Owen v. Lisenbe et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lee Owen
Defendant: Richard Lisenbe and Matt Shults
Case Number: 4:2017cv01547
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: John M. Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION,MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 66] is GRANTED. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on March 20, 2020. (MCB)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, [Doc. No. 32 ], is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel, [Doc. No. 34 ], Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel, [D oc. No. 37 ], and Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel, [Doc. No. 39 ], are denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Request Action by the Court for Cause, [Doc. No. 35 ], and Plaintiffs Motion for Action for Cause, [Doc. No. 36 ], are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/24/18. (KJS)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to reconsider the Order of Partial Dismissal is DENIED. [ECF No. 20 ] Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/30/17. (JAB)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to reconsider the Memorandum and Order dated August 21, 2017 to the extent it required plaintiff to pay a $1.00 initial filing fee [ECF No. 15] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the institution having custody of plaintiff shall, whenever the amount in plaintiffs prison account exceeds $10.00, send monthly payments that equal 20 percent of the funds credited to the account the preceding month to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri Clerks office, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), until the filing fee of $400 is paid in full.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve defendant Lieutenant Matt Shults with summons for the claims brought against him in his individual capacity.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Richard Lisenbe is DISMISSED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs official-capacity claims are DISMISSED.An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. 15 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/17/17. (CLA)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the rem ittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must submit an amended complaint within twenty-one days of the da te of this Order. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings (copy of order and civil rights complaint form mailed to plaintiff). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/21/17. (KXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen v. Lisenbe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lee Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lisenbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Shults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?