Burston v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: |
Ronald Dale Burston, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Russell Graham, Unknown Reese, John Doe, Missouri Department of Corrections, Buddy May, Daniel Smith, Pamela Lacey, Michael Hakala and James Cooper |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00221 |
Filed: |
December 12, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry E. Autrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
17
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint because plaintiff's claims are barred by the statute of limitations. Plaintiff's claims are therefore subject to dismissal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). An Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 5/30/2012. (JMC)
|
February 15, 2012 |
Filing
10
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 7 PRO SE MOTION filed by Plaintiff Ronald Dale Burston, Jr. motion is GRANTED IN PART..Plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $28.67, in accordance with the instructions set forth in the January 18, 2012 Memorandum and Order, no later than April 16, 2012( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/16/2012.) Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 2/15/12. (MRS)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
6
OPINION MEMORANDUM...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $28.67 within thirty (30) days of the date of t his Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall mail to plaintiff five copies of the Co urt's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint.( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 2/17/2012., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 2/17/2012.) (5 prisoner civil rights forms forwarded to Mr. Burston) Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 1/18/2012. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?