December 3, 2013 |
Filing
241
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 228 MOTION for Relief (Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc.'s Motion for Bellwether Trial) filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. motion is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/3/13. (LGK)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
213
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.'s Motions to Exclude Testimony of Douglas Miller [Wells 134; Gray 225] and to Strike Supplemental Reports of Expert Testimony of Douglas Miller [Wells 140; Gray 261] are DENIED.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/27/13. (LGK)
|
October 1, 2012 |
Filing
99
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Interrogatories Relating to Damages and Third Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant 91 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, provide supplemental responses to Plaintiffs' Third Interrogatories Nos. 36, 37, and 42. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant s hall, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, produce the requested documents in its possession, custody or control which are responsive to Plaintiffs' Third Request for Production of Documents Nos. 58, 59, 61, and 65. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that with respect to Interrogatory Nos. 40 and 41 and Request Nos. 63 and 64, the Motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respect to the written discovery directed to FedEx Express, specifically Interrogatory Nos. 38, 39, 43 and Request Nos. 60, 62 and 66, the Motion is DENIED as moot.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/1/12. (LGK)
|
July 16, 2012 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order and to Extend Time for Completion of Discovery 74 is GRANTED. The Case Management Order is amended to provide as follows: The parties shall complete a ll discovery in this case no later than August 31, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that except as modified herein, the provisions of the Case Management Order issued April 11, 2011 [ECF No. 28}, and amended on September 28, 2011 {ECF No. 46] and November 23, 2011 [ECF No. 52] remain in full force and effect.. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 7/16/12. (LGK)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant's Assented-To Motion to Amend the Case Management Order [ECF No. 70] is GRANTED. The Case Management Order is amended as follows: 1. Plaintiffs shall make expert wi tnesses available for depositions which shall be completed no later than June 1, 2012. 2. Defendant shall disclose all expert witnesses and shall provide the reports required by Rule 26(a)(2), Fed. R. Civ. P., no later than June 1, 2012 and shall mak e expert witnesses available for depositions which shall be completed no later than July 16, 2012. 3. The parties shall make final supplemental disclosures, pursuant to Rule 26, Fed. R. Civ. P., no later than October 1, 2012. Depositions of individuals ientified in the Final Supplemental Disclosures, who had not been identifiedbefore the fact discovery deadline will be permitted and held prior to trial. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 5/1/12. (LAH)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel [ECF No. 64] is GRANTEDin part and DENIED in part. Defendant shall produce general employee benefit information for itsnon-managerial employees from 2004 to the present, to Plaintiffs.. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 2/16/2012. (RAK)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 7) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Corey Lovelace, Joe Hooker, Michael Holdenried, Ray Davis, Troy Bridger, Jim Applequist and Jeff Vandeven are DISMISSED as Plaintiffs in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count I is DISMISSED as to Plaintiffs Jonathan Thurston, Marvin Bowden, Brad Kennedy, Steven Leo Miller, Seth Borders, Dale Adams, Leo Violett d/b/a Violetts Del ivery LLC, and Alan R. Dees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count II is DISMISSED as to Plaintiffs Jonathan Thurston, Brad Kennedy, and Leo Violett d/b/a Violetts Delivery LLC.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count III is DISMISSED as to Plaintiffs JonathanThurston, Marvin Bowden, Brad Kennedy, Steven Leo Miller, Seth Borders, Dale Adams, Leo Violett d/b/a Violetts Delivery LLC, Alan R. Dees, Thomas Redel, and Paul Fickbohm. 7 Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/9/11. (CLA)
|