Southampton Community Healthcare et al v. Bailey
Plaintiff: Southampton Community Healthcare f/k/a Southampton Healthcare, Inc.;, Kelly Storck, A.S., N.F., Logan Casey, Southampton Community Healthcare and Southampton Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant: Andrew Bailey
Case Number: 4:2023cv00538
Filed: April 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2023 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT of #14 (MOTION HEARING) held on 4/26/2023 before Judge Autrey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Angela Daley, Angela_Daley@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7978. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2023. (JEB) Modified on 5/3/2023 (EAB).
April 28, 2023 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for #14 (MOTION HEARING) by A.S., Logan Casey, N.F., Southampton Community Healthcare, Kelly Storck. (Rothert, Anthony) (Copy of request sent to court reporter A. Daley on 5/1/23) Modified on 5/1/2023 (HMA).
April 26, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey: Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2023 re #11 Emergency MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 21st Judicial Circuit Court - St. Louis County. Parties present. Arguments heard. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is GRANTED. This court is without jurisdiction to consider the matter herein. Accordingly, the matter is remanded to the Circuit Court for the 21st Judicial Circuit, County of St. Louis, State of Missouri. SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter:Angela Daley, Angela_Daley@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7978) (proceedings started: 1:12 pm) (proceedings ended: 1:57 pm) (Deputy Clerk: J. Bailey)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Anthony Rothert, Gillian Wilcox and J. Bennett Clark)(Appearance for Defendant: Joshua Divine) (Copy of docket sheet and remand sent to St. Louis County Circuit Court 4/27/23) (JEB)
April 26, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James D. Lawrence. The Certificate of Good Standing was not attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9914814) by Plaintiffs A.S., Logan Casey, N.F., Southampton Community Healthcare, Kelly Storck. (Lawrence, James)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is set in matter for April 26, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. and will take place by Zoom. Hearing participants will receive a separate email with a link to join the hearing by Zoom. Members of the general public who wish to listen in to the hearing are directed to call the following number to participate by phone: 1-669-254-5252, Meeting ID: 160 994 6867. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.02, all means of photographing, recording, broadcasting, and televising are prohibited in any courtroom, and in areas adjacent to any courtroom, except when authorized by the presiding judge. This includes proceedings ordered by the Court to be conducted by phone or video. (Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2023 01:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/26/23. (EAB)
April 26, 2023 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 21st Judicial Circuit Court - St. Louis County by Plaintiffs A.S., Logan Casey, N.F., Southampton Community Healthcare, Kelly Storck. (Clark, J.)
April 26, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony E. Rothert for Plaintiffs A.S., Logan Casey, N.F., Southampton Community Healthcare, Kelly Storck. (Rothert, Anthony)
April 26, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Bennett Clark for Plaintiffs A.S., Logan Casey, N.F., Southampton Community Healthcare, Kelly Storck. (Clark, J.)
April 26, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel Charles Freedlund for Defendant Andrew Bailey. (Freedlund, Samuel)
April 26, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenneth C. Capps for Defendant Andrew Bailey. (Capps, Kenneth)
April 26, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Maria Ann Lanahan for Defendant Andrew Bailey. (Lanahan, Maria)
April 26, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs A.S., Logan Casey, N.F., Southampton Community Healthcare, Kelly Storck. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Michael Donovan, #2 Declaration of Dr. Sam Trochtrop, #3 AS Affidavit, #4 NF Affidavit, #5 Affidavit Logan Casey, #6 Currriculum Vitae A, #7 Currriculum Vitae B)(JWD)
April 26, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs A.S., Logan Casey, N.F., Southampton Community Healthcare, Kelly Storck. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(JWD)
April 26, 2023 Filing 3 Petition For A Temporary Restraining Order, Injunctive Relief, and Declaratory Relief (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Southampton Community Healthcare, N.F., A.S., Kelly Storck, Logan Casey.(JWD)
April 26, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Andrew Bailey Sent To: Plaintiff (Divine, Joshua)
April 26, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
April 25, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 23SL-CC01673, with receipt number AMOEDC-9913305, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Andrew Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Divine, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southampton Community Healthcare et al v. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southampton Community Healthcare f/k/a Southampton Healthcare, Inc.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Storck
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: J. Bennett Clark
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: J. Bennett Clark
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.F.
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: J. Bennett Clark
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Casey
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: J. Bennett Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southampton Community Healthcare
Represented By: J. Bennett Clark
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southampton Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: J. Bennett Clark
Represented By: James D. Lawrence
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bailey
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine
Represented By: Maria Ann Lanahan
Represented By: Kenneth C. Capps
Represented By: Samuel Charles Freedlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?