Boyd v. Spencer et al
Plaintiff: Dean C. Boyd
Defendant: Medical Doctor J. Glisson and Barry Spencer
Case Number: 4:2021cv00035
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 ORDER Spears Hearing. (cb)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 9/9/2021 09:30 AM in Greenville Courtroom 2 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/1/2021. (cb)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/1/2021. (cb)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline, NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit. (cb)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Debra M. Brown no longer assigned to the case. (cb)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 4/22/2021. Signed by Clerk on 3/23/2021. (cb)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (cb)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dean C. Boyd. (cb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/23/2021) (cb).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Dean C. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 'A'- Factual Allegation) (cb) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/23/2021) (cb). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/23/2021) (cb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Spencer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean C. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Doctor J. Glisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?