Baker et al v. Mallinckrodt LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Scholfield, Jacqueline Newton, Jessica Baker, Christopher Williams, Cheryl Morrison, Jada Thompson, Wanda McKinney, Michael Seger, Catherine Harris and Kathy Juergens
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC. and Cotter Corp.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00569
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Jacqueline Newton (wife of decedent James Newton). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/5/2020. (AFC)
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed Judgment by Plaintiff Jacqueline Newton. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Petition for Approval of Agreed Wrongful Death Settlement Distributions (Doc. 857) is GRANTED. [This is a copy of Order 869 entered in the lead case and adopted in this matter.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/30/2020. (AFC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (AFC).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Petition forApproval of Wrongful Death Settlements (Doc. 839) is GRANTED, in part, per theCourt's 3/13/2020 Order (Doc. 843). [This is a copy of Order 850 entered in the lead case and adopted in this matter.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/23/2020. (AFC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (AFC).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Petition for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlements (Doc. 808) is GRANTED. [This is a copy of Order 815 entered in the lead case and adopted in this matter.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/22/2020. (AFC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (AFC).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Petition for Approval of Wrongful DeathSettlements (Doc. 796) is GRANTED. [This is a copy of Order 806 entered in the lead case and adopted in this matter.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/30/2019. (AFC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (AFC).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER Re: #12 MOTION to Clarify to Adopt Orders from Lead Case by Plaintiffs Jessica Baker, Catherine Harris, Kathy Juergens, Wanda McKinney, Cheryl Morrison, Jacqueline Newton, Beverly Scholfield, Michael Seger, Jada Thompson, Christopher Williams; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/11/2020. (AFC)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Clarify to Adopt Orders from Lead Case by Plaintiffs Jessica Baker, Catherine Harris, Kathy Juergens, Wanda McKinney, Cheryl Morrison, Jacqueline Newton, Beverly Scholfield, Michael Seger, Jada Thompson, Christopher Williams. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Jada Thompson. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2020. (AFC)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Catherine Harris. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2020. (AFC)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Jessica Baker. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2020. (AFC)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED JUDGMENT as to Kathy Juergens. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2020. (AFC)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment by Plaintiff Kathy Juergens. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment by Plaintiff Jada Thompson. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment by Plaintiff Catherine Harris. (Brennan, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT Proposed Judgment by Plaintiff Jessica Baker. (Brennan, Kenneth)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall consolidate the cases listed above with Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF for pretrial purposes. The undersigned will preside over all pretrial motions on common issues, including ruling on any dispositive and Daubert motions. At the conclusion of the pretrial phase, the cases will be unconsolidated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case Management Orders and other Orders entered in the Lead Case shall apply to all consolidated cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings other than pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, should be made in this case, Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF, which is designated as the Lead Case, and should only reference the case number of the Lead Case. Pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) should be filed only in the individual (original) case file. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in the Lead Case and in the above-listed cases.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/23/20. (KJS)
April 23, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 2. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Amended Original Filing Form: by Plaintiffs Jessica Baker, Catherine Harris, Kathy Juergens, Wanda McKinney, Cheryl Morrison, Jacqueline Newton, Beverly Scholfield, Michael Seger, Jada Thompson, Christopher Williams (Brennan, Kenneth)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7879486, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Neil Schofield, Mamie Hall, Michelle Seger, Joseph Zumsteg, Andrew Barton, Melissa Williams, David Baker, Johnny McKinney, Joseph Morrison, James Newton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service Mallinckrodt, #4 Waiver of Service Cotter Corp.)(Brennan, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Mallinckrodt LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Scholfield
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Newton
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Baker
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Morrison
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jada Thompson
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda McKinney
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Seger
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Harris
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Juergens
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotter Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?