Cooper v. Porras et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Cooper
Defendant: Edwin Porras, Sysco Corporation and The Sygma Network, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00124
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint). (Tarleton, Grant)
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Sysco Corporation (jla)
November 22, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Edwin Porras and The Sygma Network, Inc. (jla)
November 5, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Edwin Porras, Sysco Corporation, The Sygma Network, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Derrick Cooper. (Graves, William)
November 5, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #17 Amended Complaint: Attorney to refile Amended Complaint with date and signature. (jwr)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Edwin Porras, Jury Demand, filed by Derrick Cooper. (Graves, William)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is directed to file the proposed amended complaint within three (3) business days of this date. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/3/21. (no document attached) (ncb)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Derrick Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint) (Graves, William)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating #9 Motion to Amend/Correct, consistent with Order 13 . No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/22/21. (no document attached) (ncb)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw motion for leave to amend the complaint #9 . No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/22/21. (no document attached) (ncb)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw by Derrick Cooper. (Graves, William)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Informal Telephonic Conference held on 10/19/2021. (irw)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Conference: Informal Telephonic Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Call-in information is provided on the notice. (irw)
October 14, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct re #2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) and Administrative Procedures Section 3(A)(8) states that all supporting exhibits must be denominated by both an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description; Court staff has made the correction. Attorney will be directed to refile in the future. (jla)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct re #2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT by Derrick Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Amended Complaint) (Graves, William) Modified on 10/12/2021 (jla). Modified on 10/14/2021 (jla).
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons Edwin Porras, #3 Summons Sysco Corporation) (Kidd, D.)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Informal Telephonic Conference held on 10/8/2021. (irw)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #4 Motion to Amend/Correct. The proposed amendment does not definitively allege federal jurisdiction. The denial is without prejudice. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/8/21. (no document attached) (ncb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Conference: Informal Telephonic Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Call-in information is provided on the notice. (irw)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Derrick Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Graves, William)
October 6, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint; Attorney to refile and include proposed amended pleading as an exhibit, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 15. (jla)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint by Derrick Cooper. (Graves, William)
September 28, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Edwin Porras, Sysco Corporation, filed by Derrick Cooper. (jla)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sysco Corporation from Coahoma County Circuit Court, case number 14CI1:21cv00039. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC2005595) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Porras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Cooper
Represented By: William Andrew Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Porras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Represented By: D. Sterling Kidd
Represented By: Grant M. Tarleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sygma Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?