Jones et al v. Gammage et al
Plaintiff: Rika Jones
Defendant: Edwin Merriman, Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc. doing business as AMR and American Medical Response, Justin Gammage, Michael Jones, Reggie Woodall, Corrections Management Services, Inc., Albert Deane Tilley, Jennifer Howell, John Watson and City of Grenada
Case Number: 4:2020cv00220
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Rika Jones(As Mother and Next Friend of R.D.L., a Minor). (Jordan, Jacob)
January 11, 2021 Remark: Exhibit A to the Complaint received and placed on shelf in clerk's office Oxford. (jwr)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Exhibit A to the #1 Complaint, Video Footage from the Grenada County Jail by Jacob Bystrom Jordan on behalf of Rika Jones, Rika Jones, Rika Jones. (Jordan, Jacob) Modified on 1/12/2021 (tab).
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0537-1890363, filed by Rika Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
December 31, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Gammage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Merriman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc. doing business as AMR and American Medical Response
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Gammage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Deane Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Grenada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rika Jones
Represented By: Jacob Bystrom Jordan
Represented By: Victor Israel Fleitas
Represented By: J. Rhea Tannehill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?