White v. Rogers et al
Plaintiff: Sierra White
Defendant: Tony Rogers, Kevin Crook, Edward Haynes, John Does 1-4, Chaz Thompson and Henry Randle
Case Number: 1:2020cv00187
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER in case 1:20-cv-00188-SA-DAS; granting (7) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00187-GHD-DAS. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/2/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00187-GHD-DAS, 1:20-cv-00188-SA-DAS (jla)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Tony Rogers, Henry Randle, Chaz Thompson, Edward Haynes, and Kevin Crook (jla)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Municipal Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Edward Haynes, Henry Randle, Chaz Thompson. (Lee, Cynthia)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Edward Haynes, Henry Randle, Chaz Thompson. (Lee, Cynthia)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Edward Haynes, Henry Randle, Chaz Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint - Sierra White v. Tony Rogers, et al, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint - Sierra White v. Monroe County Sheriff, Kevin Crook, et al, #3 Exhibit C - General Affidavit of Officer Chaz Thompson, #4 Exhibit D - Appearance Bond) (Lee, Cynthia)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Edward Haynes, Henry Randle, Chaz Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint - Sierra White v. Tony Rogers, et al, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint - Sierra White v. Monroe County Sheriff, Kevin Crook, et al, #3 Exhibit C - General Affidavit of Officer Chaz Thompson, #4 Exhibit D - Appearance Bond) (Lee, Cynthia)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tony Rogers. (jla)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia T. Lee on behalf of Edward Haynes, Henry Randle, Chaz Thompson (Lee, Cynthia)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of Edward Haynes, Henry Randle, Chaz Thompson (Butler, Gregory)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Edward Haynes, Henry Randle, Tony Rogers, Chaz Thompson; returned to pro se plaintiff for service. (jla)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 26495, filed by Sierra White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Rogers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Haynes
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Cynthia T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaz Thompson
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Cynthia T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Randle
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Cynthia T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?