Stewart v. Cabrera et al
Plaintiff: |
Wayne Stewart |
Defendant: |
Tomas Cabrera, Corizon Health Services, Tammy Anderson, Jackson Institutional Dental Services, Ernest Jackson, Robert Jarrett, William Jones and James Hurley |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00009 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Pike |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry Edward Autrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 13, 2018 |
Filing
58
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. No. 50] is DENIED without prejudice. 50 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/13/18. (CLA)
|
August 24, 2017 |
Filing
31
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc.No. 30] is DENIED without prejudice. 30 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/24/17. (CLA)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 25) is DENIED as moot. 25 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/17/17. (CLA)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing
22
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants James Hurley and William Jones in accordance with the waiver agreement this Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney Generals Office. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that because the Attorney Generals Office failed to respond to the first waiver letter issued in this action, the Clerk shall enclose with its second waiver letter, sent on behalf of MDOC defendants William Jones and James Hur ley: (1) a copy of the complaint [Doc. # 1 ]; (2) a copy of this Memorandum and Order; (3) a copy of the original waiver request sent on April 26, 2017 [Doc. # 14 ]; and (4) a copy of the April 26, 2017 Memorandum and Order [Doc. # 12 ]. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/6/17. (KJS)
|
April 4, 2017 |
Filing
8
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants Tomas Cabrera, Corizon, Inc., and Ernest Jackson. Defendants Cabrera and Corizon should be served in accordance with the Courts agreement with Corizon.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Tammy Anderson, Jackson Institutional Dental Services, Robert Jarrett, William Jones, and James Hurley are DISMISSED without prejudice.An Order of Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/5/17. (CLA)
|
March 1, 2017 |
Filing
6
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $21 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. 2 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/1/17. (CLA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?