Britton v. Shelby et al
Petitioner: Meika DeSean Britton
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Mississippi and Warden Georgia Shelby
Case Number: 3:2019cv00016
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #6 Brief, #14 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, Acknowledgment filed by Attorney General of the State of Mississippi, Georgia Shelby. (Owens, Jerrolyn)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER- ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION #9 TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ANDDIRECTING STATE TO RESPOND, Attorney General of the State of Mississippi answer due 5/27/2019; Georgia Shelby answer due 5/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/14/19. (cr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 Supplement to Motion re #9 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Meika DeSean Britton. (cr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (cr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Order. (cr)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Meika DeSean Britton. (tab)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/11/19. (jla)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 2/7/19. (cr)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 11, #2 Appendix A - E) (tab)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring the petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis request including inmate account information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/29/19. (cr)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cr)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Meika DeSean Britton. (cr)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Meika DeSean Britton. (cr)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( De Soto) filed by Meika DeSean Britton. (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britton v. Shelby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Georgia Shelby
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Meika DeSean Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?