Scott v. MDOC et al
Plaintiff: Janicholas V. Scott
Defendant: MDOC, Carroll Montgomery Regional Correctional Facility, Burl Cain and Brandon Smith
Case Number: 4:2021cv00042
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT Amendment to #1 Complaint. (jla)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Complaint. (jla)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 ORDER Spears Hearing set. (jla)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT TO #1 Complaint. (cb)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 7/27/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/13/2021. (cb)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/13/2021. (cb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Michael P. Mills no longer assigned to the case. (cb)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 4/29/2021. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2021. (cb)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Janicholas V. Scott. (cb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Janicholas V. Scott. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. MDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll Montgomery Regional Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janicholas V. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?