Smith v. Jaco et al
Plaintiff: Michael W. Smith
Defendant: Gail Jaco and Kimberly D. Chrestman
Case Number: 2:2012cv00075
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Delta Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 132 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/7/15. (jtm)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 128 Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/17/15. (tab)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 111 Order on Motion for for Pretrial Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/20/14. (jtm)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 107 Order on Motion to File Counterclaim. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/20/14. (jtm)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SUPERSEDING MEMORANDUM OPINION Denying Defendants' 81 Motion to Object to Video Conferencing re 91 Memorandum Opinion, 90 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/1/2014. (dlh)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 90 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/2/14. (tab)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER for the purpose of obtaining a status update on the Plaintiff's ability to pay for the costs of his transportation to trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/04/2014. (lec)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER requesting a status update as to plaintiffs financial situation and ability to pay for the respective costs to his attendance at trial.. Signed by Jane M Virden on 04/23/2014. (lec)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER requesting a status update as to plaintiffs financial situation and ability to pay for the respective costs to his attendance at trial. Signed by Jane M Virden on 03/26/2014. (lec)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER for the purpose of notifying the Plaintiff he must seek a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum to secure his attendance at the trial set on November 18, 2013, in Oxford. Signed by Jane M Virden on 10/07/2013. (lec)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 45 Motion Seeking Clarification of the Court's Order of August 26, 2013. Signed by Jane M Virden on 9/11/2013. (lec)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Subpoena Forms. Signed by Jane M Virden on 8/22/2013. (lec)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Strike ; denying 38 Motion. Signed by Jane M Virden on 6/4/2013. (sef)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Compel. Signed by Jane M Virden on 4/26/2013. (sef)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 28 Motion affecting service by alternative means. Signed by Jane M Virden on 12/11/2012. (sef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Jaco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Jaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly D. Chrestman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?