IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Robert Delaney, Qualls Land Co., Kemp Farms, Heitmann Farms Inc., Bill Bader, Mattis Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, Vincent Farms, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Randy Fendrick, Michael Baioni, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Steven Wayne Landers, Heinco Farms, Jerry Stogsdill, Deloris Irene Landers, Amore Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Morrison Partners, Speiser Farm Inc., PE Partners, Robert Terry Farms, John P. Baioni Farms, McLemore Farms LLC, Hunter Tree Farms, Mark Lee, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Cooper Family Farms, Wimberley Farms LLC, Ann Schuchart, Buckskin Farms, JTM Farms Partnership, Bader Farms, Inc., Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, LGO Farms Partnership, HH Farm Partnership, Emil Schuchart, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Meacham Farms, James L Hill, Wapsie Farms, William E McMullen, Lockley Bros Farm, Gary Gerlach, Tipton Brothers, Reed Storey, Phillip Wade Hill, Storey Farming, Jed R. Claassen, Clint E Henderson Land Company, B&L Farms Partnership, Judy A Minton, Karen Bruce, Wildy Farms South Inc, Steve Jackson, John Tipton, Ronnie George, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, Wildy Farms North Inc, Earl H Wildy Inc, Jerry Franks, Daniel Kabat, Bart Coker, Crop Damage Master Complaint, George Watson, Chris Oakes Farm, R P George, Scott Mathis, LA Farms Incorporated, Wildy Farms East LLC, Antitrust Master Complaint, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Michael Barham, Jr., Charles P Loeschner, Hill Farms Partnership, Neil Culp, Daniel Hill, Gregory Harris, Justin Wildy, Watson Partners, L & M Farm Partnership, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Allen Culp, Lonny W Lockley, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, Bethany Harris, Joe Jackson, William Matthew Dunavan, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Katherine Bennett, Phillip Jackson, Paul Harris, Muskrat Flats, LLC, David Oakes, NJ&B Partnership, Pam Culp, Carlos Nash, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., Foliage Off Falls LLC, S & A Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, Warren Farms, Ernest Heidelberger, Steve Johnson, Jill Culp, Marshall W. Scallion, P & E Farms LLC, Frederick Ainsworth, David Carter, Billy Childers, Tab Wildy, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Violet Childers, Kristy Vanalstine, Claassen Farms, Anthony Wheat, David Oakes Farm, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Ronald Curtis Storey, Curtis Heidelberger, Bill Rhodes, Caleb Bruce, Gerlach Farming, Charles Tipton, K D H Farms Partnership, T Hill Farms, DWK Farms LLC, Lisa Marie Johnson, Double A Farms, Lance Hill, Brian Jossart, Fran Adams, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Kristi Wildy, Clint Henderson, Gadwal Farms, C & A Heidelberger Farms, Joseph Billings, RSB Farming, David Wildy, Kevin Whitehead, Susan Heidelberger, Patty Wildly, Wilson Application LLC, Kay Don Jons, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Ronnie Bruce, 4-R Farms, Inc., Randle Foran, Larry Johnson, Vickie Jackson, Forest River Farms, Sam Branum, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Wildy Land Company LLC, Brooke W. Scallion, Rus Lanpher, Flamm Orchards, Inc., Whitehead Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Greg Tillman, Dwight Ellis, David Carter Farms JV, APRIL JOHNSON, Chris Oakes, Justin Pic, Kevin Gerlach, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Bruce Farms Partnership, Josh Bartlett, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, Chris Peyton, Darrow C Linn, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Brian Chastain Farms, Eddie McMullen Farms, Brian Warren, K & W Farms Partnership, Shane Greckel, Bobby Cloninger, Jeremy Oakes, Tandy Ray King, Allen Burris and Macon Landers
Defendant: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, BASF Corporation, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., BASF Plant Science LP, BASF Crop Protection, BASF SE, John Doe Companies, Robert Shaun Bennett, Maury Farmers Cooperative and Bayer Corporation
Special Master: John S. Hahn
Case Number: 1:2018md02820
Filed: February 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Cape Girardeau
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 496 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. Burris v. Monsanto Company; et al, E.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 6:19cv00205, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:19-cv-00163-SNLJ. Landers v. Monsanto Company et al, E.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 6:19cv00207, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:19-cv-00164-SNLJ. (DLB)
September 12, 2019 Filing 495 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. Burris v. Monsanto Company; et al, E.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 6:19cv00205, Landers v. Monsanto Company et al, E.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 6:19cv00207. (DLB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 494 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Kemp Farms: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
September 6, 2019 Filing 493 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Gregory Tillman: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
August 27, 2019 Filing 492 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #486 MOTION for Leave to Strike New Argument or, in the Alternative, for Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinions of David Brassard filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Lesko, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 491 SURREPLY to Motion re #411 Joint MOTION to Exclude or Strike Charles D. Cowan from Testifying as an Expert Witness filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Main Document 491 replaced on 8/27/2019) (MRS).
August 27, 2019 Filing 490 SURREPLY to Motion re #407 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Stevan Knezevic filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Depo of Kruger)(MRS)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #488 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Rebuttal in Further Support of Their Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Charles D. Cowan by Defendant Monsanto Company. AND #487 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude or Strike Certain Opinions of Dr. Knezevic by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. ( ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/27/19. (MRS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 488 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Rebuttal in Further Support of Their Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Charles D. Cowan by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Rebuttal)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
August 26, 2019 Filing 487 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude or Strike Certain Opinions of Dr. Knezevic by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit Depo Cuts)(Rocha, Rene)
August 22, 2019 Filing 486 MOTION for Leave to Strike New Argument or, in the Alternative, for Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinions of David Brassard by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
August 22, 2019 Filing 485 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Michael Parsons: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Bilsborrow, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 484 SURREPLY to Motion re #411 Joint MOTION to Exclude or Strike Charles D. Cowan from Testifying as an Expert Witness filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (MRS)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #482 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude or Strike Expert Cowan from Testifying by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude or Strike Expert Cowan)(Downing, Don) filed by Crop Damage Master Complaint ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/21/19. (MRS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 482 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude or Strike Expert Cowan from Testifying by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude or Strike Expert Cowan)(Downing, Don)
August 15, 2019 Filing 481 REPLY to Response to Motion re #427 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude Certain Class Cert Opinions and Testimony of Schultz, Bane, Strathman, and Westberg filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Downing, Don)
August 15, 2019 Filing 480 REPLY to Response to Motion re #425 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Barry Goodwin filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Testimony Excerpts of Barry Goodwin, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition excerpts of Ford Baldwin, #3 Exhibit 3 - Article by E. Unglesbee, #4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition excerpts of Oral Capps Jr., #5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition excerpts of Bruce Babcock)(Downing, Don)
August 15, 2019 Filing 479 SEALED DOCUMENT re #477 Reply to Response to Motion,, re Joint Motion to Exclude or Strike Charles D. Cowan from Testifying as an Expert Witness by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Excerpts of S. Nowlis Deposition, #2 Exhibit F - Excerpts of B. Goodwin Deposition)(Hohn, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 478 REPLY to Response to Motion re #428 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Robin Cantor filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cantor Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Baldwin Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Goodwin Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Capps Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 - Scallion Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6 - Dicamba Injury by Emily Unglesbee, #7 Exhibit 7 - Bumper Crop Farms Deposition Excerpts)(Downing, Don)
August 15, 2019 Filing 477 REPLY to Response to Motion re #411 Joint MOTION to Exclude or Strike Charles D. Cowan from Testifying as an Expert Witness filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of C. Cowan Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of F. Baldwin Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of S. Heinrichs Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of S. Nowlis Deposition (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E - Excerpts of R. Cantor Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpts of B. Goodwin Deposition (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit G - K. Bousquet Declaration)(Hohn, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 476 REPLY to Response to Motion re #426 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Oral Capps, Jr. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of its Motion filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Capps Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Babcock Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Baldwin Deposition Excerpts, Vol. I, #4 Exhibit 4 - Goodwin Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dicamaba Injury by Emily Unglesbee, #6 Exhibit 6 - Bumper Crop Farms Deposition Excerpts)(Downing, Don)
August 15, 2019 Filing 475 REPLY to Response to Motion re #415 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Dennis Gardisser filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 474 REPLY to Response to Motion re #409 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Ford Baldwin filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mandler, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 473 REPLY in support re #416 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Bruce Babcock by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Knezevic Depo. Exh. 11, #2 Exhibit B - King Document, #3 Exhibit C - Angrist Article)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann) Modified on 8/16/2019 (MRS).
August 15, 2019 Filing 472 REPLY to Response to Motion re #407 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Stevan Knezevic filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
August 15, 2019 Filing 471 REPLY to Response to Motion re #422 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Monsanto Company's Expert David Brassard filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Lesko, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 470 REPLY to Response to Motion re #412 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. George Millikan filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Rocha, Rene)
August 15, 2019 Filing 469 Reply to re #424 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Anthony J. Schroeder by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Lesko, Paul) Modified on 8/16/2019 (MRS).
August 15, 2019 Filing 468 SEALED DOCUMENT re #441 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. William Gallus by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Lesko, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 467 REPLY to Response to Motion re #421 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kassim Al-Khatib filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit excerpts of depo of Dr. Al-Khatib, #2 Exhibit article)(Rocha, Rene)
August 15, 2019 Filing 466 REPLY to Response to Motion re #421 SEALED MOTION Motion to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kenneth E. Savage filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit excerpts of depo of Kenneth Savage)(Rocha, Rene)
August 8, 2019 Filing 465 NOTICE of Videotaped Depositions to Defendant BASF Corporation: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Steve Bowe, #2 Exhibit Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Frederick (Scott) Kay)(Bilsborrow, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 464 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Brett Begemann: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Bilsborrow, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 463 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. King v. Monsanto Company et al, M.D. Tennessee, Case No. 1:19cv00064, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:19cv129 SNLJ. (DLB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 462 NOTICE of Videotaped Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions to Defendants Monsanto Company and BASF Corporation: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Taking Deposition of Monsanto Company, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Taking Video Deposition of BASF Corporation)(Bilsborrow, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 461 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. King v. Monsanto Company et al, M.D. Tennessee, Case No. 1:19cv00064. (DLB)
August 6, 2019 Filing 460 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude or Strike Charles D. Cowan (complete))(Downing, Don)
July 31, 2019 Filing 459 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Not Under Seal with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #456 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - collectively Flynn Motion to Exclude or Strike et al, #2 Exhibit H - Goodwin Deposition Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit K - Nowliss deposition excerpts, #4 Exhibit M - Declaration of Kaitlin A. Bridges)(Downing, Don) Modified on 8/1/2019 (CSG).
July 31, 2019 Filing 458 SEALED DOCUMENT re #409 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Ford Baldwin Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Ford Baldwin by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Baldwin Depo Excerpts, Vol 2, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dep. Ex. 96, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dep. Ex. 223, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dep. Ex. 157)(Downing, Don)
July 31, 2019 Filing 457 SEALED DOCUMENT re #416 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Bruce Babcock Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Bruce Babcock by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Goodwin Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cowan Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cowan Expert Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Baldwin Expert Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Baldwin Depo Excerpts Vol 2, #6 Exhibit 6 - Nowlis Depo Excerpts)(Downing, Don)
July 31, 2019 Filing 456 SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum In Opposition to Motion to Exclude or Strike Expert Cowan by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cowan deposition excerpts, #2 Exhibit C - Goodwin deposition excerpts, #3 Exhibit D - Babcock deposition excerpts, #4 Exhibit E - Baldwin expert report, #5 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs' deposition excerpts, #6 Exhibit G - Baldwin deposition excerpts, #7 Exhibit I - York deposition excerpts, #8 Exhibit J - Becker deposition excerpts, #9 Exhibit L - Babcock expert report, #10 Exhibit N - Scallion deposition excerpts, #11 Exhibit O - J. Wildy deposition excerpts, #12 Exhibit P - D. Wildy deposition excerpts, #13 Exhibit Q - Jons deposition excerpts, #14 Exhibit R - Claassen deposition excerpts, #15 Exhibit S - Lanpher deposition excerpts, #16 Exhibit T - Scallion insurance form (Dep. Ex.), #17 Exhibit U - Franks deposition excerpts, #18 Exhibit V - Tipton deposition excerpts, #19 Exhibit W - Johnson deposition excerpts)(Downing, Don)
July 31, 2019 Filing 455 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #424 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Anthony J. Schroeder filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schroeder Deposition Excerpts)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 454 MEMORANDUM re #421 Sealed Document Defendant Monsanto Company's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Kenneth Savage by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Savage Deposition Excerpts)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 453 SEALED DOCUMENT re #452 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Goodwin Deposition Excerpts)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 452 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #425 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Barry Goodwin filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Babcock Deposition Excerpts)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 451 MEMORANDUM re #414 Sealed Document Monsanto's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kassim Al-Khatib by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Al-Khatib Deposition Excerpts)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 450 SEALED DOCUMENT re #447 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit A by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Mandler, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 449 RESPONSE in Opposition re #422 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Monsanto Company's Expert David Brassard filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of David Brassard, #2 Exhibit B - Condensed Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Classification Summary)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
July 31, 2019 Filing 448 RESPONSE in Opposition re #412 SEALED MOTION filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of George Milliken, #2 Exhibit B - Condensed Deposition of George Milliken, #3 Exhibit C - Knezevic Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Knezevic Expert Report)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
July 31, 2019 Filing 447 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #427 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude Certain Class Cert Opinions and Testimony of Schultz, Bane, Strathman, and Westberg filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Mandler, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 446 NOTICE of Filing Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Meacham Farms, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Gregory Tillman)(Bousquet, Kimberly)
July 31, 2019 Filing 445 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #426 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Oral Capps, Jr. filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oral Capps Depo Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Oral Capps Depo Ex 8, #3 Exhibit C - Oral Capps Depo Ex 10, #4 Exhibit D - Oral Capps Depo Ex 12, #5 Exhibit E - Oral Capps Depo Ex 13, #6 Exhibit F - Oral Capps Depo Ex 14, #7 Exhibit G - Charles Cowan Depo Transcript Excerpts, #8 Exhibit H - Bumper Crop Farms Depo Transcript Excerpts)(Mandler, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 444 RESPONSE in Opposition re #407 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Stevan Knezevic filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Rocha, Rene)
July 31, 2019 Filing 443 SEALED DOCUMENT/PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION re #415 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Dennis Gardisser by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15)(Lesko, Paul) Modified on 8/1/2019 (CSG).
July 31, 2019 Filing 442 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #428 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Robin Cantor filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robin Cantor Depo Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Charles Cowan Depo Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Bumper Crop Farms Depo Transcript Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Marshall Scallion Depo Transcript Excerpts)(Mandler, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 441 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #423 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. William Gallus filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 440 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Michael Parsons: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Bilsborrow, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 439 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of Henderson Land & Cattle Co.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #437 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Oppositions to Defendants' Daubert Motions Directed to Bruce Babcock and Charles Cowan by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Downing, Don) filed by Crop Damage Master Complaint ; ORDERED GRANTING. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/24/19. (MRS)
July 23, 2019 Filing 437 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Oppositions to Defendants' Daubert Motions Directed to Bruce Babcock and Charles Cowan by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Downing, Don)
July 19, 2019 Filing 436 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of David Carter Farms: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
July 16, 2019 Filing 435 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Gregory Harris: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
July 15, 2019 Filing 434 NOTICE of Videotaped Depositions to Defendant Monsanto Company: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Ty Vaughn, #2 Exhibit Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Brian Adams, #3 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Jeff Travers)(Bilsborrow, James)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Docket Text ORDER: By agreement of the parties, the status conference scheduled for July 18, 2019 has been cancelled.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/10/19. (MRS)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 432 FOURTH AMENDED CROP DAMAGE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See order for all deadlines. First trial set to begin in the month of August, 2020. The Court will issue a pretrial order at an appropriate time.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/3/19. (MRS) (Main Document 432 replaced on 7/10/2019) (MRS).
July 1, 2019 Filing 431 SEALED DOCUMENT re #430 Sealed Document,, #429 Sealed Document,, Appendix of Expert Report Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude the Class Cert Opinions and Testimony of Various Experts for Defendants by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 - Nowlis Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 22- Savage Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 23 - Schroeder Expert Report)(Downing, Don)
July 1, 2019 Filing 430 SEALED DOCUMENT re #429 Sealed Document,, by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Jackson Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 12 - Kruger Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 13 - Milliken Expert Report, #4 Exhibit 14 - Schultz Expert Disclosure, #5 Exhibit 15 - Strathman Expert Disclosure, #6 Exhibit 16 - Westberg Expert Disclosure, #7 Exhibit 17 - Al - Khatib Expert Report, #8 Exhibit 18 - Brassard Expert Report, #9 Exhibit 19 - Goodwin Expert Report, #10 Exhibit 20 - Griffin Expert Report)(Downing, Don)
July 1, 2019 Filing 429 SEALED DOCUMENT Appendix of Expert Report Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude the Class Cert Opinions and Testimony of Various Experts for Defendants by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bobcock Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Baldwin Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 3- Cowan Expert Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Gardisser Expert Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Knezevic Expert Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - Bane Expert Disclosure, #7 Exhibit 7 - Cantor Expert Report, #8 Exhibit 8 - Capps Expert Report, #9 Exhibit 9 - Gallus Expert Report, #10 Exhibit 10 - Hewitt Expert Report)(Downing, Don)
July 1, 2019 Filing 428 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Robin Cantor by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Deposition Transcript Excerpts of Dr. Robin Cantor)(Downing, Don)
July 1, 2019 Filing 427 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude Certain Class Cert Opinions and Testimony of Schultz, Bane, Strathman, and Westberg by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - John Schultz Depo Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ryan Bane Depo Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Katie Strathman Depo Transcript Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Gary Schmitz Depo Transcript Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dan Westberg Depo Transcript Excerpts)(Downing, Don)
July 1, 2019 Filing 426 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Oral Capps, Jr. by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Deposition Transcript Excerpts of Dr. Oral Capps, Jr., #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Deposition Transcript Excerpts of Robin Cantor)(Downing, Don)
July 1, 2019 Filing 425 SEALED MOTION and Memorandum to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Barry Goodwin by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Goodwin Deposition Transcript Excerpts)(Downing, Don)
July 1, 2019 Filing 424 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Anthony J. Schroeder by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lesko, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Filing 423 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. William Gallus by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Lesko, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Filing 422 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Monsanto Company's Expert David Brassard by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lesko, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Filing 421 SEALED DOCUMENT Motion to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kenneth E. Savage & Memo in Support by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rocha, Rene)
July 1, 2019 Filing 420 SEALED DOCUMENT MEMO IN SUPPORT re #416 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Bruce Babcock Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Joint Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Bruce Babcock by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Babcock Report, #2 Exhibit B - Babcock Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Cowan Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Baldwin Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - Group Exhibit - Plaintiffs Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit F - Goodwin Report, #7 Exhibit G - Knezevic Report, #8 Exhibit H)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann) Modified on 7/2/2019 (MRS).
July 1, 2019 Filing 419 SEALED DOCUMENT re #411 Joint MOTION to Exclude or Strike Charles D. Cowan from Testifying as an Expert Witness, #413 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,, by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 3 - Goodwin, #2 Attachment 8 - Claassen, #3 Attachment 16 - Goodwin Expert Report, #4 Attachment 26 - Nowlis Expert Report)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #403 Joint MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation in Support of Joint Daubert Motion Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Bruce Babcock by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED over Plaintiff's Objection. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/1/19. (MRS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 417 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #415 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Dennis Gardisser filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Dr. Dennis Gardisser, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of Dr. Dennis Gardisser Deposition, #3 Exhibit 3 - EPA Article dated Oct. 31, 2018, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Dr. Dennis Gardisser)(Mandler, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 416 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Bruce Babcock by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
July 1, 2019 Filing 415 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Dennis Gardisser by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 414 SEALED DOCUMENT Motion to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kassim Al-Khatib & Memo in Support by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rocha, Rene)
July 1, 2019 Filing 413 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #411 Joint MOTION to Exclude or Strike Charles D. Cowan from Testifying as an Expert Witness filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hohn Declaration, #2 Attachment 1 - Cowan Expert Report, #3 Attachment 2 - Cowan Depo, #4 Attachment 3 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Attachment 4 - Capps, #6 Attachment 5 - Cantor, #7 Attachment 6 - York, #8 Attachment 7 - Claassen, #9 Attachment 8 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Attachment 9 - Johnson, #11 Attachment 10 - Becker, #12 Attachment 11 - Lanpher, #13 Attachment 12 - Scallion, #14 Attachment 13 - Wildy, David, #15 Attachment 14 - Franks, #16 Attachment 15 - Tipton, #17 Attachment 16 - Filed Under Seal, #18 Attachment 17 - Cantor Expert Report, #19 Attachment 18 - Babcock Expert Report, #20 Attachment 19 - Wildy, Justin, #21 Attachment 20 - Don Jons Kay, #22 Attachment 21 - Baldwin, #23 Attachment 22 - Griffin Expert Report, #24 Attachment 23 - Al-Khatib Expert Report, #25 Attachment 24 - Savage Expert Report, #26 Attachment 25 - Kruger Expert Report, #27 Attachment 26 - Filed Under Seal, #28 Attachment 27 - Partial List of Undesigned Survey, #29 Attachment 28 - Relevant Topics Cowan Has No Knowledge, #30 Attachment 29 - Issues Cowan Testified Could Address thru Pretesting)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 412 SEALED DOCUMENT Motion to Exclude the Class Certification Opinions and Testimony of Dr. George Millikan & Memo in Support by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rocha, Rene)
July 1, 2019 Filing 411 Joint MOTION to Exclude or Strike Charles D. Cowan from Testifying as an Expert Witness by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 410 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #409 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Ford Baldwin filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Dr. Ford Baldwin, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of Dr. Ford Baldwin deposition (Mar. 13, 2019), #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Dr. Ford Baldwin, #4 Exhibit 4 - Transcript of Dr. Ford Baldwin deposition (Jan. 6, 2016))(Mandler, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 409 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Ford Baldwin by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 408 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #407 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Stevan Knezevic filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Knezevic Report, #2 Exhibit B - Knezevic Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Griffin Report, #4 Exhibit D - Kruger Report, #5 Exhibit E - Milliken Report, #6 Exhibit F- Milliken Deposition)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
July 1, 2019 Filing 407 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Stevan Knezevic by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 28, 2019 Filing 406 NOTICE of Filing Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Speiser Farms Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Heinco Farms, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Mark Lee)(Bousquet, Kimberly)
June 28, 2019 Filing 405 REPLY to Response to Motion re #403 Joint MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation in Support of Joint Daubert Motion Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Bruce Babcock filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 28, 2019 Filing 404 RESPONSE to Motion re #403 Joint MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation in Support of Joint Daubert Motion Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Bruce Babcock filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Bruce Babcock)(Downing, Don)
June 28, 2019 Filing 403 Joint MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation in Support of Joint Daubert Motion Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Bruce Babcock by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #389 Sealed Motion IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Amend Case Management Order (#389) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that that plaintiffs motion for class certification shall be due 14 days after this Court rules on the parties Daubert motions related to class certification experts. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/17/19. (MRS)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Docket Text ORDER: Status Conference reset for 7/18/2019 10:00 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/17/18. (MRS)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER - This case is before the Court on plaintiffs' "Motion to Amend Case Management Order," #389 , which has been fully briefed. At this time the Court will consider only that part of the motion requesting a two-week extension for the filing of Daubert motions, which are due June 17, 2019. Because the depositions of the expert witnesses have not yet been completed and because the request for extension is only for a short period, this Court will grant the motion to that extent. The remaining parts of the motion are taken under advisement.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/12/19. (KJS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 399 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Shane Greckel: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
June 11, 2019 Filing 398 NOTICE of Amended Videotaped Deposition of Greg Starling: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Bilsborrow, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 397 NOTICE by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint of Videotaped Deposition of David Brassard (Downing, Don)
June 5, 2019 Filing 396 NOTICE of Videotaped Depositions to Defendant Monsanto Company: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Tina Bhakta, #2 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Ty Witten, #3 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Jennifer Ozimkiewicz, #4 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Brian Adams, #5 Exhibit Second Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Lisa Safarian, #6 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Ty Vaughn, #7 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Duane Simpson, #8 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Michael Dykes)(Bilsborrow, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 395 REPLY to Response to Motion re #389 SEALED MOTION and Supporting Memorandum to Amend Case Management Order filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Downing, Don)
May 29, 2019 Filing 394 NOTICE of Videotaped Depositions to Defendant BASF Corporation: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Gary Schmitz, #2 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Ron Repage, #3 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Jeff Birk, #4 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Frederick (Scott) Kay, #5 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Nathan Borgmeyer, #6 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Rick Chamblee, #7 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Steve Bowe, #8 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Alyson Emanuel)(Bilsborrow, James)
May 29, 2019 Filing 393 NOTICE of Filing of Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Videotaped Deposition of George A. Milliken, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Greg R. Kruger, Ph.D.)(Downing, Don)
May 28, 2019 Filing 392 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Rob Fraley: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Bilsborrow, James)
May 28, 2019 Filing 391 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #389 SEALED MOTION and Supporting Memorandum to Amend Case Management Order filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Miriam Paris deposition)(Mandler, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 390 SEALED DOCUMENT re #389 SEALED MOTION and Supporting Memorandum to Amend Case Management Order by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Expert Report of Barry K. Goodwin)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
May 21, 2019 Filing 389 SEALED MOTION and Supporting Memorandum to Amend Case Management Order by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Excerpts of Goodwin deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 Excerpts of Goodwin report, #3 Exhibit 3 Excerpts of Gallus report)(Downing, Don)
May 20, 2019 Filing 388 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of James L. Griffin: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Downing, Don)
May 15, 2019 Filing 387 NOTICE of Videotaped Depositions to Defendant Monsanto Company: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Ryan Rubischko, #2 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Greg Starling, #3 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Tina Bhatka, #4 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Shea Murdock)(Bilsborrow, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 386 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Professor Kenneth E. Savage: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Downing, Don)
May 7, 2019 Filing 385 NOTICE of Filing of Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Katie Strathman, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of James L. Griffin)(Downing, Don)
May 6, 2019 Filing 384 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing of Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Scott Jackson, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Kassim Al-Khatib, Ph.D.)(Downing, Don)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 COORDINATION ORDER re #382 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion for Entry of Coordination Order filed by Crop Damage Master Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/6/2019. (JMC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 382 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion for Entry of Coordination Order by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Coordination Order)(Downing, Don)
May 3, 2019 Filing 381 NOTICE of Filing of Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of John Schultz, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Ryan Bane, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Dan Westberg)(Downing, Don)
May 1, 2019 Filing 380 NOTICE by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint of Videotaped Deposition of Anthony J. Schroeder, CCM, CM Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:16-cv-00299-SNLJ(Downing, Don)
May 1, 2019 Filing 379 NOTICE of Filing of Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Andrew J. Hewitt, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Dr. William A. Gallus, Jr.)(Downing, Don)
May 1, 2019 Filing 378 TRANSCRIPT of 363 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 4/12/19 before Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2019. (MRS)
April 26, 2019 Filing 377 NOTICE of Filing of Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Barry K. Goodwin, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Oral Capps, Jr., #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Dr. Stephen M. Nowlis, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Robin Cantor)(Downing, Don)
April 23, 2019 Filing 376 NOTICE of Amended Videotaped Deposition of Lisa Safarian: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Bilsborrow, James)
April 19, 2019 Filing 375 MEMORANDUM re (360 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 87 in 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, (368 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) Memorandum by Plaintiffs Chris Oakes Farm, Chris Oakes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
April 18, 2019 Filing 374 TRANSCRIPT of #238 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 10/19/18 before Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (MRS)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Discovery Completion due by 3/30/2020. (Further deadlines issued - See order for details). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/18/19. (MRS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 372 CONSENT MOTION TO ENTER THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Amended Crop Damage Case Management Order)(Downing, Don) Modified on 4/18/2019 (MRS).
April 16, 2019 Filing 371 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Joseph F. Guenthner, Ph.D.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
April 15, 2019 Filing 370 TRANSCRIPT of #12 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 3/28/18 before Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019. (MRS)
April 12, 2019 Filing 369 SEALED DOCUMENT re #368 Memorandum Exhibit A by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 368 MEMORANDUM re #360 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B)(Hohn, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 367 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Chris Oakes: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: Bader - The following briefing schedule shall be in place for defendant Monsanto's motion to extend the discovery deadline and trial date in this case: Motion and memorandum due Monday, April 15, 2019. Response memorandum due Friday, April 19, 2019. Reply memorandum due Tuesday, April 23, 2019. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/12/19. (MRS)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties announced they have reached an agreement regarding changes to the Second Amended Case Management Order. The parties shall file the agreed-upon proposed Third Amended Case Management Order with the Court, with an e-mailed Word Document copy to chambers, by April 17, 2019.With respect to plaintiff depositions: Defendants may depose 14 total plaintiffs who have not been named in the Crop Damage Master Complaint, of which three may be dismissed plaintiffs. The depositions will be limited to four hours each. Defendants have reserved the right to continue such depositions for cause in the event class certification is denied.Defendant depositions: The Court sees the need to set presumptive limits on depositions of defendant fact witnesses. The plaintiffs will be limited to 140 hours of total deposition time for Monsanto witnesses and 70 hours of deposition time for BASF witnesses. The seven-hour limit per deposition set forth in Rule 30 remains in place for any given witness, subject to leave for extensions granted by the Special Master. In addition, these presumptive limits may be addressed and subject to change by the Court at the next status conference. Response to Court due by 4/17/2019.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/12/19. (MRS)
April 12, 2019 Filing 364 ROLE OF ATTORNEYS PARTICIPATING IN HEARING re 363 Status Conference,,. (MRS)
April 12, 2019 Filing 363 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: Status Conference held on 4/12/2019. Deposition and discovery issues discussed. Expedited briefing schedules established. Presumptive limit of depositions taken under advisement. Next status conference set for June 27, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Courtroom 4B. (Court Reporter:Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832) (proceedings started: 10:35) (proceedings ended: 12:17)(Deputy Clerk: M. Schaefer)(Appearance for Plaintiff: See Supplement)(Appearance for Defendant: See Supplement) (MRS)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Docket Text ORDER: At the request of the parties, the status conference set on 4/12/19 will be reset to 10:30am in the Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Those attending by telephone should advise chambers by emailing michelle_schaefer@moed.uscourts.gov. You may access the conference call with the following information: USA Toll Free Number: 866-434-5269 Access Code: 2082948. in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Those attending by telephone should advise chambers by emailing michelle_schaefer@moed.uscourts.gov. You may access the conference call with the following information: USA Toll Free Number: 866-434-5269 Access Code: 2082948. [Status Conference reset for 4/12/2019 10:30 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.]. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/11/19. (MRS)
April 7, 2019 Filing 361 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Steve Brunt: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Bilsborrow, James)
April 5, 2019 Filing 360 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chris Oakes Farm, Chris Oakes Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
April 4, 2019 Filing 359 NOTICE of Videotaped Depositions to Defendant Monsanto Company: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of John Hemminghaus, #2 Attachment Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of John Chambers, #3 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Alison McInnes, #4 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Miriam Paris, #5 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Boyd Carey)(Bilsborrow, James)
April 4, 2019 Filing 358 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Joseph F. Guenthner, Ph.D.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
April 3, 2019 Filing 357 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Stevan Knezevic, Ph.D.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #355 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony W. Finnell, Jr.. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7127095) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing from MN and IL)(Finnell, Anthony) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/3/19. (MRS)
April 2, 2019 Filing 355 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony W. Finnell, Jr.. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7127095) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from MN and IL)(Finnell, Anthony)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #352 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Hart Robinovitch to Executive Committee (Unopposed) and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Hart L. Robinovitch, # 2 Exhibit A: Firm Resume)(Downing, Don) filed by Crop Damage Master Complaint ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/1/19. (MRS)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #350 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily R. Bodtke. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7119866) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Emily R. Bodtke)(Bodtke, Emily) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/1/19. (MRS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 352 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Hart Robinovitch to Executive Committee (Unopposed) and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Hart L. Robinovitch, #2 Exhibit A: Firm Resume)(Downing, Don)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #348 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Foresman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7118132) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Foresman, Adam) filed by BASF Corporation, #349 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Martin Demoret. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7118228) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Demoret, Martin) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/29/19. (MRS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 350 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily R. Bodtke. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7119866) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Emily R. Bodtke)(Bodtke, Emily)
March 28, 2019 Filing 349 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Martin Demoret. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7118228) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Demoret, Martin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 348 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Foresman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7118132) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Foresman, Adam)
March 28, 2019 Filing 347 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph M. Kellmeyer for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Kellmeyer, Joseph)
March 26, 2019 Filing 346 NOTICE Second Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Kim Magin: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Bilsborrow, James)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Docket Text ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/12/2019 10:00 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Those attending by telephone should advise chambers by emailing michelle_schaefer@moed.uscourts.gov. You may access the conference call with the following information: USA Toll Free Number: 866-434-5269 Access Code: 2082948. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/21/19. (MRS)
March 20, 2019 Filing 344 NOTICE of Filing Affidavits of Service: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rain and Hail, LLC, #2 Affidavit Farm First Crop Insurance LLC)(Bousquet, Kimberly)
March 19, 2019 Filing 343 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Shane Greckel: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
March 15, 2019 Filing 342 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Ford L. Baldwin, Ph.D.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER..In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered today, the Master Antitrust Class Action Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/13/19. (MRS)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Monsanto's motion to dismiss (#149) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' complaint will be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/13/19. (MRS)
March 12, 2019 Filing 339 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objections to Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Muskrat Flats, LLC Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6): by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #337 Notice (Other), (Downing, Don)
March 12, 2019 Filing 338 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Filing Objections to Monsanto Company's Notices of Videotaped Depositions of Ford L. Baldwin, Ph.D., Charles D. Cowan, Ph.D., Bruce A. Babcock, Ph.D. and Stevan Knezevic, Ph.D.: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #333 Notice (Other), #328 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiffs' Objections to Monsanto's Notice of Depo of Ford Baldwin, #2 Attachment Plaintiffs' Objections to Monsanto's Notice of Depo of Charles Cowan, #3 Attachment Plaintiffs' Objections to Monsanto's Notice of Depo of Bruce Babcock, #4 Attachment Plaintiffs' Objections to Monsanto's Notice of Depo of Stevan Knezevic)(Downing, Don)
March 12, 2019 Filing 337 NOTICE of Filing Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Rus Lanpher, #2 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of Muskrat Flats, LLC)(Bousquet, Kimberly)
March 11, 2019 Filing 336 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Kay Don Jons: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
March 8, 2019 Filing 335 Monsanto Company's ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint,, by Monsanto Company.(Hohn, Christopher)
March 8, 2019 Filing 334 ENTRY of Appearance by Sharon B. Rosenberg for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Rosenberg, Sharon)
March 8, 2019 Filing 333 NOTICE of Filing Notices of Videotaped Depositions: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Bruce A. Babcock, Ph.D., #2 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Charles D. Cowan, Ph.D., #3 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Stevan Knezevic, Ph.D.)(Bousquet, Kimberly)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that plaintiffs' motion for leave to enter coordination order and modification of protective order (#218) and defendant Monsanto's motion for entry of coordination order (#274) are referred to Special Master John Hahn to resolve the differences between the parties or to issue a report and recommendation to the Court. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/8/2019. (JMC)
March 8, 2019 Filing 331 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint,, by BASF Corporation.(Mandler, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 330 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Kay Don Jons: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
March 6, 2019 Filing 329 NOTICE Videotaped Deposition of Dennis Gardisser: by Defendant BASF Corporation (Mandler, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 328 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Ford L. Baldwin, Ph.D.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
March 6, 2019 Filing 327 NOTICE of Videotaped Depositions of Monsanto Company: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of John Chambers, #2 Exhibit Amended Notice of Deposition of Kim Magin, #3 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Ryan Rubischko, #4 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Lisa Safarian, #5 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of John Hemminghaus)(Bilsborrow, James)
March 5, 2019 Filing 326 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Filing Objections to Amended Notices of Videotaped Depositions of Earl H. Wildy, Inc., Wildy Farms East, LLC, Wildy Farms North, Inc., Wildy Farms South, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6): by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #323 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Attachment Earl Wildy Objection to Doc. 323, #2 Attachment Wildy Farms East Objection to Doc. 323-2, #3 Attachment Wildy Farms North Objection to Doc. 323-3, #4 Attachment Wildy Farms South Objection to Doc. 323-4)(Downing, Don)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER..In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered today, the complaint of plaintiff Bart Coker is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/1/19. (MRS)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that W. Bryan Smith, Rene Rocha, III, and Morgan and Morgan Complex Litigation Group are WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for plaintiff Bart Coker, whose contact information is 801 Polly Walker Rd., Ripley, TN 38063, (731) 413-7309, and buckcoker110112@gmail.com.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss (#28) is granted. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/1/19. (MRS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 323 NOTICE of AMENDED Notice of Deposition of Earl H. Wildy, Inc.: by Defendant BASF Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment AMENDED Notice of Deposition of Justin Wildy, #2 Attachment AMENDED Notice of Deposition of Wildy Farms East, LLC, #3 Attachment AMENDED Notice of Deposition of Wildy Farms North, Inc., #4 Attachment AMENDED Notice of Deposition of Wildy Farms South, Inc.)(Mandler, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 322 NOTICE of deposition of Wildy Farms South, Inc.: by Defendant BASF Corporation (Mandler, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 321 NOTICE of deposition of Wildy Farms North, Inc.: by Defendant BASF Corporation (Mandler, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 320 NOTICE of deposition of Wildy Farms East, LLC: by Defendant BASF Corporation (Mandler, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 319 NOTICE of deposition of Justin Wildy: by Defendant BASF Corporation (Mandler, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 318 NOTICE of deposition of Earl H. Wildy, Inc.: by Defendant BASF Corporation (Mandler, John)
February 26, 2019 Filing 317 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Kim Magin: by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Jed R. Claassen, Earl H Wildy Inc, Jerry Franks, Shane Greckel, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Rus Lanpher, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Chris Oakes, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc (Bilsborrow, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 316 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objections to Second Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of 4-R Farms, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6): by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #314 Notice (Other) (Downing, Don)
February 26, 2019 Filing 315 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objections to Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Tipton Brothers Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6): by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #313 Notice (Other) (Downing, Don)
February 26, 2019 Filing 314 NOTICE of Second Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of 4-R Farms, Inc.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
February 21, 2019 Filing 313 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of Tipton Brothers: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Re: #306 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #137 Amended Complaint,, for the reasons stated in plaintiff's response in opposition and allowing defendants until March 8, 2019 by which to file answers to the Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/20/19. (MRS)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER re #294 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Cow-Mil Farms, Inc. SO ORDERED, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc. terminated.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/20/19. (MRS)
February 19, 2019 Filing 310 TRANSCRIPT of #158 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on September 7, 2018 before Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2019. (JMC)
February 18, 2019 Filing 309 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objections to Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Scallion Farms Partnership Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6): by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #305 Notice (Other), (Notice of Deposition at 305-2) (Downing, Don)
February 18, 2019 Filing 308 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objections to Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6): by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #305 Notice (Other), (Notice of Deposition at 305-1) (Downing, Don)
February 18, 2019 Filing 307 RESPONSE in Opposition re #306 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #137 Amended Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint. (Downing, Don)
February 15, 2019 Filing 306 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #137 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Filing 305 NOTICE of Filing Notices of Videotaped Deposition: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, #2 Attachment Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of Scallion Farms Partnership)(Bousquet, Kimberly)
February 12, 2019 Filing 304 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff, Jerry Franks: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
February 8, 2019 Filing 303 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objections to Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of 4-R Farms, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6): by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #301 Notice (Other) (Downing, Don)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #146 MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint filed by Defendant Monsanto Company, #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Monsanto's motion to dismiss (#146) and defendant BASF's motion to dismiss (#147) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count 1's nationwide class action claims against defendant BASF are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Strict Liability - Ultrahazardous Activity Counts (Counts 2, 14, 25, 37, 50, 60, 71, and 84) are DISMISSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Trespass Counts (Counts 12, 21, 34, 49, 57, 67, 81, 93) are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Nuisance Counts (Counts 22, 35, 41, 68, and 82) are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss plaintiffs' Conspiracy Counts is DENIED in part as those Counts relate to underlying intentional torts, and this Court withholds ruling on the Conspiracy Counts based on underlying negligence claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Failure to Warn Counts regarding labeling are dismissed only to the extent they exceed the parameters of FIFRA, as explained in the Memorandum. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Nebraska Consumer Protection Act claim (Count 69) is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Negligent Training claims are DISMISSED to the extent they do not relate to the training of defendants' employees or agents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Kansas warranty-related counts (Counts 31, 32, and 33) are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Breach of Implied Warranty Counts in Arkansas, South Dakota, and Tennessee (Counts 9, 10, 78, 79, 90, and 91) are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/6/19. (CSG)
February 5, 2019 Filing 301 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of 4-R Farms, Inc.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
February 5, 2019 Filing 300 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of Plaintiff, 4-R Farms, Inc.: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
February 4, 2019 Filing 299 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Rene Rocha and W. Bryan Smith by Plaintiff Bart Coker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MRS)
January 31, 2019 Filing 298 TRANSCRIPT of #126 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 7/20/18 before Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2019. (MRS)
January 29, 2019 Filing 297 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff, Jed Claassen: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Bousquet, Kimberly)
January 25, 2019 Filing 296 NOTICE by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #295 Notice (Other) of Plaintiffs' Objections to Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Bumper Crop Farms, LLC Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (Downing, Don)
January 24, 2019 Filing 294 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cow-Mil Farms, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02386-SNLJ(Robinovitch, Hart)
January 23, 2019 Filing 295 NOTICE of Video Depo: of Designee of Bumper Crop by Defendant Monsanto Company (MRS)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Docket Text ORDER: Court grants voluntary dismissal as clarified, Susan Heidelberger (individually and as representative of E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership), E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership and Ernest Heidelberger (individually and as representative of E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership) terminated.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/10/19. (MRS)
January 9, 2019 Filing 292 Amended NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger (Gates, Joseph)
January 4, 2019 Filing 291 ENTRY of Appearance by Booker T. Shaw for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Shaw, Booker)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Docket Text ORDER: On plaintiff Bruce Farms Partnership's notice of voluntary dismissal (#289 in 1:18md2820), plaintiff is hereby ordered to clarify within 7 days whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice in light of conflicting language within the text of the notice. Response to Court due by 1/9/2019.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/2/19. (MRS)
December 28, 2018 Filing 289 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger (Gates, Joseph)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER (re 4:18CV1849 copy filed) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to United States District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket a copy of this Order in Case No. 1:18MD2820 SNLJ for informational purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 12/27/18. (MRS)
December 19, 2018 Filing 287 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Their Notice of Intent to Add Plaintiff to Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint, and Motion for Leave to Amend Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint: by Plaintiff Crop Damage Master Complaint re #280 MOTION for Leave to Amend Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof and Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Add Plaintiff to Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint (Downing, Don)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #284 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Samuel E. Ledbetter by Plaintiffs Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Mark Lee. (Ledbetter, Samuel) filed by Mark Lee, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., #283 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm William Bond by Plaintiffs Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Mark Lee. (Bond, Thomas) filed by Mark Lee, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/17/18. (MRS)
December 14, 2018 Filing 285 RESPONSE to Motion re #280 MOTION for Leave to Amend Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof and Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Add Plaintiff to Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint Joint filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
December 14, 2018 Filing 284 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Samuel E. Ledbetter by Plaintiffs Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Mark Lee. (Ledbetter, Samuel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 283 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm William Bond by Plaintiffs Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Mark Lee. (Bond, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 ***REMARK..Plaintiff "Antitrust Master Complaint" added for docket management and includes plaintiffs Sam Branum and Wapsie Farms. (MRS)
December 13, 2018 ***REMARK..Plaintiff "Crop Damage Master Complaint" added to the case to aid in docket management. Plaintiffs included in the group are 4-R Farms, Inc. Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Claassen, Jed;Earl H. Wildy, Inc.,;Franks, Jerry;Greckel, Shane;Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Jons, Kay Don Lanpher, Rus Muskrat Flats, LLC; Oakes, Chris Scallion, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Tipton, Charles Tipton, John Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy Farms East, LLC Wildy Farms North, Inc. Wildy Farms South, Inc. (MRS)
December 12, 2018 Filing 282 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Oral Deposition of Defendant BASF Corp. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6): by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Sam Branum, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Jed R. Claassen, Earl H Wildy Inc, Jerry Franks, Shane Greckel, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Rus Lanpher, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Chris Oakes, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Wapsie Farms, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc (Downing, Don)
December 10, 2018 Filing 281 REPLY to Response to Motion re #274 MOTION for Leave to For Entry of Coordination Order filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
December 7, 2018 Filing 280 MOTION for Leave to Amend Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof and Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Add Plaintiff to Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Jed R. Claassen, Earl H Wildy Inc, Jerry Franks, Shane Greckel, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Rus Lanpher, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Chris Oakes, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc. (Downing, Don)
December 3, 2018 Filing 279 NOTICE by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Sam Branum, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Jed R. Claassen, Earl H Wildy Inc, Jerry Franks, Shane Greckel, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Rus Lanpher, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Martin Marticoff, Aaron Matthias, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Chris Oakes, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc re #218 MOTION for Leave to Enter Coordination Order and Modification of Protective Order SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN SUPPORT OF #218 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Coordination Order)(Downing, Don)
December 3, 2018 Filing 278 RESPONSE in Opposition re #274 MOTION for Leave to For Entry of Coordination Order filed by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Sam Branum, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Jed R. Claassen, Earl H Wildy Inc, Jerry Franks, Shane Greckel, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Rus Lanpher, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Martin Marticoff, Aaron Matthias, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Chris Oakes, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: MDL [Proposed] Coordination Order, #2 Exhibit B: McIvan Jones [Proposed] Coordination Order)(Downing, Don)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #256 ..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants BASFs and Monsantos motion to strike amended complaints (#256) is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/3/18. (MRS)
November 28, 2018 Filing 276 NOTICE (Plaintiffs' Amended) of Oral Deposition of Defendant Monsanto Co. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 30(b)(6): by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Sam Branum, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Jed R. Claassen, Earl H Wildy Inc, Jerry Franks, Shane Greckel, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Rus Lanpher, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Martin Marticoff, Aaron Matthias, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Chris Oakes, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc (Downing, Don)
November 26, 2018 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #274 MOTION for Leave to For Entry of Coordination Order filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Coordination Order, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
November 26, 2018 Filing 274 MOTION for Leave to For Entry of Coordination Order by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Docket Text ORDER: The Status Conference set for 11/30/18 is cancelled.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/26/18. (MRS)
November 21, 2018 Filing 272 LIMITED RESPONSE TO SURREPLY to Motion re #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (MRS) Modified on 11/26/2018 (MRS).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #269 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Lisa DeBord by Defendant Monsanto Company. (DeBord, Lisa) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Lisa M.N. DeBord terminated.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/21/2018. (JMC)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #268 MOTION for Leave to File Limited Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Monsanto Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/21/2018. (JMC)
November 21, 2018 Filing 269 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Lisa DeBord by Defendant Monsanto Company. (DeBord, Lisa)
November 21, 2018 Filing 268 MOTION for Leave to File Limited Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Monsanto Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
November 21, 2018 Filing 267 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply to Motion re #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (MRS)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #263 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - BASF Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply)(Mandler, John) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/20/18. (MRS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 263 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BASF Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply)(Mandler, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 266 SURREPLY to Motion re #149 MOTION to Dismiss #138 :Plaintiffs' Master Antitrust Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Flamm Orchards, Inc., Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn, Defendant Monsanto Company. (MRS) Modified on 11/21/2018 (MRS).
November 15, 2018 Filing 265 SURREPLY to Motion re #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Flamm Orchards, Inc., Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn, Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (MRS)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #261 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Request for Oral Argument by Plaintiffs ORDERED GRANTED IN PART. LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IS GRANTED; REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT IS DENIED AT THIS TIME.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/15/18. (MRS)
November 14, 2018 Filing 261 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Request for Oral Argument by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Flamm Orchards, Inc., Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A: Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Attachment B: Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Monsanto Company's Motion to Dismiss)(Downing, Don)
November 13, 2018 Filing 260 RESPONSE in Opposition re #256 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendants E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Goerisch, C.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 259 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (256 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiffs Barham Farms, Michael Barham, Jr., Scott Mathis, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Bill Rhodes, Bart Coker, Kristy Vanalstine, C D Ellis Produce, Dwight Ellis, Greg Tillman, Tillman Farms, Joseph Billings, Brian Jossart. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ et al.(Rocha, Rene)
November 13, 2018 Filing 258 RESPONSE in Opposition re (256 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiffs Barham Farms, Michael Barham, Jr., Scott Mathis, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Bill Rhodes, Bart Coker, Kristy Vanalstine, C D Ellis Produce, Dwight Ellis, Greg Tillman, Tillman Farms, Joseph Billings, Brian Jossart. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ et al.(Rocha, Rene)
November 6, 2018 Filing 257 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #256 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendant Monsanto Company and BASF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRS)
November 6, 2018 Filing 256 JOINT MOTION to Strike Amended Complaints filed in Stayed Actions by Defendant Monsanto Company and BASF. (MRS)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #251 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for its Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Master Antitrust Complaint (Unopposed) by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Rosenthal, John) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/6/18. (MRS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 254 REPLY to Response to Motion re #149 MOTION to Dismiss #138 :Plaintiffs' Master Antitrust Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Rosenthal, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 253 REPLY to Response to Motion re #146 MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
November 5, 2018 Filing 252 REPLY to Response to Motion re #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 251 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for its Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Master Antitrust Complaint (Unopposed) by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Rosenthal, John)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #249 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/2/18. (MRS)
November 2, 2018 Filing 249 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
October 29, 2018 Filing 248 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 239 Docket Text Order with Schedules,, by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Rosenthal, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 247 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Conforming Antitrust Claims by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
October 29, 2018 Filing 246 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re 239 Docket Text Order with Schedules,, by Defendants E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Goerisch, C.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SECOND AMENDED CROP DAMAGE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery Completion due by 3/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2020. Trial setting for August, 2020. (see order for all deadlines). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/26/18. (MRS)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #243 Consent MOTION for Leave to Extend Crop Damage CMO Deadlines by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathis, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment [Proposed] Second Amended Crop Damage Case Management Order - CLEAN, # 2 Attachment [Proposed] Second Amended Crop Damage Case Management Order - REDLINE)(Downing, Don) filed by 4-R Farms, Inc., Josh Bartlett, Bruce Farms Partnership, Mark Lee, Steven Wayne Landers, Katherine Bennett, Peyton & Mathis Farms, David Carter Farms JV, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Emil Schuchart, Ernest Heidelberger, Gregory Harris, William Matthew Dunavan, Wilson Application LLC, Michael Barham, Jr., Daniel Kabat, Deloris Irene Landers, Lance Hill, Clint Henderson, Hunter Tree Farms, Meacham Farms, Qualls Land Co., Dena Nash, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Jeremy Oakes, Vincent Farms, Bill Bader, Ronnie Bruce, Rus Lanpher, John Tipton, Forest River Farms, NJ&B Partnership, Anthony Wheat, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wimberley Farms LLC, LA Farms Incorporated, Heitmann Farms Inc., Justin Wildy, David Wildy, Amy Heidelberger Varela, David Oakes, Jill Culp, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, Karen Bruce, Bobby Cloninger, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, K D H Farms Partnership, Ronald Curtis Storey, Dwight Ellis, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, P & E Farms LLC, Cooper Family Farms, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Daniel Hill, Larry Johnson, Curtis Nash, Chris Oakes, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Oakes Farm, Claassen Farms, L & M Farm Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, Jed R. Claassen, Patty Wildly, Kristi Wildy, Marshall W. Scallion, APRIL JOHNSON, R P George, James L Hill, Kevin Whitehead, John P. Baioni Farms, Reed Storey, Susan Heidelberger, Phillip Wade Hill, Heinco Farms, Ann Schuchart, Brian Jossart, Brooke W. Scallion, Kristy Vanalstine, Gerlach Farming, John S. Hahn, T Hill Farms, Kay Don Jons, Warren Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Eddie McMullen Farms, Fran Adams, Hill Farms Partnership, HH Farm Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Speiser Farm Inc., Allen Culp, Steve Jackson, Amore Farms, Neil Culp, Charles Tipton, Storey Farming, Bethany Harris, David Carter, Caleb Bruce, Lockley Bros Farm, Kevin Gerlach, Bart Coker, Michael Baioni, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, Tipton Brothers, Vickie Jackson, Billy Childers, Lonny W Lockley, Whitehead Farms, Bader Farms, Inc., Robert Terry Farms, Robert Delaney, Gadwal Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, Curtis Heidelberger, DWK Farms LLC, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, McLemore Farms LLC, Greg Tillman, Carlos Nash, Justin Pic, Mattis Farms, PE Partners, Charles P Loeschner, Jerry Franks, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Steve Johnson, Borderline Farms JV, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Joseph Billings, William E McMullen, Watson Partners, Ronnie George, Jerry Stogsdill, B&L Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Darrow C Linn, Bill Rhodes, Brian Chastain Farms, Chris Oakes Farm, Tab Wildy, Randy Fendrick, Wildy Farms East LLC, George Watson, Morrison Partners, Lisa Marie Johnson, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, S & A Farms, Pam Culp, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., K & W Farms Partnership, LGO Farms Partnership, Paul Harris, Frederick Ainsworth, Wildy Land Company LLC, Shane Greckel, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Scott Mathis, Judy A Minton, Double A Farms, Violet Childers, Wildy Farms North Inc, Randle Foran, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Gary Gerlach, Chris Peyton, RSB Farming, JTM Farms Partnership, Brian Warren ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/26/18. AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO BE ISSUED.(MRS)
October 26, 2018 Filing 243 Consent MOTION for Leave to Extend Crop Damage CMO Deadlines by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathis, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Attachments: #1 Attachment [Proposed] Second Amended Crop Damage Case Management Order - CLEAN, #2 Attachment [Proposed] Second Amended Crop Damage Case Management Order - REDLINE)(Downing, Don)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL in case 1:18CV189SNLJ. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/23/2018. (JMC)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #210 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Smokey Alley filed by Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., Defendant E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, #211 MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints filed by Defendant Monsanto Company - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants DuPont and Monsantos motions to strike putative class claims from stayed complaints (#210, #211) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/23/2018. (JMC)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #237 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Carolyn A. Gunkel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6825322) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gunkel, Carolyn) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/19/18. (MRS)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Docket Text ORDER: Scheduling order pursuant to conference held October 19, 2018. The parties shall submit briefs by October 29, 2018 addressing the possibility of allowing stayed cases to conform to the Antitrust Master Complaint without conforming any crop damage claims to the Crop Damage Master Complaint. The next status conference will take place on November 30, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4B. Status Conference set for 11/30/2018 09:30 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/19/18. (MRS)
October 19, 2018 Filing 238 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: Status Conference held on 10/19/2018. (Court Reporter:Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 List of Attorneys involved) (MRS)
October 19, 2018 Filing 237 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Carolyn A. Gunkel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6825322) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gunkel, Carolyn)
October 17, 2018 Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re (10 in 4:18-cv-00533-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints, (20 in 4:18-cv-00181-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints, (75 in 4:17-cv-02418-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints, (79 in 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints, (67 in 1:17-cv-00020-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints, (55 in 1:18-cv-00028-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints, (211 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints, (101 in 4:17-cv-02031-SNLJ) MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints filed by Defendants Monsanto Company, Monsanto Company, Monsanto Company, Monsanto Company, Monsanto Company, Monsanto Company, Monsanto Company, Monsanto Company. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ et al.(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
October 17, 2018 Filing 235 REPLY IN SUPPORT re #210 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Smokey Alley filed by Defendants E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Goerisch, C.) Modified on 10/17/2018 (MRS).
October 17, 2018 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #218 MOTION for Leave to Enter Coordination Order and Modification of Protective Order filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Monsanto's Proposed Coordination Order, #2 Exhibit B- Plaintiffs' Proposed Coordination Order Filed in McIvan Jones)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
October 17, 2018 Filing 233 MOTION for Leave to Extend Crop Damage CMO Deadlines Due To Monsanto's Delay In Producing Documents by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Downing, Don)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #231 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shane A. Anderson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6818784) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, Shane) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/17/18. (MRS)
October 16, 2018 Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shane A. Anderson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6818784) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, Shane)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Docket Text ORDER: The October 19, 2018 status conference will be held at 9:30 a.m. in Cape Girardeau, Courtroom 4B. Those attending by telephone should advise the Court by emailing michelle_schaefer@moed.uscourts.gov. You may access the conference call with the following information: USA Toll Free Number: 866-434-5269 Access Code: 2082948. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/16/18. (MRS)
October 15, 2018 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #146 MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint filed by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Downing, Don)
October 15, 2018 Filing 228 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Downing, Don)
October 15, 2018 Filing 227 REPORT TO COURT ORDER re (208 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) Docket Text Order with Schedules, (43 in 4:17-cv-02386-SNLJ) Docket Text Order, by Plaintiff Cow-Mil Farms, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02386-SNLJ(Zimmerman, Charles)
October 15, 2018 Filing 226 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Dismiss #138 :Plaintiffs' Master Antitrust Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Sam Branum, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Martin Marticoff and Aaron Matthias, (Downing, Don) Modified on 10/15/2018 (MRS).
October 15, 2018 Filing 225 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kay Don Jons. BASF Corporation served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Downing, Don)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #222 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation For Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Downing, Don) filed by 4-R Farms, Inc., Josh Bartlett, Bruce Farms Partnership, Mark Lee, Steven Wayne Landers, Katherine Bennett, Peyton & Mathis Farms, David Carter Farms JV, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Emil Schuchart, Sam Branum, Ernest Heidelberger, Gregory Harris, William Matthew Dunavan, Wilson Application LLC, Michael Barham, Jr., Kurt Leistikow, Daniel Kabat, Deloris Irene Landers, Lance Hill, Clint Henderson, Hunter Tree Farms, Meacham Farms, Qualls Land Co., Dena Nash, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Jeremy Oakes, Vincent Farms, Bill Bader, Aaron Matthias, Ronnie Bruce, Rus Lanpher, John Tipton, Forest River Farms, NJ&B Partnership, Anthony Wheat, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wimberley Farms LLC, LA Farms Incorporated, Heitmann Farms Inc., Justin Wildy, Martin Marticoff, David Wildy, Amy Heidelberger Varela, David Oakes, Jill Culp, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, Karen Bruce, Bobby Cloninger, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, K D H Farms Partnership, Ronald Curtis Storey, Dwight Ellis, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, P & E Farms LLC, Cooper Family Farms, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Daniel Hill, Larry Johnson, Curtis Nash, Chris Oakes, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Oakes Farm, Claassen Farms, L & M Farm Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, Jed R. Claassen, Patty Wildly, Kristi Wildy, Marshall W. Scallion, APRIL JOHNSON, R P George, James L Hill, Kevin Whitehead, John P. Baioni Farms, Reed Storey, Susan Heidelberger, Phillip Wade Hill, Heinco Farms, Ann Schuchart, Brian Jossart, Brooke W. Scallion, Kristy Vanalstine, Gerlach Farming, John S. Hahn, T Hill Farms, Kay Don Jons, Warren Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Eddie McMullen Farms, Fran Adams, Hill Farms Partnership, HH Farm Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Speiser Farm Inc., Allen Culp, Steve Jackson, Amore Farms, Neil Culp, Charles Tipton, Storey Farming, Bethany Harris, David Carter, Caleb Bruce, Lockley Bros Farm, Kevin Gerlach, Bart Coker, Kevin Leistikow, Michael Baioni, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, Tipton Brothers, Vickie Jackson, Billy Childers, Lonny W Lockley, Whitehead Farms, Bader Farms, Inc., Robert Terry Farms, Robert Delaney, Gadwal Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, Curtis Heidelberger, DWK Farms LLC, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, McLemore Farms LLC, Greg Tillman, Carlos Nash, Justin Pic, Mattis Farms, PE Partners, Charles P Loeschner, Jerry Franks, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Steve Johnson, Borderline Farms JV, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Joseph Billings, William E McMullen, Watson Partners, Ronnie George, Jerry Stogsdill, B&L Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Darrow C Linn, Bill Rhodes, Brian Chastain Farms, Chris Oakes Farm, Tab Wildy, Randy Fendrick, Wildy Farms East LLC, George Watson, Morrison Partners, Lisa Marie Johnson, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, S & A Farms, Pam Culp, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., K & W Farms Partnership, LGO Farms Partnership, Paul Harris, Frederick Ainsworth, Wildy Land Company LLC, Shane Greckel, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Scott Mathis, Judy A Minton, Double A Farms, Violet Childers, Wildy Farms North Inc, Randle Foran, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Gary Gerlach, Wapsie Farms, Chris Peyton, RSB Farming, JTM Farms Partnership, Brian Warren ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/12/2018. (JMC)
October 12, 2018 Filing 223 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kay Don Jons. BASF Corporation served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Downing, Don)
October 11, 2018 Filing 222 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation For Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Downing, Don)
October 11, 2018 Filing 221 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #210 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Smokey Alley filed by Plaintiffs Amore Farms, Michael Baioni, Buckskin Farms, Cooper Family Farms, Robert Delaney, Randy Fendrick, HH Farm Partnership, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Hunter Tree Farms, JTM Farms Partnership, John P. Baioni Farms, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, LGO Farms Partnership, Mattis Farms, McLemore Farms LLC, Morrison Partners, PE Partners, Qualls Land Co., Robert Terry Farms, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Vincent Farms. (Lesko, Paul)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Docket Text ORDER: Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice re: Bruce Farms, et al v. Monsanto, et al. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/11/18. (MRS)
October 11, 2018 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #211 MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints filed by Plaintiffs Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Borderline Farms JV, Brian Chastain Farms, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Chris Oakes Farm, Claassen Farms, Cooper Family Farms, Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Randy Fendrick, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, HH Farm Partnership, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, Hunter Tree Farms, JTM Farms Partnership, John P. Baioni Farms, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, LGO Farms Partnership, Mattis Farms, McLemore Farms LLC, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., Robert Terry Farms, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, Vincent Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
October 10, 2018 Filing 218 MOTION for Leave to Enter Coordination Order and Modification of Protective Order by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Coordination Order)(Downing, Don)
October 9, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant BASF Corporation (SD and MO addresses). The summons were emailed to cfasterling@grgpc.com. (MRS)
October 9, 2018 Filing 217 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Kay Don Jons Process Server: Pro-Serve Process Servers (Downing, Don)
October 9, 2018 Filing 216 MEMORANDUM to Clerk by Plaintiff Kay Don Jons. (Attachments: #1 Summons BASF Corp Summons (SD), #2 Summons BASF Corp Summons (MO))(Downing, Don)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as to case 1:16CV299SNLJ. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/5/2018. (JMC)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to amend case management order and except case from MDL (#142) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as reflected in the Bader Amended Case Management Order filed today. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to amend case management order filed May 30, 2018 in the individual Bader case, 1:16cv299, (#136) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, although Bader will remain as part of the MDL, it will be subject to the Bader Amended Case Management Order filed today, and it is excluded from the procedures outlined in this Court's Order Allowing Master Complaints (#46) to the extent inconsistent with the Bader Amended CMO. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/5/2018. (JMC)
October 4, 2018 Filing 213 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #211 MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
October 4, 2018 Filing 212 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #210 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Smokey Alley filed by Defendants E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Goerisch, C.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 211 MOTION to Strike Putative Class Claims from Stayed Complaints by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
October 4, 2018 Filing 210 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Smokey Alley by Defendants E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Goerisch, C.)
September 28, 2018 Filing 209 NOTICE To Conform: by Plaintiff Gregory Harris re (137 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) Amended Complaint,, Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00029-SNLJ(Speer, Charles)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #172 MOTION for Extension (Unopposed) of: Time to Submit Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Plaintiff Cow-Mil Farms, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02386-SNLJ(Zimmerman, Charles) filed by Cow-Mil Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 10/15/2018.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/27/2018. (JMC)
September 26, 2018 Filing 207 NOTICE by Plaintiff William Matthew Dunavan to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 206 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Eddie McMullen Farms, William E McMullen to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 205 NOTICE by Plaintiff Waterfowl Farms Incorporated to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 204 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Phillip Wade Hill, K & W Farms Partnership to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 203 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 202 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Katherine Bennett, Robert Shaun Bennett, RSB Farming to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE by Plaintiff Reed Storey to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE by Plaintiff Phillip Joe Jackson, II to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 199 NOTICE by Plaintiff Phillip Jackson to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE by Plaintiff P & E Farms LLC to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lonny W Lockley, Lockley Bros Farm to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lance Hill, L & M Farm Partnership to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jeremy Oakes to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 192 NOTICE by Plaintiffs James L Hill, T Hill Farms to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 191 NOTICE by Plaintiffs James L Hill, Hill Farms Partnership to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 190 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Watson, Watson Partners to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 189 NOTICE by Plaintiff Gadwal Farms to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 188 NOTICE by Plaintiff DWK Farms LLC to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 187 NOTICE by Plaintiffs David Oakes Farm, David Oakes to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 186 NOTICE by Plaintiffs David Carter, David Carter Farms JV to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 185 NOTICE by Plaintiff Darrow C Linn to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 184 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Daniel Hill, K D H Farms Partnership to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE by Plaintiff D Hill & Sons Farm LLC to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE by Plaintiffs C & A Heidelberger Farms, Curtis Heidelberger, Amy Heidelberger Varela to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 181 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 180 NOTICE by Plaintiff Charles P Loeschner to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE by Plaintiff Carlos Nash to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 178 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Bobby Cloninger Farms, Bobby Cloninger to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Billy Childers, Billy Childers, Violet Childers, Violet Childers to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE by Plaintiffs APRIL JOHNSON, Larry Johnson, S & A Farms to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ(Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Caleb Bruce, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, LA Farms Incorporated, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash (Gates, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE by Plaintiffs David Wildy Farms Partnership, Bethany Harris, Paul Harris, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00188-SNLJ(Downing, Don)
September 26, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE by Plaintiff Wildy Land Company LLC to Conform to Master Complaint(s) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00188-SNLJ(Downing, Don)
September 26, 2018 Filing 172 MOTION for Extension (Unopposed) of: Time to Submit Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Plaintiff Cow-Mil Farms, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02386-SNLJ(Zimmerman, Charles)
September 26, 2018 Filing 171 NOTICE by Plaintiff Cow-Mil Farms, Inc. to Conform Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02386-SNLJ(Zimmerman, Charles)
September 26, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE by Plaintiff Mark Lee to Conform Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02386-SNLJ(Zimmerman, Charles)
September 26, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart to Conform Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:17-cv-00020-SNLJ(Randles, Beverly)
September 26, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers to Conform Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:17-cv-00020-SNLJ(Randles, Beverly)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #166 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Michael J. Sudekum by Plaintiff Bumper Crop Farms, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00200-SNLJ(Sudekum, Michael) filed by Bumper Crop Farms, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/21/18. (MRS)
September 20, 2018 Filing 166 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Michael J. Sudekum by Plaintiff Bumper Crop Farms, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:18-cv-00200-SNLJ(Sudekum, Michael)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #164 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #146 MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint, #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6), #149 MOTION to Dismiss #138 :Plaintiffs' Master Antitrust Class Action Complaint ORDERED GRANTED Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/18/18. (MRS)
September 18, 2018 Filing 164 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #146 MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint, #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6), #149 MOTION to Dismiss #138 :Plaintiffs' Master Antitrust Class Action Complaint by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Paul, Richard)
September 13, 2018 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re (153 in 1:16-cv-00299-SNLJ, 142 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) MOTION to Amend/Correct CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND EXCEPT CASE FROM MDL filed by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:16-cv-00299-SNLJ(Randles, Beverly)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #161 Consent MOTION for Leave to Approve Amended Form of Notice to Conform to Master Complaint(s) by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Downing, Don) filed by 4-R Farms, Inc., Josh Bartlett, Bruce Farms Partnership, Mark Lee, Steven Wayne Landers, Katherine Bennett, Peyton & Mathis Farms, David Carter Farms JV, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Emil Schuchart, Sam Branum, Ernest Heidelberger, Gregory Harris, William Matthew Dunavan, Wilson Application LLC, Michael Barham, Jr., Kurt Leistikow, Daniel Kabat, Deloris Irene Landers, Lance Hill, Clint Henderson, Hunter Tree Farms, Meacham Farms, Qualls Land Co., Dena Nash, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Jeremy Oakes, Vincent Farms, Bill Bader, Aaron Matthias, Ronnie Bruce, Rus Lanpher, John Tipton, Forest River Farms, NJ&B Partnership, Anthony Wheat, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wimberley Farms LLC, LA Farms Incorporated, Heitmann Farms Inc., Justin Wildy, Martin Marticoff, David Wildy, Amy Heidelberger Varela, David Oakes, Jill Culp, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, Karen Bruce, Bobby Cloninger, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, K D H Farms Partnership, Ronald Curtis Storey, Dwight Ellis, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, P & E Farms LLC, Cooper Family Farms, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Daniel Hill, Larry Johnson, Curtis Nash, Chris Oakes, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Oakes Farm, Claassen Farms, L & M Farm Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, Jed R. Claassen, Patty Wildly, Kristi Wildy, Marshall W. Scallion, APRIL JOHNSON, R P George, James L Hill, Kevin Whitehead, John P. Baioni Farms, Reed Storey, Susan Heidelberger, Phillip Wade Hill, Heinco Farms, Ann Schuchart, Brian Jossart, Brooke W. Scallion, Kristy Vanalstine, Gerlach Farming, T Hill Farms, Kay Don Jons, Warren Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Eddie McMullen Farms, Fran Adams, Hill Farms Partnership, HH Farm Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Speiser Farm Inc., Allen Culp, Steve Jackson, Amore Farms, Neil Culp, Charles Tipton, Storey Farming, Bethany Harris, David Carter, Caleb Bruce, Lockley Bros Farm, Kevin Gerlach, Bart Coker, Kevin Leistikow, Michael Baioni, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, Tipton Brothers, Vickie Jackson, Lonny W Lockley, Whitehead Farms, Bader Farms, Inc., Robert Terry Farms, Robert Delaney, Gadwal Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, Curtis Heidelberger, DWK Farms LLC, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, McLemore Farms LLC, Greg Tillman, Carlos Nash, Justin Pic, Mattis Farms, PE Partners, Charles P Loeschner, Jerry Franks, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Steve Johnson, Borderline Farms JV, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Joseph Billings, William E McMullen, Watson Partners, Ronnie George, Jerry Stogsdill, B&L Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Darrow C Linn, Bill Rhodes, Brian Chastain Farms, Chris Oakes Farm, Tab Wildy, Randy Fendrick, Wildy Farms East LLC, George Watson, Morrison Partners, Lisa Marie Johnson, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, S & A Farms, Pam Culp, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., K & W Farms Partnership, LGO Farms Partnership, Paul Harris, Frederick Ainsworth, Wildy Land Company LLC, Shane Greckel, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Scott Mathis, Judy A Minton, Double A Farms, Wildy Farms North Inc, Randle Foran, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Gary Gerlach, Wapsie Farms, Chris Peyton, RSB Farming, JTM Farms Partnership, Brian Warren ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/13/18. (MRS)
September 12, 2018 Filing 161 Consent MOTION for Leave to Approve Amended Form of Notice to Conform to Master Complaint(s) by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Downing, Don)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #141 Motion for Leave to conform to master complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file an amended Notice to Conform in accordance with this Memorandum and Order by September 12, 2018.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that unnamed plaintiffs shall have until September 26, 2018, by which to file a notice of dismissal or a Notice to Conform in accordance with the CMO in this case. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/10/18. (MRS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 159 RESPONSE to Motion re #142 MOTION to Amend/Correct CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND EXCEPT CASE FROM MDL filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: Status Conference held on 9/7/2018. (Court Reporter:Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 Atttorney List) (MRS) (Main Document 158 replaced on 9/10/2018) (MRS).
September 7, 2018 Filing 157 ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa M.N. DeBord for Defendant Monsanto Company. (DeBord, Lisa)
September 7, 2018 Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT of #38 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 4/18/18 before Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2018. (MRS)
September 6, 2018 Filing 155 RESPONSE to Motion re #142 MOTION to Amend/Correct CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND EXCEPT CASE FROM MDL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Docket Text ORDER: The September 7, 2018 status conference will be held at 9:30 a.m. in Cape Girardeau, Courtroom 4B. Those attending by telephone should advise chambers by emailing amy_trueblood@moed.uscourts.gov. You may access the conference call with the following information: USA Toll Free Number: 866-434-5269 Access Code: 2082948.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/5/18. (MRS)
September 4, 2018 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #141 MOTION for Leave to Approve Form of Notice to Conform to Master Complaint(s) and For Reasonable Extension of Time filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hohn, Christopher)
September 4, 2018 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #141 MOTION for Leave to Approve Form of Notice to Conform to Master Complaint(s) and For Reasonable Extension of Time filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #146 MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Label)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
August 31, 2018 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #149 MOTION to Dismiss #138 :Plaintiffs' Master Antitrust Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Rosenthal, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss #138 :Plaintiffs' Master Antitrust Class Action Complaint by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Rosenthal, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mandler, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 147 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant BASF Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Crop Damage Master Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Crop Damage Class Action Master Complaint by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #141 MOTION for Leave to Approve Form of Notice to Conform to Master Complaint(s) and For Reasonable Extension of Time by Plaintiffs - Plaintiffs' motion to approve form of Notice to Conform to Master Complaint (#141) will be taken up at the September 7, 2018 hearing, and at that time the Court will determine the need for any further extension. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/31/2018. (JMC)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #143 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/31/18. (MRS)
August 31, 2018 Filing 143 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
August 31, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION to Amend/Correct CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND EXCEPT CASE FROM MDL by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:16-cv-00299-SNLJ(Randles, Beverly)
August 28, 2018 Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to Approve Form of Notice to Conform to Master Complaint(s) and For Reasonable Extension of Time by Plaintiffs 4-R Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, David Wildy Farms Partnership, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Earl H Wildy Inc, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Jerry Franks, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, Shane Greckel, HH Farm Partnership, Bethany Harris, Gregory Harris, Paul Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Lisa Marie Johnson, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Brian Jossart, Justin Wildy Farms Partnership, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Daniel Kabat, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Rus Lanpher, Mark Lee, Kevin Leistikow, Kurt Leistikow, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Martin Marticoff, Scott Mathis, Aaron Matthias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, Muskrat Flats, LLC, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Brooke W. Scallion, Marshall W. Scallion, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, The Steve Johnson Farm Joint Venture, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Patty Wildly, David Wildy, Justin Wildy, Kristi Wildy, Tab Wildy, Wildy Farms East LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms South Inc, Wildy Land Company LLC, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Downing, Don)
August 10, 2018 Filing 140 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Bumper Crop Farms, LLC v. Monsanto Company, et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:18CV01409, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18cv00200-SNLJ. (DLB)
August 10, 2018 Filing 139 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Bumper Crop Farms, LLC v. Monsanto Company, et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:18CV01409. (DLB)
August 1, 2018 Filing 138 AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER ANTITRUST CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company Jury demand, MASTER ANTITRUST CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, filed by Wapsie Farms, Sam Branum, Martin Marticoff, Kurt Leistikow, Aaron Matthias, Kevin Leistikow.(Downing, Don)
August 1, 2018 Filing 137 AMENDED COMPLAINT CROP DAMAGE CLASS ACTION MASTER COMPLAINT against defendant BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Monsanto Company Jury demand, CROP DAMAGE CLASS ACTION MASTER COMPLAINT, filed by Justin Wildy, Brooke W. Scallion, Lisa Marie Johnson, Muskrat Flats, LLC, Wildy Farms North Inc, Wildy Farms East LLC, Marshall W. Scallion, Charles Tipton, Jed R. Claassen, Shane Greckel, John Tipton, Steve Johnson, Kay Don Jons, Kristi Wildy, Earl H Wildy Inc, Jerry Franks, Rus Lanpher, Wildy Farms South Inc, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Chris Oakes, 4-R Farms, Inc..(Downing, Don)
July 31, 2018 Filing 136 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Wildy et al v. Monsanto Company et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 3:18cv0127, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00188-SNLJ, Kabat v. Monsanto Company et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:18cv01386, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00189-SNLJ, 4R Farms, Inc. v. Monsanto Company, et al, D. Kansas, Case No. 5:18cv04067, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00190-SNLJ, Scallion et al v. Monsanto Company et al, N.D. Mississippi, Case No. 3:18cv00161, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00191-SNLJ, Jons v. Monsanto Company, S.D. South Dakota, Case No. 3:18cv03010, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00192-SNLJ. (DLB)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #72 MOTION for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendant Monsanto Company motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/30/18. (MRS) Modified on 8/1/2018 (MRS).
July 27, 2018 Filing 134 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Wildy et al v. Monsanto Company et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 3:18cv0127, Kabat v. Monsanto Company et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:18cv01386, 4R Farms, Inc. v. Monsanto Company, et al, D. Kansas, Case No. 5:18cv04067, Scallion et al v. Monsanto Company et al, N.D. Mississippi, Case No. 3:18cv00161, Jons v. Monsanto Company, S.D. South Dakota, Case No. 3:18cv03010. (DLB)
July 26, 2018 Filing 133 ENTRY of Appearance by Kimberly M. Bousquet for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Bousquet, Kimberly)
July 23, 2018 Filing 132 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #69 Scheduling Order, Reply of Monsanto Company Regarding Proportionality of Plaintiffs' Request for All Draft Marketing Materials by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
July 23, 2018 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM re #69 Scheduling Order, Defendant BASF's Reply In Support of Its Proportionality Objection to the Scope of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Discovery Request for "Marketing Materials" by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP. (Mandler, John)
July 23, 2018 Filing 130 MEMORANDUM re #111 Memorandum Reply of Defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. Regarding Discovery of Marketing and Advertising Materials by Defendants E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Goerisch, C.)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (see order for complete details) Motion to Join Parties due by 12/7/2018. Discovery Completion due by 12/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2019.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/23/18. (MRS)
July 23, 2018 Filing 128 STIPULATED PROTOCOL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ESI. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/23/18. (MRS)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/7/2018 09:30 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/20/18. (MRS)
July 20, 2018 Filing 126 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: Status Conference held on 7/20/2018. (Court Reporter:Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 List of attorneys present) (MRS)
July 20, 2018 Filing 125 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Greckel v. Monsanto Company, et al, D. Nebraska, Case No. 4:18cv3095 opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18cv00180-SNLJ. (DLB)
July 20, 2018 Filing 124 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Greckel v. Monsanto Company, et al, D. Nebraska, Case No. 4:18cv3095. (DLB)
July 19, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE by Plaintiff Bumper Crop Farms, LLC of Potential Tag-Along Action (Attachments: #1 Attachment Complaint, #2 Attachment Docket Sheet)(Randles, Beverly)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER..The July 20, 2018 status conference will be held at 12:00 p.m. in Cape Girardeau, Courtroom 4A. Those attending by telephone should advise chambers by emailing bradley_craigmyle@moed.uscourts.gov. You may access the conference call with the following information: USA Toll Free Number: 866-434-5269Access Code: 2082948. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/18/18. (MRS)
July 18, 2018 Filing 121 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protocol for the Production of Documents and ESI by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Brian Jossart, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathis, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC, Special Master John S. Hahn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Downing, Don)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #119 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:16-cv-00299-SNLJ(Randles, Beverly) filed by Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/17/18. (MRS)
July 16, 2018 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:16-cv-00299-SNLJ(Randles, Beverly)
July 16, 2018 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #72 MOTION for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
July 16, 2018 Filing 117 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Marketing and Advertising Materials by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Brian Jossart, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathis, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Wapsie Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:16-cv-00299-SNLJ(Downing, Don)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Docket Text ORDER: FINDING AS MOOT Re: #61 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Entry of Proposed Case Management Order...FINDING AS MOOT #79 MOTION for Relief Motion to Prevent Plaintiffs From Voluntarily Dismissing Their Cases Without Completing the Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Crop Protection, BASF Plant Science LP, BASF SE, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/3/16. (MRS)
July 3, 2018 Filing 115 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Wapsie Farms v. Monsanto Company, N.D. Iowa, Case No. 6:18cv02039. opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18cv00162-SNLJ. (DLB)
July 3, 2018 Filing 114 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Wapsie Farms v. Monsanto Company, N.D. Iowa, Case No. 6:18cv02039. (DLB)
July 2, 2018 Filing 113 SEALED DOCUMENT re #112 Response to Court Order, Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A to Monsanto's Brief re Proportionality of Marketing Materials by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
July 2, 2018 Filing 112 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #69 Scheduling Order, Plaintiffs' Request for All Draft Marketing Materials and All Related Correspondence is Not Proportional to the Needs of the Case by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - M. Puzniak Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - A. Troupis Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to B. Randles)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 2, 2018 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM re #69 Scheduling Order, Regarding Discovery of Marketing and Advertising Materials by Defendants E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Goerisch, C.)
July 2, 2018 Filing 110 DECLARATION filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP re #107 Memorandum, of David Jensen. (Mandler, John)
July 2, 2018 Filing 109 DECLARATION filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP re #107 Memorandum, of Heidi Deja. (Mandler, John)
July 2, 2018 Filing 108 DECLARATION filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP re #107 Memorandum, of Joseph Prevete. (Mandler, John)
July 2, 2018 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM re #69 Scheduling Order, in Support of BASF's Proportionality Objection to the Scope of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Discovery Request for "Marketing Materials" by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BASF Response to Bader Farms RFP, #2 Exhibit B - 2018-01-26 Emails between BASF and Plaintiff Counsel)(Mandler, John)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 AMENDMENT TO CROP DAMAGE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Section II. A (1) is withdrawn from the order filed on June 29, 2018. It is amended as follows: II. GENERAL PROVISIONS A. Rule 502(d) Order, and Stipulation on the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information1. Liaison Counsel shall meet and confer on the form of a Rule 502(d)Order, and a Stipulation on the Production of Electronically Stored Information and shall submit joint proposed orders on or before July 13, 2018.All other matters contained in the Courts previously filed Crop Damage Case Management Order remain in full force and effect.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/2/18. (MRS)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ANTITRUST CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Join Parties due by 12/7/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/29/18. (CSG)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CROP DAMAGE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Join Parties due by 12/7/2018. Discovery Completion due by 12/31/2019. Daubert Motions due by 11/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/29/18. (CSG) Modified on 6/29/2018 (CSG).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Hearing set for 7/20/2018 12:00 PM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/29/18. (MRS)
June 28, 2018 Filing 102 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #69 Scheduling Order, by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Hohn, Christopher)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. The Court now appoints John S. Hahn, Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street, N.W., Washington, DC 20006, as Special Master for Discovery for this litigation. (see order for complete details). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/28/18. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit John S. Hahn)(MRS) (Main Document 101 replaced on 7/2/2018) (MRS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: #2 Attachment A) (MRS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: #3 Attachment B- Affidavit) (MRS).
June 26, 2018 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal filed by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (MRS)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #98 MOTION for Leave to File memorandum in excess of 20 pages by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. (MRS) filed by Bader Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/26/18. (MRS)
June 25, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File memorandum in excess of 20 pages by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. (MRS)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #94 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Sarah DeLoach by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP. (MRS) filed by BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Sarah DeLoach terminated.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/25/18. (MRS)
June 22, 2018 Filing 96 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #69 Scheduling Order, Defendants' Brief in Support of Proposed Special Master Order and Objection to Plaintiffs' Proposed Order by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order re Special Master)(Hohn, Christopher)
June 22, 2018 Filing 95 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Special Master by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Brian Jossart, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Downing, Don)
June 22, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Sarah DeLoach by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP. (MRS)
June 21, 2018 Filing 93 STATUS REPORT on Discovery Pursuant to June 1, 2018 Scheduling Order by BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Hohn, Christopher)
June 21, 2018 Filing 92 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Discovery Status by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Brian Jossart, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 1:16-cv-00299-SNLJ(Downing, Don)
June 19, 2018 Filing 91 JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Production of Crop Damage Plaintiff Fact Sheets by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Brian Jossart, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Greg Tillman, Charles Tipton, John Tipton, Tipton Brothers, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don) Modified on 6/20/2018 (MRS).
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Docket Text ORDER: Deadline extended for parties' proposed order regarding a special master to Friday, June 22, 2018. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/19/18. (MRS)
June 19, 2018 Filing 89 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #76 Report to Court Order,,,,,,,,,,, Defendant Monsanto Company's Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Antitrust CMO and Memorandum in Support of an Antitrust CMO that is Consistent with the Court's Guidance by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed CMO re Antitrust, #2 Exhibit B - Redline)(Hohn, Christopher)
June 15, 2018 Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion re #61 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Entry of Proposed Case Management Order Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Case Management Order and Submission of Updated Case Management Order filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order No. 1)(Hohn, Christopher)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Docket Text ORDER: Deadlines extended for parties' proposed order regarding a special master and for plaintiffs' response to defendants' motion regarding plaintiff fact sheets (#79) to Tuesday, June 19, 2018. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/15/18. (CSG)
June 12, 2018 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #72 MOTION for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP. (Mandler, John)
June 11, 2018 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT of #68 (SCHEDULING CONFERENCE) held on June 1, 2018 before Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Reagan Fiorino, Reagan_Fiorino@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7989. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2018. (JMC)
June 11, 2018 Filing 84 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Tipton et al v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02348, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18cv00140-SNLJ. (DLB)
June 11, 2018 Filing 83 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Tipton et al v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02348. (DLB)
June 11, 2018 Filing 82 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Barham, Jr. v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02327, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00124-SNLJ, Billings v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02328, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00125-SNLJ, Coker v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02329, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00126-SNLJ, Ellis v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02330, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00127-SNLJ, Jossart v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02331, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00128-SNLJ, Peyton et al v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02332, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00129-SNLJ, Rhodes v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02333, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00130-SNLJTillman v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02334, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00131-SNLJ, Vanalstine v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02335, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00132-SNLJ. (DLB)
June 8, 2018 Filing 81 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Brief Addressing Court's Authority to Condition Dismissal on Completion of Plaintiff Fact Sheets by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Brian Jossart, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Greg Tillman, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
June 8, 2018 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #79 MOTION for Relief Motion to Prevent Plaintiffs From Voluntarily Dismissing Their Cases Without Completing the Plaintiff Fact Sheet filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Crop Protection, BASF Plant Science LP, BASF SE, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 8, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION for Relief Motion to Prevent Plaintiffs From Voluntarily Dismissing Their Cases Without Completing the Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Crop Protection, BASF Plant Science LP, BASF SE, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 7, 2018 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #61 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Entry of Proposed Case Management Order filed by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Brian Jossart, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Greg Tillman, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Downing, Don)
June 6, 2018 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Entry of Proposed Case Management Order filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
June 6, 2018 Filing 76 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Support of Proposed Antitrust Case Management Order by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Michael Barham, Jr., Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Joseph Billings, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Bart Coker, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Dwight Ellis, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, Brian Jossart, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Scott Mathias, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Chris Peyton, Peyton & Mathis Farms, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Bill Rhodes, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Greg Tillman, Kristy Vanalstine, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Downing, Don)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #74 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: Monsanto's Interlocutory Appeal by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. (MRS) filed by Bader Farms, Inc. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/6/18. RESPONSE DUE 6/25/18(MRS)
June 6, 2018 Filing 74 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: Monsanto's Interlocutory Appeal by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. (MRS)
June 4, 2018 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #72 MOTION for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 4, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROTOCOLS FOR COMMON BENEFIT WORK AND EXPENSES AND ESTABLISHING THE COMMON BENEFIT FEE AND EXPENSE FUNDS. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/4/18. (MRS)
June 4, 2018 Filing 70 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Barham, Jr. v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02327,Billings v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02328, Coker v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02329, Ellis v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02330, Jossart v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02331, Peyton et al v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02332, Rhodes v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02333, Tillman v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02334, Vanalstine v. Monsanto Company et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:18cv02335.(DLB)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to scheduling conference held 6/1/18..Plaintiffs and defendants shall provide the Court with a status report on all discovery issues within 20 days.Plaintiffs and defendants shall submit proposed orders appointing a special master within 14 days. Response to Court due by 6/15/2018. Status Report due by 6/21/2018.. (SEE ORDER FOR ALL BRIEFING DEADLINES) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/1/18. (MRS)
June 1, 2018 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: In Court Hearing held on 6/1/2018 in St. Louis. Some parties participating by phone. Discussion held regarding briefing schedule, discovery schedule and CMO. (Court Reporter:Reagan Fiorino, Reagan_Fiorino@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7989) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 List of Attorneys) (MRS)
June 1, 2018 ***REMARK - Panel notified of remand and copies of orders forwarded to PANELMDL@jpml.uscourts.gov (MRS)
May 31, 2018 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Master Complaints filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Hohn, Christopher)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Mississippi County, Missouri. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/31/18. (MRS)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..This matter is before the Court on plaintiffs' motion to remand (#8) in McIvan Jones Farm, Inc. v. Monsanto Co., 1:18-CV-21-SNLJ (E.D. Mo.)...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to remand (#8) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/31/18. (MRS)
May 30, 2018 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM To Court Regarding Proposed Agenda Items for June 1, 2018 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
May 30, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 MOTION for Leave to Enter Order Establishing Protocols For Common Benefit Work and Expenses and Establishing The Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds filed by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: [Amended Proposed] Order Establishing Protocols for Common Benefit Work and Expenses and Establishing the Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds (Clean), #2 Exhibit 2: Redline Version of Exhibit 1)(Downing, Don)
May 30, 2018 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendants' Case Management Orders and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposed Order by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed CMO No. 1 Related to Crop Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed CMO Related to Antitrust Claims)(Hohn, Christopher)
May 30, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Entry of Proposed Case Management Order by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Case Management Order)(Downing, Don)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: The June 1, 2018 scheduling conference is reset for 9:30 a.m. in St. Louis, Chambers 3N. Those who are attending by telephone should advise chambers by emailing sandra_eastman@moed.uscourts.gov. You may access the conference call with the following information: (see order). Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2018 09:30 AM in Chambers 3N before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/29/2018. (JMC)
May 25, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Master Complaints by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re: disputed categories of discovery (see order for full details). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/23/18. (MRS)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #56 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion for Entry of Order Establishing Protocols For Common Benefit Work and Expenses and Establishing the Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don) filed by Josh Bartlett, Bruce Farms Partnership, Mark Lee, Steven Wayne Landers, Katherine Bennett, David Carter Farms JV, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Emil Schuchart, Sam Branum, Ernest Heidelberger, Gregory Harris, William Matthew Dunavan, Wilson Application LLC, Deloris Irene Landers, Lance Hill, Clint Henderson, Hunter Tree Farms, Meacham Farms, Qualls Land Co., Dena Nash, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Jeremy Oakes, Vincent Farms, Bill Bader, Ronnie Bruce, Forest River Farms, NJ&B Partnership, Anthony Wheat, Wimberley Farms LLC, LA Farms Incorporated, Heitmann Farms Inc., Amy Heidelberger Varela, David Oakes, Jill Culp, Kemp Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, Karen Bruce, Bobby Cloninger, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, K D H Farms Partnership, Ronald Curtis Storey, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, P & E Farms LLC, Cooper Family Farms, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Daniel Hill, Larry Johnson, Curtis Nash, Chris Oakes, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Oakes Farm, Claassen Farms, L & M Farm Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Jed R. Claassen, APRIL JOHNSON, R P George, James L Hill, Kevin Whitehead, John P. Baioni Farms, Reed Storey, Susan Heidelberger, Phillip Wade Hill, Heinco Farms, Ann Schuchart, Gerlach Farming, T Hill Farms, Warren Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Eddie McMullen Farms, Fran Adams, Hill Farms Partnership, HH Farm Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Allen Culp, Speiser Farm Inc., Steve Jackson, Amore Farms, Neil Culp, Storey Farming, David Carter, Caleb Bruce, Lockley Bros Farm, Kevin Gerlach, Michael Baioni, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, Vickie Jackson, Lonny W Lockley, Whitehead Farms, Bader Farms, Inc., Robert Terry Farms, Robert Delaney, Gadwal Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, Curtis Heidelberger, DWK Farms LLC, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, McLemore Farms LLC, Carlos Nash, Justin Pic, Mattis Farms, PE Partners, Charles P Loeschner, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Morris Irrevocable Trust, William E McMullen, Watson Partners, Ronnie George, Jerry Stogsdill, B&L Farms Partnership, Darrow C Linn, Brian Chastain Farms, Chris Oakes Farm, Randy Fendrick, George Watson, Morrison Partners, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, S & A Farms, Pam Culp, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., K & W Farms Partnership, LGO Farms Partnership, Frederick Ainsworth, Judy A Minton, Double A Farms, Randle Foran, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Gary Gerlach, RSB Farming, JTM Farms Partnership, Brian Warren ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/23/18. (MRS)
May 23, 2018 Filing 56 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion for Entry of Order Establishing Protocols For Common Benefit Work and Expenses and Establishing the Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
May 17, 2018 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #53 MOTION for Leave to Enter Order Establishing Protocols For Common Benefit Work and Expenses and Establishing The Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Mandler, John)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROTECTIVE ORDER re: #49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/17/18. (CSG)
May 10, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Enter Order Establishing Protocols For Common Benefit Work and Expenses and Establishing The Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Downing, Don)
May 9, 2018 Filing 52 SUBMISSION REGARDING DISPUTED CATEGORIES OF DISCOVERY by Plaintiffs (MRS)
May 9, 2018 Filing 51 REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #39 Scheduling Order,,, by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Monsanto Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hohn, Christopher)
May 9, 2018 Filing 50 REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Defendant's Brief Concerning the Proposed Protective Order by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Cox, Daniel)
May 9, 2018 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Cox, Daniel)
May 9, 2018 Filing 48 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Brief In Support Of A Proposed Protective Order by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (re: Bader) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Monsantos motion for partial summary judgment (#105) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Deny Monsantos Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as Premature or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond (#113) is DENIED AS MOOT.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/8/18. (MRS)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ALLOWING CONSOLIDATED MASTER COMPLAINTS. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/8/18. (CSG)
May 7, 2018 Filing 45 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Defendants' Memorandum to the Court Regarding Plaintiff Fact Sheets for Crop Cases by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Confidential Plaintiff Fact Sheet)(Hohn, Christopher)
May 7, 2018 Filing 44 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Crop Damage Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Downing, Don)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Docket Text ORDER: Plaintiffs and defendants are granted up to and including May 7, 2018 to file proposed plaintiffs' fact sheets and briefs, and up to and including May 9, 2018 to file proposed protective orders and briefs and proposed discovery categories and briefs.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/30/18. (MRS)
April 25, 2018 Filing 42 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Report of Meet and Confer and Supplemental Brief in Opposition to the Use of Master Complaints by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
April 25, 2018 Filing 41 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Report Regarding Status of Proposed Master Complaint For Crop Damage by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Clint E Henderson Land Company, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Forest River Farms, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Lance Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
April 20, 2018 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Sonette T. Magnus for Defendants E I DuPont De Nemours and Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., DuPont Pioneer, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., E. I. Dupont de Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ et al.(Magnus, Sonette)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling conference held this day with Court and counsel for all parties participating. The parties shall submit proposed protective orders within 14 days, proposed plaintiffs fact sheets within 12 days, and memoranda on disputed discovery categories within 14 days, all after meeting and conferring on those matters to try to achieve consensus. The parties shall report to the court on the status of plaintiffs' proposed master complaint for crop damage within seven days. Defendants' objections to plaintiffs' filing of a master complaint for antitrust violations are overruled. The next scheduling conference is set for Friday, June 1, 2018, at 10:00 a.m.. In Court Hearing set for 6/1/2018 10:00 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/18/18. (MRS)
April 18, 2018 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: In Court Hearing held on 4/18/2018. (Court Reporter:Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 List of Attys present) (MRS)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #27 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Monsanto Company's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendant Monsanto Company. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02031-SNLJ(Hohn, Christopher) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/18/18. (MRS)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFF'S LEADERSHIP COUNSEL..The Court appoints Don M. Downing of Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C. to serve as Chair of the Plaintiffs Executive Committee and Interim Class Counsel for all putative classes. In addition to Mr. Downing, the Court appoints the following attorneys to the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee: James (Jacksy) Bilsborrow (Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.) Paul Byrd (Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC),Paul A. Lesko (Peiffer Rosca Wolf Abdullah Carr & Kane, APLC),Scott E. Poynter (Poynter Law Group),Beverly T. (Bev) Randles (Randles & Splittgerber LLP),Rene F. Rocha (Morgan & Morgan)Charles S. (Bucky) Zimmerman (Zimmerman Reed LLP),Richard M. Paul, III (Paul, LLP) FURTHER..The Court appoints Don M. Downing of Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C. to serve as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS)... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/17/18. (MRS)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (1:16CV299SNLJ) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant BASFs motion to dismiss (#109) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Count VI for fraudulent concealment is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Counts I through V that seek to hold BASF liable for 2015 and 2016 damage are DISMISSED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/13/18. (MRS)
April 11, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #13 Scheduling Order (BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PROPOSED MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT) by Defendants BASF Corporation, BASF Plant Science LP. (Mandler, John)
April 11, 2018 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM re (13 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) Scheduling Order Defendant Monsanto Company's Brief in Opposition to the Use of Master Complaints by Defendant Monsanto Company. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ et al.(Hohn, Christopher)
April 11, 2018 Filing 32 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Brief of Paul LLP on Structure of Plaintiffs' Leadership by Plaintiff Forest River Farms. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Firm Resume, #3 Firm Resume, #4 Firm Resume, #5 Order)(Paul, Richard)
April 11, 2018 Filing 31 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Downing Group Brief Regarding Leadership Structure and Proposed Members by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Downing, Don)
April 11, 2018 Filing 30 REPORT TO COURT ORDER The Downing Group's Brief Regarding The Use of Master Complaints by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Justin Pic, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Downing, Don)
April 11, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM re #13 Scheduling Order Memorandum of Defendants E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. Regarding the Use of Master Complaints by Defendants E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Goerisch, C.)
April 11, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re (76 in 4:17-cv-02031-SNLJ) MOTION to Dismiss Case (DEFENDANT MONSANTO COMPANYS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02031-SNLJ(Hohn, Christopher)
April 11, 2018 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Monsanto Company's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendant Monsanto Company. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:17-cv-02031-SNLJ(Hohn, Christopher)
April 10, 2018 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashlea G. Schwarz for Plaintiff Forest River Farms. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ, 4:18-cv-00181-SNLJ(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 4, 2018 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda M. Williams for Plaintiff Forest River Farms. (Williams, Amanda)
April 4, 2018 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel E. Gustafson for Plaintiff Forest River Farms. (Gustafson, Daniel)
April 2, 2018 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard Monroe Paul, III for Plaintiff Forest River Farms. (Paul, Richard)
March 30, 2018 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Jack A. Downing for Plaintiffs Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc.. (Downing, Jack)
March 30, 2018 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Gretchen Garrison for Plaintiffs Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc.. (Garrison, Gretchen)
March 30, 2018 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaitlin A. Bridges for Plaintiffs Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc.. (Bridges, Kaitlin)
March 30, 2018 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason D. Sapp for Plaintiffs Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc.. (Sapp, Jason)
March 30, 2018 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Jack A. Downing for Plaintiff Sam Branum. (Downing, Jack)
March 30, 2018 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Gretchen Garrison for Plaintiff Sam Branum. (Garrison, Gretchen)
March 30, 2018 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaitlin A. Bridges for Plaintiff Sam Branum. (Bridges, Kaitlin)
March 30, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason D. Sapp for Plaintiff Sam Branum. (Sapp, Jason)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO REMAND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The briefing schedule on the pending motion for remand in the McIvan Jones Farms case is amended as follows: any memorandum in opposition by April 23, 2018, and any reply thereto by April 30, 2018.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/29/18. (MRS)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: In Court Hearing set for 4/18/2018 01:00 PM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/28/18. (MRS)
March 28, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: In Court Hearing held on 3/28/2018. (Court Reporter:Alison Garagnani, Alison_Garagnani@moed.uscourts.gov, 573-331-8832) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 List of Attorneys present) (MRS)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Forest River Farms v. Monsanto Company...IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket a copy of this Order in Case No. 1:18MD2820 SNLJ for informational purposes. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/27/18. (MRS)
March 23, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT TO COURT ORDER re (7 in 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ) Scheduling Order, Defendants' Preliminary Statement to the Court in Advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL - Dicamba Litigation Summary)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ et al.(Hohn, Christopher)
March 23, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Information Statement As Directed By Order Dated March 2, 2018 by Plaintiffs Fran Adams, Frederick Ainsworth, Ainsworth Farms Partnership, Amore Farms, B&L Farms Partnership, Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc., Michael Baioni, Josh Bartlett, Katherine Bennett, Bobby Cloninger Farms, Borderline Farms JV, Sam Branum, Brian Chastain Farms, Caleb Bruce, Karen Bruce, Ronnie Bruce, Bruce Farms Partnership, Buckskin Farms, Bumper Crop Farms, LLC, C & A Heidelberger Farms, David Carter, Chris Oakes Farm, Jed R. Claassen, Claassen Farms, Bobby Cloninger, Cooper Family Farms, Cow-Mil Farms, Inc., Allen Culp, Jill Culp, Neil Culp, Pam Culp, Curtis & Dena Nash JV, D Hill & Sons Farm LLC, DWK Farms LLC, David Carter Farms JV, David Oakes Farm, Robert Delaney, Double A Farms, William Matthew Dunavan, E & S Heidelberger Farms Partnership, Eddie McMullen Farms, Randy Fendrick, Foliage Off Falls LLC, Randle Foran, Gadwal Farms, R P George, Ronnie George, Gary Gerlach, Kevin Gerlach, Gerlach Farming, HH Farm Partnership, Gregory Harris, Curtis Heidelberger, Ernest Heidelberger, Susan Heidelberger, Heinco Farms, Heitmann Brothers, LLC, Heitmann Farms Inc., Clint Henderson, Henderson Land and Cattle Co, Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms, Daniel Hill, James L Hill, Phillip Wade Hill, Hill Farms Partnership, Hunter Tree Farms, APRIL JOHNSON, JTM Farms Partnership, Phillip Jackson, Phillip Joe Jackson, II, Steve Jackson, Vickie Jackson, John P. Baioni Farms, Larry Johnson, K & W Farms Partnership, K D H Farms Partnership, Kemp Farms, Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership, L & M Farm Partnership, LA Farms Incorporated, LGO Farms Partnership, Deloris Irene Landers, Steven Wayne Landers, Mark Lee, Darrow C Linn, Lonny W Lockley, Lonny W Lockley, Jr, Lockley Bros Farm, Charles P Loeschner, Mattis Farms, McIvan Jones Farms, Inc., McLemore Farms LLC, William E McMullen, Stephen Douglas Meacham, Meacham Farms, Judy A Minton, Morris Irrevocable Trust, Morrison Partners, NJ&B Partnership, Carlos Nash, Curtis Nash, Dena Nash, Chris Oakes, David Oakes, Jeremy Oakes, P & E Farms LLC, PE Partners, Qualls Land Co., RSB Farming, Robert Terry Farms, S & A Farms, Ann Schuchart, Emil Schuchart, Smokey Alley Farm Partnership, Speiser Farm Inc., Jerry Stogsdill, Reed Storey, Ronald Curtis Storey, Storey Farming, T Hill Farms, Amy Heidelberger Varela, Vincent Farms, Brian Warren, Warren Farms, Waterfowl Farms Incorporated, George Watson, Watson Partners, Anthony Wheat, Kevin Whitehead, Whitehead Farms, Wilson Application LLC, Wimberley Farms LLC. (Downing, Don)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: In response to Monsanto's Request for Clarification (#11 in 1:18cv21), the Court hereby STAYS all proceedings in all cases in this MDL pending the Initial Scheduling Conference set for March 28, 2018, excluding any filings required by this Court's March 2, 2018 Order (#7 in 1:18md2820).. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/7/18. (MRS)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Fri Mar 2 14:45:04 CST 2018 (Schaefer, Michelle)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE.. In Court Hearing set for 3/28/2018 01:00 PM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Response to Court due by 3/23/2018.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/2/18. (Attachments: #1 Member Case Summary) (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION)(MRS)
February 14, 2018 Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Foliage Off Falls LLC et al v. Monsanto Company et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 2:17cv00213, opened as EDMO Case No. 1:18-cv-00033-SNLJ. (DLB)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Wed Feb 14 16:32:25 CST 2018 (Schaefer, Michelle)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER UPON TRANSFER...This order shall govern the practice and procedure in those actions transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to their order of February 1, 2018, as well as all related actions originally filed in this Court or transferred or removed to this Court. This order shall also govern the practice and procedure in any tag-along actions transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and to any related actions subsequently filed in this Court or otherwise transferred or removed to this Court. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/14/18. (MRS)
February 14, 2018 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Foliage Off Falls LLC et al v. Monsanto Company et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 2:17cv00213. (DLB)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: 4:17CV2418 CDP. This case has common factual and legal issues with a number of cases that have recently been centralized in this district pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. The multidistrict litigation is pending before Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. and is captioned In re Dicamba Herbicides Litigation, Case No. 1:18MD2820 SNLJ. Although this case has not been made part of the MDL itself, the interests of efficiency and judicial economy favor its being handled by the same judge, so that matters may be coordinated among the similar cases to the extent appropriate. Accordingly, and with the agreement of Judge Limbaugh and Chief Judge Rodney W. Sippel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to United States District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket a copy of this Order in Case No. 1:18MD2820 SNLJ for informational purposes. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/9/2018. (CBL)
February 5, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFIED INITIAL MDL TRANSFER ORDER - regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820 by Sarah S. Vance, Chair. WHITEHEAD FARMS, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., E.D. Arkansas, C.A. No. 2:17-00168, opened as E.D. Missouri Case No. 1:18-cv-00025-SNLJ, BRUCE FARMS PARTNERSHIP, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., E.D. Arkansas, C.A. No. 3:17-00154, opened as E.D. Missouri Case No. 1:18-cv-00026-SNLJ, WARREN, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., C.A. No. 3:17-00973, S.D Illinois,, opened as E.D. Missouri Case No. 1:18-cv-00027-SNLJ, CLAASSEN, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., C.A. No. 6:17-01210, D. Kansas, opened as E.D. Missouri Case No. 1:18-cv-00028-SNLJ,HARRIS v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., W.D. Missouri,, opened as E.D. Missouri Case No. C.A. No. 3:17-05262, 1:18-cv-00029-SNLJ. (DLB)
February 1, 2018 Filing 1 INITIAL MDL TRANSFER ORDER - received from the MDL Panel establishing a multidistrict litigation in the Eastern District of Missouri: IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION and with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. for coordinated or consolidation of pretrial proceedings are Eastern District of Arkansas: WHITEHEAD FARMS, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., C.A. No. 2:17-00168, BRUCE FARMS PARTNERSHIP, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL.,C.A. No. 3:17-00154, Southern District of Illinois:WARREN, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., C.A. No. 3:17-00973, District of Kansas: CLAASSEN, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., C.A. No. 6:17-01210Eastern District of Missouri: BADER FARMS, INC., ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, C.A. No. 1:16-00299, LANDERS, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, C.A. No. 1:17-00020SMOKEY ALLEY FARM PARTNERSHIP, ET AL. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., C.A. No. 4:17-02031, COW-MIL FARMS, INC. v. MONSANTO COMPANY, C.A. No. 4:17-02386Western District of Missouri: HARRIS v. MONSANTO COMPANY, ET AL., C.A. No. 3:17-05262. Signed for the Panel: Sarah S. Vance, Chair on 02/01/18. (DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company,
Represented By: John Mann Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Doss
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: C. David Goerisch
Represented By: Amie Adelia Vague
Represented By: R. Brad Ziegler
Represented By: Sonette T. Magnus
Represented By: Amie A. Vague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: John R. Musgrave
Represented By: Daniel C. Cox
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Masson
Represented By: A. Elizabeth Blackwell
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Jan P. Miller
Represented By: Lisa M.N. DeBord
Represented By: Ann E. Sternhell-Blackwell
Represented By: Kimberly M. Bousquet
Represented By: Jan Paul Miller
Represented By: Booker T. Shaw
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Joseph M. Kellmeyer
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Charles N. Insler
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Represented By: Thomas J. Magee
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Carolyn A. Gunkel
Represented By: Shane Alan Anderson
Represented By: Sarah DeLoach
Represented By: Jason D. Stitt
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Adam R. Foresman
Represented By: Martin J. Demoret
Represented By: Emily R. Bodtke
Represented By: Anthony Wayne Finnell, Jr
Represented By: Lela M. Hollabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Represented By: John Mann Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Doss
Represented By: Richard B. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: C. David Goerisch
Represented By: Amie Adelia Vague
Represented By: R. Brad Ziegler
Represented By: Sonette T. Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Plant Science LP
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Sarah DeLoach
Represented By: Jason D. Stitt
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Crop Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shaun Bennett
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maury Farmers Cooperative
Represented By: Marc Bradley Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Delaney
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qualls Land Co.
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemp Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heitmann Farms Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Bader
Represented By: Beverly Turina Randles
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Lawrence Benjamin Mook
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattis Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Loretta Garrett Qualls Farm Partnership
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry D. and Jeff Finch Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Fendrick
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Baioni
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smokey Alley Farm Partnership
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Landers
Represented By: Beverly Turina Randles
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Represented By: Hal E. Hunter, IV
Represented By: Lawrence Benjamin Mook
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heinco Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Stogsdill
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Irene Landers
Represented By: Beverly Turina Randles
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Represented By: Hal E. Hunter, IV
Represented By: Lawrence Benjamin Mook
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amore Farms
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cow-Mil Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas William Bond
Represented By: Hart L. Robinovitch
Represented By: Alyssa J. Leary
Represented By: D. Eric Sowers
Represented By: Charles S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Samuel Edward Ledbetter
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morrison Partners
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speiser Farm Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PE Partners
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Terry Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Baioni Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McLemore Farms LLC
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Tree Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lee
Represented By: Charles S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Samuel Edward Ledbetter
Represented By: Thomas William Bond
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heitmann Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooper Family Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wimberley Farms LLC
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Schuchart
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buckskin Farms
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTM Farms Partnership
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bader Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Beverly Turina Randles
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Lawrence Benjamin Mook
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bumper Crop Farms, LLC
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Michael J. Sudekum
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LGO Farms Partnership
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HH Farm Partnership
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Schuchart
Represented By: Billy R. Randles
Represented By: Angela Marie Splittgerber
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Joe Jackson, II
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meacham Farms
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Hill
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wapsie Farms
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Ward A Rouse
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E McMullen
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lockley Bros Farm
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Gerlach
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tipton Brothers
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: W. Bryan Smith
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed Storey
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Wade Hill
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Storey Farming
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jed R. Claassen
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Cody G. Claassen
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Richard W. James
Represented By: Jerry Obe Kelly
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Dustin L. DeVaughn
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint E Henderson Land Company
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&L Farms Partnership
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry, Sr.
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy A Minton
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bruce
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildy Farms South Inc
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: W. Bryan Smith
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Kaitlin A. Bridges
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Jackson
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Jack A. Downing
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Kaitlin A. Bridges
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tipton
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: W. Bryan Smith
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie George
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry, Sr.
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis & Dena Nash JV
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildy Farms North Inc
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Jack A. Downing
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Kaitlin A. Bridges
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl H Wildy Inc
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: W. Bryan Smith
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Kaitlin A. Bridges
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Franks
Represented By: Beverly Turina Randles
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kabat
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Brandon M. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Coker
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: W. Bryan Smith
Represented By: Rene F. Rocha
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crop Damage Master Complaint
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Rene F. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Watson
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Oakes Farm
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R P George
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry, Sr.
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mathis
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: W. Bryan Smith
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA Farms Incorporated
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Joseph Reid Byrd
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Represented By: Richard Lee Quintus
Represented By: Jerry O. Kelly
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildy Farms East LLC
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Jack A. Downing
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Kaitlin A. Bridges
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antitrust Master Complaint
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing |