September 29, 2016 |
Filing
579
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Emerson Electrics Bill of Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, in accordance with the findings set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall tax the following costs against Plaintiffs and in favor of Defendant in this cause...[SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/29/2016. (NEB)
|
December 3, 2014 |
Filing
566
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requested fees set out in Plaintiffs Motion for Bill of Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part in accordance with the findings set out herein. (Doc. No. 523.) re: 523 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by ABT Systems, LLC Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/3/14. (JWJ)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing
558
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law is DENIED. (Doc. No. 530.) re: 530 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/27/14. (JWJ)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing
553
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ABTs motion for an award of prejudgment interest is GRANTED in the amount of $65,249. (Doc. No. 524.) re: 524 MOTION for Awared for Entry of Prejudgment Interest filed by ABT Systems, LLC Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/6/14. (JWJ)
|
June 2, 2014 |
Filing
552
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ABTs motion to alter or amend the judgment is DENIED. (Doc. No. 528). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/2/14. (JWJ)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
520
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for a finding that Plaintiffs engaged in inequitable conduct rendering this an exceptional case under 35 U.S.C. § 285, is DENIED. (Doc. No. 492.)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintif fs motion for a determination thatDefendants pre-lawsuit infringement was willful under 35 U.S.C. § 284 is DENIED. Doc. No. 500.)All claims and issues having been resolved, a separate Judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/13/14. (JWJ)
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
514
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for judgment as a matter of law is DENIED. 1 Doc. No. 458 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/9/2013. (RAK)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
510
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law is DENIED. (Doc. No. 458.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/30/2013. (NCL)
|
June 26, 2013 |
Filing
508
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to re-open the damages case for the purpose of correcting the infringing sales base is DENIED. (Doc. No. 471). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/26/13. (JWJ)
|
February 8, 2013 |
Filing
430
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Emerson's motion to preclude the testimony of ABT's expert John Timothy Cromley is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. (Doc. No. 333). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/8/2013. (NCL)
|
February 7, 2013 |
Filing
429
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the parties' Motions in Limine rulings are as follows Document 390 is DENIED as moot,Documents 393 &396 are DENIED, Document 398 is DENIED, Document 400 is DENIED, Document 303 is DENIED, Document 405 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART See Order for Complete details. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/7/13. (JWJ)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
426
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Emersons motion for reconsideration is DENIED. (Doc. No. 359). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/6/2013. (KSM)
|
February 4, 2013 |
Filing
415
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ABT=s motion to bifurcate is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 343). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/4/2013. (KSM)
|
January 16, 2013 |
Filing
356
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ABT's motion for summary judgment is granted on the question of whether the Accused Products infringe the Rudd Patents, but denied on the question of when Emerson became aware of the Rudd Patents. (Doc. No. 255.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Emerson's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. (Doc. No. 272.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/16/2013. (NCL)
|
December 26, 2012 |
Filing
332
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend their final infringement contentions is DENIED. (Doc. No. 325). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/26/12. (JWJ)
|
December 18, 2012 |
Filing
330
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Emersons motion to compel is DENIED in large part, and GRANTED in part to the extent set forth above. (Doc. No. 249). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/18/12. (JWJ)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing
246
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Emerson's motion to strike the late identification of Brad Townsend as a fact witness is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 243). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/21/2012. (KSM)
|
July 26, 2012 |
Filing
242
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ABT's motion to exclude the report and testimony of Emerson's expert John Vogelzang is DENIED. (Doc. No. 230). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/26/2012. (KSM)
|
June 5, 2012 |
Filing
240
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Emersons motion for leave to file its surreply and attached exhibit is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 236.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ABTs motion to exclude three new prior art references relied upon by Emersons technical expert is DENIED. (Doc. No. 229.) Signed by Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/5/12. (JWJ)
|