Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen v. BNSF Railway
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen
Defendant: BNSF Railway
Case Number: 4:2020cv01209
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Singer, James)
November 2, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James) filed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/30/2020. (KEK) Modified on 10/30/2020 (KEK).
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (AFC)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #10 is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's Motion to Stay #16 . So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/28/20. (MCC)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant BNSF Railway. Parent companies: Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Berkshire Hathaway Inc.,. (Lee, Allison)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Lee, Allison)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Rhodes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Lee, Allison)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant BNSF Railway. (Lee, Allison)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Allison Elizabeth Lee for Defendant BNSF Railway. (Lee, Allison)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Singer, James)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Singer, James)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/19/20. (MCC)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Aaron S. Edelman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8220047) by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Edelman, Aaron)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/14/20. (MCC)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard E. Edelman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8209362) by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Edelman, Richard)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen.. (Singer, James)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/15/2020. (KJS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen BNSF Railway waiver signed on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Singer, James)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
September 9, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. (BAK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant BNSF Railway with receipt number AMOEDC-8129001, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Award for D Drum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Waiver of Service form )(Singer, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2020: #4 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen v. BNSF Railway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Aaron S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?