L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants, Inc. v. Davis, et al
Plaintiff: L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants Inc. and L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants, Inc.
Defendant: Rupert Rudy Johnson, Ronald Lee Gill, Shane Martin, Virginia Ginny Barnfield, Timothy Johnson, Ellen Price, Ione Benefits Group Inc., Tracy Davis and Michele Gill
Case Number: 3:2020cv00058
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen L. Shields on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shields, Stephen)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jospeh Russ Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bryant, Jospeh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Alan Matthews on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Matthews, Benjamin)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Newly admitted counsel shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/12/20. (bfg)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Newly admitted counsel shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/12/20. (bfg)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Newly admitted counsel shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/12/20. (bfg)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney B. Alan Matthews,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1781972) by L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- BAM TN Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing) (Ready, George)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney J. Russ Bryant,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1781967) by L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- JRB TN Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing) (Ready, George)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen Shields,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1781960) by L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Stephen Shields Tennessee Certificate of Good Standing) (Ready, George)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; All Defendants. (Ready, George)
February 20, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Virginia Ginny Barnfield, Tracy Davis, Michele Gill, Ronald Lee Gill, Ione Benefits Group Inc., Rupert Rudy Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Shane Martin, Ellen Price. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1774078, filed by L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Ronald Lee Gill Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Tracy Davis Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Tim Johnson Agreement, #4 Exhibit D Ellen Price Agreement, #5 Exhibit E Shane Martin Agreement, #6 Exhibit F Rupert Johnson Agreement, #7 Exhibit G Michele Gill Agreement, #8 Exhibit H Virginia Barnfield, #9 Exhibit I Michele Gill Employee Navigator Report 1, #10 Exhibit J Michele Gill Employee Navigator Report 2, #11 Exhibit K Client Contact Information Report, #12 Exhibit L Virgina Barnfield Employee Navigator Report, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants, Inc. v. Davis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rupert Rudy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lee Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Ginny Barnfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ione Benefits Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants Inc.
Represented By: George B. Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.S. & Associates Insurance Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: George B. Ready
Represented By: Benjamin Alan Matthews
Represented By: Stephen L. Shields
Represented By: Jospeh Russ Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?