Salvato et al v. Stark
Plaintiff: Roco Salvato, Kazu Amy Salvato, Michael Salvato and R.S.
Defendant: Paige M Stark
Case Number: 4:2019cv02795
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs R.S., Kazu Amy Salvato, Michael Salvato to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/13/2019. (AAS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Salvato ONLY (Nichols, Dean)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Paige M Stark Amendment to #1 Complaint, , filed by Michael Salvato, R.S., Kazu Amy Salvato. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Michael Salvato, R.S., Kazu Amy Salvato.(Nichols, Dean)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 18, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT - Unredacted Original Complaint by Plaintiffs R.S., Kazu Amy Salvato, Michael Salvato. (BAK)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to R.S. ; relationship to minor:mother by Plaintiffs Kazu Amy Salvato, R.S.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Dean)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7526786, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Salvato, R.S., Kazu Amy Salvato. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Nichols, Dean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2019: #3 Waiver of Service) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvato et al v. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roco Salvato
Represented By: Dean C. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kazu Amy Salvato
Represented By: Dean C. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Salvato
Represented By: Dean C. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.S.
Represented By: Dean C. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige M Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?