Moore v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Richard Moore
Defendant: Blake Smith, Keith Roberts, Union County Sheriff's Department, Jimmy Edwards, Chris Chappelle, Chris Childers and Curt Clayton
Case Number: 3:2021cv00080
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Union County Sheriff's Department. (Allen, William)
June 10, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Chris Chappelle, Jimmy Edwards, Blake Smith, Union County Sheriff's Department. (Allen, William)
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 Emergency MOTION to Issue and Enforce Restraining Order and to Order the Department of Justice to Investigate Life Threatening Obstruction of Justice by Richard Moore. (jwr)
May 24, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION To Remove Defendant Chris Childers From Civil Action by Richard Moore. (tab)
May 17, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Reissued as to Jimmy Edwards, Keith Roberts, Blake Smith, Union County Sheriff's Department. Forwarded to USM for service. (jwr) (Main Document 17 replaced on 5/17/2021) (jwr).
May 14, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Chris Chappelle, Chris Childers, Curt Clayton. Forwarded to USM for service. (jwr)
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Moore. (jwr)
May 12, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Reissued as to Jimmy Edwards, Keith Roberts, Blake Smith, Union County Sheriff's Department. Forwarded to USM for service. (jwr) (Main Document 14 replaced on 5/17/2021) (jwr).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/12/2021. (yf)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 Supplement to Motion re #6 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Richard Moore. (jla)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #9 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. (jla)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Richard Moore. (tab)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/30/2021. (yf)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Form Application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs) (yf)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Richard Moore. (jwr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis re service of process by Richard Moore. (jla)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Richard Moore. (jla)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Receive Documents Electronically (jtm)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jimmy Edwards, Keith Roberts, Blake Smith, Union County Sheriff's Department. Returned to Pro Se Plaintiff for service. (tab)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number MSN300027542, filed by Richard Moore. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Smith
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Edwards
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Chappelle
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?