November 7, 2016 |
Filing
137
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [ECF No. 136 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $48 within thir ty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/7/2016. (CBL)
|
September 19, 2016 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment 80 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel 113 , second motion to compel 116 , and motion for default judgment 129 are DENIED. A separate judgment is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/19/2016. (CBL)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to summary judgment 88 is GRANTED IN PART as follows: plaintiff must file a supplemental response to the motion for summary judgment no la ter than May 13, 2016. Defendants will then have until May 27, 2016 to file a reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's remaining motions 73 , 75 , 80 , 90 , 95 , 96 , 100 , 105 are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/23/16. (EAB)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 54] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time [ECF No. 60] is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 5/11/15. (EAB)
|
April 28, 2015 |
Filing
57
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant James Hurley's motion to dismiss [ECF No. 41 ] is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant James Hurley is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/28/15. (EAB)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Marshals Service is directed to attempt to locate Dr. Kendis Archer's present work address in Gainesville, Florida, and to attempt service there. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on February 13, 2015. (MCB)
|
January 16, 2015 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall show cause, no later than February 9, 2015, why Archer should not be dismissed from this case. (See Full Order) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 01/16/2015. (CBL)
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 25 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/19/2014. (CBL)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for Corizon, Inc. shall submit the last known home addresses for defendants Roschell Davis and Kendis Archer to the Court, under seal and ex parte, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Response to Court due by 1/2/2015. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/12/14. (EAB)
|
December 9, 2014 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall reinstate Corizon Correctional Health Care as a defendant in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on defendant Corizon Correctional Health Care. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/9/2014. (CBL)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Corizon Correctional Health Care is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on defendants Roschell Davis, Kendis Arche r, Keven Bredeman, and James Hurley. The Clerk should serve defendants Davis, Archer, and Bredeman in accordance with the Courts agreement with Corizon, Inc. The Clerk should serve Hurley in accordance with the Court's agreement with the State of Missouri, Department of Corrections. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on November 4, 2014. (MCB)
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 4 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/22/2014. (CBL)
|
September 9, 2014 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $58 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an orig inal proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on September 9, 2014. (BRP)
|