M.J. v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Niesha Oliver and M.J.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2019cv01846
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Doc #5 ] is set for August 29, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10N before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/19/2019. (AAS)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION to Continue (Unopposed) Ford Motor Company's Hearing on its Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rozell, Sherry) filed by Ford Motor Company ; GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/14/19. (KJS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue (Unopposed) Ford Motor Company's Hearing on its Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rozell, Sherry)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that oral argument on Defendants Motion to Dismiss is set for Thursday, August 15, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned.( Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10N before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 07/22/2019. (AAS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 ORAL MOTION Re: Request for Oral Argument Regarding Its Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rozell, Sherry)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rozell, Sherry)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Missouri Business Filings, #2 Exhibit Missouri Business Filings, #3 Exhibit Missouri Business Filings)(Siegel, Julie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Ram Krishnaswami)(Rozell, Sherry)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rozell, Sherry)
June 28, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by M.J..(BAK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company Sent To: Plaintiff (BAK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(BAK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC01287, with receipt number AMOEDC-7303417, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3- Docket sheet & other pleadings)(Rozell, Sherry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.J. v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Sherry A. Rozell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niesha Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.J.
Represented By: Julie L. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?