Wilson v. Bullock
Plaintiff: |
Joseph T. Wilson, Sr. |
Defendant: |
Dan Bullock, Dennis Smith and Hardy White |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv01800 |
Filed: |
October 22, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Francois |
Presiding Judge: |
Catherine D. Perry |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 3, 2015 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue in this action, because plaintiff's allegations are legally frivolous and fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/3/2015. (CBL)
|
May 27, 2015 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay the entire $16.54 initial partial filing fee on or before June 5, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the case will be dismissed, without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/27/2015. (CBL)
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. No. 6 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $16.54 within t hirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Memorandum and Order, the Court may dismiss this action without further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel [Doc. No. 7 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/19/2014.(CBL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?