott Daryll Rued
Defendant: Christian M. Sande, Roger M. Klaphake, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Charlene Hatcher, Bobby Shepherd, Renee L. Worke, Richard A. Stebbins, Jaykumar Jayswal, David R. Stras, Nancy Brasel, Anne Gearity, Mike Furnstahl, Jon Schmidt, Ryan Kuffel, Charles Webber, Leanard Steven Grasz, Lesley Karnes, Judy Weigman, Suzanne Arnston, Julie Swanson, Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department, Scott County Health and Human Services, Minnesota Department of Human Services, Jamie Pearson and Natalie E. Hudson
Case Number: 0:2024cv01763
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jerry W. Blackwell recused. Case reassigned to Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-1763 JRT/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 7/11/2024.(LTT)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CORRESPONDENCE TO THE CLERK OF COURT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' JULY 10, 2024 FILING REQUESTING EXHIBITS BE MATCHED TO DECLARATIONS REFERENCING SUCH EXHIBITS filed by Plaintiffs. (kt)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Daryll Rued. Anne Gearity waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LTT)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued re #48 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #52 Exhibit, #64 Proposed Order to Judge, #55 Declaration in Support, #58 Notice (Other), #61 Meet and Confer Statement, #63 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #54 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #47 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #56 Meet and Confer Statement, #59 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply, #53 MOTION RECUSAL, #49 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #51 Proposed Order to Judge, #50 Meet and Confer Statement, #62 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #57 Proposed Order to Judge, #65 Proposed Order to Judge, #60 Declaration in Support, (kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #59 CONTINGENT MOTION TO RESPOND TO ISSUES NOT IDENTIFIED IN DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #59 RESPONSIVE MOTION filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #47 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #59 MOTION to Respond : Date and time to be determined. (kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #59 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSIVE MOTION TO DENY PERSONS THAT ARE ALSO STATE JUDICIAL OFFICE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #59 MOTION FOR CONTINGENT LEAVE TO RESPOND filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Declaration of Joseph Rued in Support of #59 RESPONSIVE MOTION TO DENY PERSONS THAT ARE ALSO STATE JUDICIAL OFFICER DEFENDANTS' MOTION filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSIVE MOTION TO DENY PERSONS THAT ARE ALSO STATE JUDICIAL OFFICER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AND CONTINGENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CORRESPONDENCE TO THE COURT REGARDING SCHEDULED HEARING FOR SEPTEMBER 12, 2024 AT 10:00 am by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #53 MOTION RECUSAL filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #53 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Declaration of Joseph Rued in Support of #53 MOTION RECUSAL filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #53 MOTION RECUSAL : Date and time to be determined. (kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION FOR RECUSAL filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 EXHIBIT AA re #47 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA Part 2, #2 Exhibit AA Part 3, #3 Exhibit AA Part 4, #4 Exhibit AA Part 5)(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #47 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #47 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #47 MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Date and time to be determined. (kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Support re #47 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (kt)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G Brooker on behalf of Nancy Brasel, Leanard Steven Grasz, Bobby Shepherd, David R. Stras. (Brooker, Gregory)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department, Jaykumar Jayswal re #44 Waiver of Service Executed, #43 Notice of Appearance (Kaczor, Daniel)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department, Jaykumar Jayswal. Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024; Jaykumar Jayswal waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. (Kaczor, Daniel)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D Kaczor on behalf of Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department, Jaykumar Jayswal. (Kaczor, Daniel)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Summons Issued as to Suzanne Arnston, Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department, Scott County Health and Human Services, Minnesota Department of Human Services, Jamie Pearson, Natalie E. Hudson (LTT). Modified text on 7/10/2024 (LTT).
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Jon Schmidt, Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Richard A. Stebbins, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Charles Webber, Carrie Lennon, Ryan Kuffel, Julie Swanson (LTT). Modified text on 7/10/2024 (LTT).
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Summons Issued as to Jaykumar Jayswal, Lesley Karnes, Anne Gearity, Judy Weigman, Nancy Brasel, Bobby Shepherd, Leanard Steven Grasz, David R. Stras, Renee L. Worke, Roger M. Klaphake (LTT). Modified text on 7/10/2024 (LTT).
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Joseph Rued - request for Summons for Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LTT)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Daryll Rued re #28 Waiver of Service Executed (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LTT)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Paul A. Magnuson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-1763 JWB/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 7/2/2024.(LTT)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M Tindal on behalf of Suzanne Arnston, Lesley Karnes, Ryan Kuffel, Jamie Pearson, Scott County Health and Human Services, Julie Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tindal, Susan)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Scott County Health and Human Services. Scott County Health and Human Services waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. (Tindal, Susan)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-1763 PAM/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 6/28/2024.(LTT)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon L Bjorklund on behalf of Judy Weigman. (Bjorklund, Shannon)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ryan Kuffel, Jamie Pearson re #29 Waiver of Service Executed, #30 Waiver of Service Executed (Ramstad, Ashley)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ryan Kuffel, Jamie Pearson re #29 Waiver of Service Executed, #30 Waiver of Service Executed (Ramstad, Ashley) Modified text on 6/27/2024 (MMP).
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jamie Pearson. Jamie Pearson waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. (Ramstad, Ashley)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ryan Kuffel. Ryan Kuffel waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. (Ramstad, Ashley)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Daryll Rued. Judy Weigman waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. (LTT)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CORRESPONDENCE TO THE CLERK OF COURT from Joseph Rued. (LTT)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Suzanne Arnston, Nancy Brasel, Mike Furnstahl, Anne Gearity, Leanard Steven Grasz, Charlene Hatcher, Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department, Natalie E. Hudson, Jaykumar Jayswal, Lesley Karnes, Roger M. Klaphake, Ryan Kuffel, Carrie Lennon, Minnesota Department of Human Services, Jamie Pearson, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Scott County Health and Human Services, Bobby Shepherd, Richard A. Stebbins, David R. Stras, Julie Swanson, Charles Webber, Judy Weigman, Renee L. Worke filed by W.O.R., Joseph Daryll Rued, Scott Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued. (MMP)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings and granting #14 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/24/2024. (Written Opinion) (EB)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Katherine M. Menendez recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-1763 (JMB/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/21/2024.(LTT)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Roger M. Klaphake, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Richard A. Stebbins, Charles Webber, Renee L. Worke re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #22 Proposed Order to Judge, #19 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #21 Meet and Confer Statement, #20 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Sloan, Alexander)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Roger M. Klaphake, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Richard A. Stebbins, Charles Webber, Renee L. Worke.(Sloan, Alexander)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #18 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Roger M. Klaphake, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Richard A. Stebbins, Charles Webber, Renee L. Worke.(Sloan, Alexander)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Roger M. Klaphake, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Richard A. Stebbins, Charles Webber, Renee L. Worke. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sloan, Alexander)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Sloan, Alexander)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Roger M. Klaphake, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Richard A. Stebbins, Charles Webber, Renee L. Worke. (Sloan, Alexander)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Roger M. Klaphake, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Richard A. Stebbins, Charles Webber, Renee L. Worke re #16 Notice of Appearance, (Sloan, Alexander)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Robertson Sloan on behalf of Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Roger M. Klaphake, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Richard A. Stebbins, Charles Webber, Renee L. Worke. (Sloan, Alexander)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Julie Swanson, Lesley Karnes, Suzanne Arnston. Julie Swanson waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024; Lesley Karnes waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024; Suzanne Arnston waiver sent on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tindal, Susan)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(kt)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EXHIBIT (proposed second amended complaint) re #12 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Amend and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued.(LTT) Document QC'd on 7/12/2024 (ACH).
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION TO AMEND AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT #3 Amended Complaint, filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LTT) Document QC'd on 7/12/2024 (ACH).
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Daryll Rued. (Documents served: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Attachments, Summonses, and Rule 5 notification.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LTT)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Daryll Rued. (Documents served: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Attachments, and Summonses.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LTT) DOCUMENT QC'D on 6/12/2024 (LTT).
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Suzanne Arnston, Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department, Minnesota Department of Human Services, Jamie Pearson, Scott County Health and Human Services. cc: Joseph Rued with info sheet #2 and summons.(MMP)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Ryan Kuffel, Carrie Lennon, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Jon Schmidt, Richard A. Stebbins, Julie Swanson, Charles Webber. cc: Joseph Rued with info Sheet2 and summons.(MMP)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nancy Brasel, Anne Gearity, Leanard Steven Grasz, Jaykumar Jayswal, Lesley Karnes, Roger M. Klaphake, Bobby Shepherd, David R. Stras, Judy Weigman, Renee L. Worke. (MMP) cc: Joseph Rued with info sheet #2 and summons.
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued, W.O.R. re #4 Exhibit/Exhibit List, #3 Amended Complaint #5 Notice (MMP) Document QC'd on 6/21/2024 (ACH).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S FRCP RULE 5.1(a)(1) filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued, W.O.R. re #4 Exhibits, #3 Amended Complaint. (MMP) Document QC'd on 6/21/2024 (ACH).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #3 Amended Complaint, filed by Joseph Daryll Rued, Leah Jean Rued, Scott Daryll Rued, W.O.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(MKB) Document QC'd on 6/21/2024 (ACH).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anne Gearity, Judy Weigman, Nancy Brasel, Bobby Shepherd, Leanard Steven Grasz, David R. Stras, Renee L. Worke, Roger M. Klaphake, Jon Schmidt, Mike Furnstahl, Charlene Hatcher, Richard A. Stebbins, Nelson L. Peralta, Christian M. Sande, Charles Webber, Carrie Lennon, Ryan Kuffel, Julie Swanson, Suzanne Arnston, Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department, Scott County Health and Human Services, Minnesota Department of Human Services, Jamie Pearson. filed by Leah Jean Rued, Joseph Daryll Rued, Scott Daryll Rued, W.O.R.. Filer requests summons issued. (MMP) Document QC'd on 6/21/2024 (ACH).
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jaykumar Jayswal, Lesley Karnes. cc: Joseph D. Rued w/ Info Sheet #2. (jam)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jaykumar Jayswal, Lesley Karnes (filing fee $405, receipt number 4-5480) filed by Leah Jean Rued, Joseph Daryll Rued, Scott Daryll Rued, W.O.R.. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jam) Document QC'd on 5/31/2024 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rued et al v. Jayswal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian M. Sande
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger M. Klaphake
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Lennon
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson L. Peralta
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Hatcher
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Shepherd
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee L. Worke
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Stebbins
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaykumar Jayswal
Represented By: Daniel D Kaczor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Stras
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Brasel
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Gearity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Furnstahl
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Schmidt
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Kuffel
Represented By: Susan M Tindal
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ramstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Webber
Represented By: Alexander Robertson Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanard Steven Grasz
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley Karnes
Represented By: Susan M Tindal
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ramstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Weigman
Represented By: Shannon L Bjorklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Arnston
Represented By: Susan M Tindal
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ramstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Swanson
Represented By: Susan M Tindal
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ramstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County Human Services and Public Health Department
Represented By: Daniel D Kaczor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott County Health and Human Services
Represented By: Susan M Tindal
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ramstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Pearson
Represented By: Susan M Tindal
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ramstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie E. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Daryll Rued
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Jean Rued
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.O.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Daryll Rued
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?