Davis-Bey et al v. Bellefontaine Neighbors Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Jada Davis-Bey
Defendant: Dispatch Unit Num. 6D13, Bill Clark, Bellefontaine Neighbors Police Department, St. Louis County Government, City of Bellefontaine Neighbors Government, Jim Buckles, Neff, Rayford, Spieler, Rea, Bud, Lalumanier, Laumeier and Jeffers
Case Number: 4:2020cv00213
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL re #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #7 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jada Davis-Bey. (KKS) Modified on 3/10/2020 (MFG).
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jada Davis-Bey. (KKS) Modified on 3/10/2020 (MFG).
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Jada Davis-Bey. (KKS) Modified on 3/10/2020 (MFG).
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED CLAIM against defendant All Defendants Amendment to #1 Complaint JURY demand,, filed by Jada Davis-Bey. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jada Davis-Bey.(KKS) Modified on 3/10/2020 (MFG). (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/10/2020) (MFG).
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM to Clerk by Plaintiff Jada Davis-Bey re pro se appearance. (JAB)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL Attachment and Affidavit re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jada Davis-Bey. (KKS)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23/Supplement to IFP motion #2 by Plaintiff Jada Davis-Bey. (KKS)
February 6, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Feb 6 15:01:12 CST 2020 (admin,)
February 6, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
February 6, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Jada Davis-Bey. (BAK)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jada Davis-Bey. (BAK)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Jada Davis-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis-Bey et al v. Bellefontaine Neighbors Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dispatch Unit Num. 6D13
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellefontaine Neighbors Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bellefontaine Neighbors Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Buckles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spieler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lalumanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laumeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jada Davis-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?