December 2, 2014 |
Filing
312
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Slay, Battle-Turner, Gray, Lee and Irwin's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 200] An appropriate partial judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/2/2014. (MRC)
|
November 18, 2014 |
Filing
264
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - {see Order for complete details}....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Carr's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and DENIED in part as moot: [Doc. 196]....IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that defendant Sharp's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and DENIED in part as moot: [Doc. 193]...An appropriate partial judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/18/2014. (MRC)
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing
206
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motions in limine to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs expert witness Dr. Angela Wingo, Ph.D., are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. [Docs. 154, 156 and 159] in Jones v. Slay, 4:12-CV-2109 CAS; [Docs. 86, 88] in Holmes v. Slay, 4:12-CV-2333 HEA; and [Docs. 54, 56] in Cox v. Slay, 4:13-CV-427 CAS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pretrial consolidation of these actions is now terminated. All future filings shall bear t he appropriate individual case caption and be filed in the separate case to which they pertain. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall docket this Order in Jones v. Slay, 4:12-CV-2109 CAS; Holmes v. Slay, 4:12-CV-2333 HEA; and Cox v. Slay, 4:13-CV-427 CAS.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/20/14. (JWJ)
|
November 7, 2013 |
Filing
96
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Slay, Battle-Turner, Gray, Lee and Irwin's Motion to Dismiss Counts V, VI and VII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED, and Counts V, VI and VII will be DISMISSED as to these defendants. [Doc. 69] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Sharp's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. [Doc. 64] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Carr's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. [Doc. 72] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat defendant Sharp shall file his Answer to Counts I and VII of the Amended Complaint within the time permitted by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Rule 12(a)(4)(A), Fed. R. Civ. P. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Carr shall file his Answer to the Amended Complaint within the time permitted by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Rule 12(a)(4)(A), Fed. R. Civ. P. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/7/2013. (NCL)
|
April 24, 2013 |
Filing
63
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will conduct a hearing on the parties' Joint Motion to Consolidate for Pre-Trial Purposes on Tuesday, April 30, 2013, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3-North. All cou nsel in the three cases shall appear at the hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer to prepare a joint proposed global scheduling order for management of pretrial discovery and initial motions in the proposed cons olidated cases, and file it in this case no later than 12:00 noon on Monday, April 29, 2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3N before District Judge Charles A. Shaw. Response to Court due by 4/29/2013. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/24/2013. (NCL)
|
April 16, 2013 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Carr's Motion to Set Aside Default is GRANTED. [Doc. 47] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Carr shall file his Answer or other response to the Amended Complaint within the time allowed by Rule 15(a)(3), Fed. R. Civ. P. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Carr shall file any response to the pending, unopposed Joint Motion to Consolidate for Pre-Trial Purposes (Doc. 42) by April 19, 2013. (Response to Court due by 4/19/2013.) Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/16/2013. (NCL)
|