Pinkston v. Mississippi Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Chaz Pinkston
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections, Centurion, Kuiper, Barron, Nichols, Keba Taylor and S. Anderson
Case Number: 4:2017cv00039
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Sunflower
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 286 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/16/20. (jla)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER DENYING 221 Motion for Contempt; SUSTAINING 230 Objections to the Report and Recommendation; and REJECTING 222 Report and Recommendations; a new evidentiary hearing on Pinkston's claims will be noticed separately.. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/27/20. (jla)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 249 Motion for Witnesses/Clarification. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 6/18/20. (jla)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/21/20. (jla)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying 240 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/5/19. (jla)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying 170 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/10/19. (jla)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER that any request by plaintiff for a jury trial at this stage is denied as improperly filed and untimely. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/20/18. (tab)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Pinkston's motion for reconsideration 110 is DENIED; motion for injunctive relief 100 DENIED; motions for sanctions 107 , 108 are DENIED; Centurion Defendants's motion for summary judgment 65 GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; MDOC is sua sponte DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/25/18. (cr)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 81 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/5/18. (tab)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Vacating 38 Order on Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/3/18. (jtm)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TODEFENDANTS' MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/7/17. (cr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinkston v. Mississippi Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaz Pinkston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keba Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?