Jiang v. Porter et al

Plaintiff: Xiu Hui "Joseph" Jiang
Defendant: Tonya Levette Porter, Jaimie D. Pitterle, City of St. Louis Missouri, A. M., N. M., Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests, Inc., David Clohessy and Barbara Dorris
Case Number: 4:2015cv01008
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that consistent with the terms of this Order, plaintiff Rev. Xiu Hui "Joseph" Jiang's First Amended Motion To Amend Complaint to Add Parties, or in the Alternative, Voluntarily D ismiss the Matter to Refile at a Later Date is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's request to voluntarily dismiss this case without prejudice is GRANTED. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. [Doc. 259] IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that plaintiff Rev. Xiu Hui "Joseph" Jiang's Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Parties and defendants Tonya Porter and Jaimie Pitterle's Motion to Compel Discovery are DENIED as moot. [Docs. 256 and 258]. An appropriate Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/21/2017. (MRC)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant N.M. for reconsideration [Doc. # 218 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/3/2017. (CLO)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's fee application [Doc. # 179 ] is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the SNAP defendants shall pay to the plaintiff the sum of $25,150.00, representing attorneys' fees incurred in connection with bringing the motion for sanctions.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/3/17. (KKS)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to quash [Doc. # 199 ] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/11/17. (JAB)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for sanctions against defendants SNAP, David Clohessy, and Barbara Dorris [Doc. # 141 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the designated facts set forth in this order, as p laintiff claims, will be taken as established for purposes of this action. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(i). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a temporary protective order prohibiting the SNAP defendants from participating in discovery until the Court has ruled on plaintiff's motion for sanctions against the SNAP defendants [Doc. # 149 ] is moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until September 1, 2016, to submit documentation reflecting the attorney's fees and expenses incurred as a result of the SNAP defendants' failure to comply with the order compelling discovery. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(C). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/22/2016. (CLO)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the emergency motion of Jane Doe, PaulaPoe, and Richard Roe to intervene under Rule 24(a) or (b) [Doc. # 139 ] is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Jane Doe, Paula Poe, andRichard Roe for a stay of order [Doc. # 139 ] is denied as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the SNAP defendants' motion to join in theemergency motion to stay [Doc. # 137 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the SNAP defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's motion for sanctions and to reply in support of their motion to stay [Doc. # 146 ] is granted.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/19/16. (KKS)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to compel discovery from the SNAP defendants [Doc. # 116 ] is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the SNAP defendants shall have until July 11, 2016, to comply with this order and produce documents and answer interrogatories as set forth above. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/27/2016. (CLO) (Main Document 131 replaced on 6/27/2016) (JAB).
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to compel discovery from defendant N.M. [Doc. #104] is granted in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within 14 days of the date of this order, defendant N.M. shall: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/26/16. (JAB)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to dismiss the counterclaims filed by defendants Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests, David Clohessy, and Barbara Dorris [Doc. # 88 ] is granted. An order of partial dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/30/16. (JAB)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of the SNAP defendants to reconsider, for expedited appeal, or for certification to the Missouri Supreme Court [Doc. # 69 ] is denied.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/15/16. (KKS)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant N.M. to dismiss [Doc. # 60 ] is denied.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/14/16. (KKS)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER :IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant N.M. to dismiss forfailure to state a claim [Doc. # 32 ] is granted as to Counts XII and XIV anddenied in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendan t N.M. to strike [Doc. # 48 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant N.M. for sanctions [Doc. # 53 ] is denied. An order of partial dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/29/15. (KKS)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendants Porter, Pitterle, and the City of St. Louis to dismiss [Doc. # 27 ] is granted as to Counts IX, X, and XI of the complaint and is denied in all other respects. An order of partial dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/28/15. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiang v. Porter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiu Hui "Joseph" Jiang
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Levette Porter
Represented By: J. Brent Dulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaimie D. Pitterle
Represented By: J. Brent Dulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis Missouri
Represented By: J. Brent Dulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. M.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Chackes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests, Inc.
Represented By: Amy J. Lorenz-Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Clohessy
Represented By: Amy J. Lorenz-Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Dorris
Represented By: Amy J. Lorenz-Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?